Nafisah v. Mount Nittany Physician Group et al
Plaintiff: Nasser Bin Nafisah
Defendant: Mount Nittany Medical Center, Mount Nittany Health System, Mount Nittany Physician Group, Mount Nittany Health, Kaitlyn Brunner and Mount Nittany Medical Center Health Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01210
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by N. Randall Sees on behalf of Kaitlyn Brunner, Mount Nittany Health, Mount Nittany Health System, Mount Nittany Medical Center, Mount Nittany Medical Center Health Services, Inc., Mount Nittany Physician Group (Sees, N.)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Mount Nittany Physician Group. Mount Nittany Physician Group waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Bluth, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Mount Nittany Medical Center. Mount Nittany Medical Center waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Bluth, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Mount Nittany Medical Center Health Services, Inc.. Mount Nittany Medical Center Health Services, Inc. waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Bluth, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Mount Nittany Health System. Mount Nittany Health System waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Bluth, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Mount Nittany Health. Mount Nittany Health waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Bluth, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kaitlyn Brunner. Kaitlyn Brunner waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Bluth, Brian)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Bluth on behalf of Kaitlyn Brunner, Mount Nittany Health, Mount Nittany Health System, Mount Nittany Medical Center, Mount Nittany Medical Center Health Services, Inc., Mount Nittany Physician Group (Bluth, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/16/2019. (jr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice) (nr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaitlyn Brunner, Mount Nittany Health, Mount Nittany Health System, Mount Nittany Medical Center, Mount Nittany Medical Center Health Services, Inc., Mount Nittany Physician Group ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4816180), filed by Nasser Bin Nafisah. (Attachments: #1 Certificate(s) of Merit as to Defendant(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nafisah v. Mount Nittany Physician Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Nittany Medical Center
Represented By: N. Randall Sees
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Nittany Health System
Represented By: N. Randall Sees
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Nittany Physician Group
Represented By: N. Randall Sees
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Nittany Health
Represented By: N. Randall Sees
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlyn Brunner
Represented By: N. Randall Sees
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Nittany Medical Center Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: N. Randall Sees
Represented By: Brian J. Bluth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nasser Bin Nafisah
Represented By: Michael F. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?