Fera v. Cach, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Fera
Defendant: Cach, LLC and Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01343
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/11/2020. (jr)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Anthony Fera (Abramowicz, Kevin)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 9/14/2020 at 3:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/12/2020. (jr)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Alegis Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC for Resurgent Capital Services, L.P... (Burnette, Lauren)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cach, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LVNV Funding, LLC for Cach, LLC.. (Burnette, Lauren)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Petition for Removal with Affirmative Defenses by Cach, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services, L.P..(Burnette, Lauren)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/6/2020. (jr)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Cach, LLC from Court of Common Pleas of Northumberland County, case number CV-20-1016. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5189181), filed by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Cach, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fera v. Cach, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cach, LLC
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.
Represented By: Lauren M. Burnette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Fera
Represented By: Kevin Abramowicz
Represented By: Kevin Tucker
Represented By: Kevin W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?