Kase v. Columbia County Court et al
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Kase
Defendant: Columbia County Court, Court Appointed Assessor/Surveyor, Robert D. Kase, Betty Winters and Mihalik
Case Number: 4:2019cv01569
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 10/15/19 (ms)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerry L. Kase.(ep)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO PRO SE PLTF VIA U.S. MAIL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Clerk of Court shall issue summons and provide same to plaintiff for service of the complaint upon the named defendants.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 9/30/19. (ms)
September 20, 2019 Receipt of payment from JERRY KASE in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 9/19/2019. Receipt number 333067722 processed by aoswald. (tp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Supplement by Jerry L. Kase. to #1 Complaint (Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (ep)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 333067722. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (ep)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBITS by Jerry L. Kase. (lg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Jerry Kase stating that the filing fee has been paid. (lg)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 9/12/19. (Attachments: #1 short form ifp application)(ms)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED (lg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (Attachments: #1 order)(lg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Jerry L. Kase, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kase v. Columbia County Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court Appointed Assessor/Surveyor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Kase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mihalik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Kase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?