Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Jatiani Trucking, LLC
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Jatiani Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00735
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Jatiani Trucking, LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Fields, Jim)
May 12, 2020 SUMMONS Returned Executed (see Doc #7) - Jatiani Trucking, LLC served on 5/8/2020, answer due 5/29/2020. (lg)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Harjinder Singh, owner, Jatiani Trucking LLC on 05/08/2020, filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Fields, Jim)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE REPORT by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fields, Jim)
May 7, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/7/2020. (jr)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Fields, Jim)
May 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Fields is instructed to refile the corporate disclosure statement without the header indentifiers from another case/another court; AND also to add the corporate parent/other affiliates when prompted; thereafter, doc #3 will be deleted. (lg)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jatiani Trucking, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jatiani Trucking, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5083964), filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Jatiani Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jatiani Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Jim H. Fields, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?