American Builders Insurance Company v. Keystone Insurers Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: American Builders Insurance Company
Defendant: Keystone Insurers Group, Inc. and Ebensburg Insurance Agency
Case Number: 4:2019cv01497
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Keystone Insurers Group, Inc. response due 10/30/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/2/2019. (jr)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ebensburg Insurance Agency Response due 10/30/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/2/2019. (jr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Keystone Insurers Group, Inc.. (Wolfe, Patrick)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Keystone Insurers Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Wolfe, Patrick)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ebensburg Insurance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haddick, Charles)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/19/2019. (jr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4857135), filed by American Builders Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Builders Insurance Company v. Keystone Insurers Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Insurers Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebensburg Insurance Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Builders Insurance Company
Represented By: Konrad R. Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?