Miller v. O'Brien Construction et al
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Defendant: BRE RC Monroe MP PA and O'Brien Construction
Case Number: 4:2019cv01611
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by BRE RC Monroe MP PA. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(Roberto, Bianca)
November 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Roberto is instructed to file the brief in support of motion to dismiss as a separate document using the civil event "brief in support"; please do not refile the motion. (lg)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by BRE RC Monroe MP PA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memo, #3 Proposed Order)(Roberto, Bianca)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by O'Brien Construction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1)(Hayes, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order approving #8 Stipulation. Defendants O'Brien Construction, Inc. and BRE RC Monroe MP PA, L.P. shall have up to and including Monday, 11/4/2019, to move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/21/2019. (jr)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca A. Roberto on behalf of BRE RC Monroe MP PA (Roberto, Bianca)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by O'Brien Construction. (Hayes, Michael)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael B Hayes on behalf of O'Brien Construction (Hayes, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on O'Brien Construction, Inc on 09/27/2019, filed by Michael Miller. (Crossett, David)
October 10, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc 6 deleted; duplicative of doc 5. (lg)
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed date added/updated: BRE RC Monroe MP PA served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (lg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint served on Stefoni Murphy, Intake Specialist on 10-01-2019, filed by Michael Miller. (Crossett, David)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Michael Miller. O'Brien Construction waiver sent on 9/18/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Crossett, David)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/19/2019. (jr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4875045), filed by Michael Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. O'Brien Construction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE RC Monroe MP PA
Represented By: Bianca A. Roberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Brien Construction
Represented By: Michael B Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Miller
Represented By: David W. Crossett
Represented By: Joel A Ready
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?