Andrew v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Davis Andrew
Respondent: William Barr, Simona Flores-Lund, Warden Clair Doll and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 4:2020cv01347
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: John E Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed) filed by Davis Andrew - IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED THAT: (1) The Petition be DENIED and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; (2) A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY NOT BE ISSUED as Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right; and (3) The Clerk of Court be instructed to CLOSE THE CASE. Objections to R&R due by 10/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/29/2020. (caw)
September 28, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING Case reassigned to Chief Judge John E. Jones, III and referred to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle for the filing of a Report and Recommendation. (jkc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 Supplement by Davis Andrew to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (lg)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 TRAVERSE by Davis Andrew to #10 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Lodged No FF and No Motion for IFP Filed). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(nr)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Clair Doll by Clair Doll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
August 20, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: 8/20/2020 Letter mailed to Davis Andrew at York County Prison. (nr)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Judge Arbuckle to Attorney Sanderson. (caw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Habeas Corpus Served on US Attorney (mfa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from USAO to MJ Arbuckle . (Sanderson, Joanne)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that #1 Petition is now deemed filed; Clerk directed to terminate Barr, Flores-Lund and Wolf as respondents; Clerk directed to serve a copy of the Petition and this Order on Respondent and US Attorney; #2 Motion to Expedite is granted; Respondents shall file an expedited response to the Petition on/before 8/25/2020; Show Cause Response ddl 8/25/2020. (See order for further/complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/18/2020. (lg)
August 10, 2020 Receipt of payment from ANDREW DAVIS in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 8/7/2020. Receipt number 111025836 processed by aarlidge. (jjs)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Petitioner from Judge Arbuckle. (caw)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 08/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION To expedite proceedings filed by Davis Andrew.(lp)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Davis Andrew.(lp) Modified on 8/4/2020 (lp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrew v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Davis Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?