Freitas et al v. Geisinger Health Plan et al
Plaintiff: Kaylee McWilliams and Lori Freitas
Defendant: Socrates, Inc. and Geisinger Health Plan
Case Number: 4:2020cv01236
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Geisinger Health Plan, Socrates, Inc., filed by Lori Freitas, Kaylee McWilliams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kannebecker, Charles)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Geisinger Health Plan, Socrates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Collins, Thomas)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Geisinger Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Collins, Thomas)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/30/2020. (jr)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is granted; Geisinger Health Plan and Socrates, Inc. answer due 8/24/2020. (See order for further/complete details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/24/2020 (lg)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Geisinger Health Plan, Socrates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Root, Gretchen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Socrates, Inc., Geisinger Health Plan from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20-0556. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5167891), filed by Socrates, Inc., Geisinger Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2 Continued)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freitas et al v. Geisinger Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socrates, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Collins
Represented By: Adrian Zareba
Represented By: Gretchen W. Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Health Plan
Represented By: Thomas G. Collins
Represented By: Adrian Zareba
Represented By: Gretchen W. Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylee McWilliams
Represented By: Charles Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Freitas
Represented By: Charles Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?