Houseknecht v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Eric Houseknecht
Defendant: David Young, Jody Miller, Donald Mayes and Dustin Reeder
Case Number: 4:2020cv01233
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurie A. Fiore on behalf of Donald Mayes, Jody Miller, Dustin Reeder, David Young (Fiore, Laurie)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order approving #12 Stipulation. The deadline for Defendants David Young and Donald Mayes to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 10/2/2020. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/20/2020. (jr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 Supplement by Donald Mayes, David Young. to #12 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Fulton, Janelle)
August 19, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Fulton is instructed to file a form of order for Judge Brann's signature/approval re stipulation to extend time to answer, using the civil event > other filings > other documents >SUPPLEMENT. Please do not refile the stipulation. (lg)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Donald Mayes, David Young. (Fulton, Janelle)
August 18, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document #6 "Summons Returned" deleted. Re-filed by attorney as Document #11 "Waiver of Service" (ga)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Dustin Reeder. Dustin Reeder waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (MacMain, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. MacMain on behalf of David Young (MacMain, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle E. Fulton on behalf of Donald Mayes, Jody Miller, Dustin Reeder, David Young (Fulton, Janelle)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jody Miller. Jody Miller waiver sent on 8/3/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (MacMain, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. MacMain on behalf of Jody Miller (MacMain, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. MacMain on behalf of Donald Mayes, Dustin Reeder (MacMain, David)
August 12, 2020 SUMMONS Returned Executed date added/updated: Defendants Donald Mayes and David Young served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (NOTE TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: when e-filing returns of service for Summons/Complaint, please use the civil event > initial pleadings and service > service of process > summons returned executed, which will set the answer due date.) (lg)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on David Young and Donald Mayes on 08/03/2020, filed by Eric Houseknecht. (Zicolello, Michael)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/30/2020. (jr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Donald Mayes, Jody Miller, Dustin Reeder, David Young and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Mayes, Jody Miller, Dustin Reeder, David Young ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5167693), filed by Eric Houseknecht. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houseknecht v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Young
Represented By: Laurie A. Fiore
Represented By: Janelle E. Fulton
Represented By: David J. MacMain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Miller
Represented By: Laurie A. Fiore
Represented By: Janelle E. Fulton
Represented By: David J. MacMain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Mayes
Represented By: Laurie A. Fiore
Represented By: Janelle E. Fulton
Represented By: David J. MacMain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Reeder
Represented By: Laurie A. Fiore
Represented By: Janelle E. Fulton
Represented By: David J. MacMain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Houseknecht
Represented By: Michael Zicolello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?