Munoz v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Raul Munoz
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf, Warden Clair Doll and William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv01380
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Clair Doll by Clair Doll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time to File response - it is ORDERED that Respondent's response to the Petition is now due on or before 10/2/2020. Upon receipt of the Response, Petitioner may file a reply within ten (10) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/14/2020. (caw)
September 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by Clair Doll. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Joanne)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Order to Show Cause.(rw) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/11/2020) (rw).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that because the fee has been paid, #1 Petition is now deemed filed; Clerk directed to terminate Barr, Flores-Lund and Wolf as respondents; Clerk directed to serve a copy of the petition and this order on Respondent and the US Attorney; #2 Motion to Expedite is granted; Expedited Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2020. Chad Wolf (Acting Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security), William Barr (United States Attorney General ) and Simona Flores-Lund (U.S. ICE Field Director for the Philadelphia District) terminated. (see order for further/complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/10/2020. (lg)
September 8, 2020 Receipt of payment from RAUL MUNOZ in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 9/4/2020. Receipt number 333072862 processed by aoswald. (jjs)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333072862. Petition is now deemed FILED. (ao)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Letter to Petitioner from Judge Arbuckle. (caw)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP 08/05/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (lp)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite the petition due to COVID 19 filed by Raul Munoz.(lp)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Humanitarian Release COVID 19 lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed by Raul Munoz.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munoz v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raul Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?