Sobiech et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Tina Sobiech and Thomas Sobiech
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv01477
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Discovery shall be completed by 12/1/2020. A Telephone Status Conference is scheduled for 12/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/1/2020. (jr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 61 Proposed Scheduling Order by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech. . (Rieders, Clifford)
August 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Connolly and Attorney Finnell are instructed to register through Pacer as e-filers; all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. (lg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 60 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Anthony Finnell. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/26/2020. (lg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 59 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Daniel Connolly. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/26/2020. (lg)
August 26, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified state bar record of Attorney Daniel Connolly and Attorney Anthony Finnell. (lg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 58 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David F. Abernethy on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation Attorney Anthony W. Finnell is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5225318.. (Abernethy, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 57 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David F. Abernethy on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation Attorney Daniel J. Connolly is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5225264.. (Abernethy, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Abernethy on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Abernethy, David)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 8/31/2020 at 11:00 AM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/24/2020. (jr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 54 Case transferred electronically in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-29279 containing electronic documents.
August 17, 2020 Filing 53 DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - BSC PTO-14 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 4955 - BSC PTO-175 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 4987 - BSC PTO-176 (Notice of Correction of Error in PTO-175 - Wave 4 Cases), #8 Exhibit ECF 6100 - BSC PTO-187 - Amended Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 4 Cases, #9 Exhibit ECF 6984 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 7067 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #14 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #15 Exhibit ECF 6995 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Little, #16 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #17 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #18 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #19 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #20 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #21 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #22 Exhibit ECF 7066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Little, #23 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #24 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #25 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 6986 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Rosenblatt, #27 Exhibit ECF 4833 - Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt and Memo in Support, #28 Exhibit ECF 7061 -BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Rosenblatt, #29 Exhibit ECF 4978 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Rosenblatt, #30 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A, #31 Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh B, #32 Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt, #33 Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Rosenblatt, #34 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #35 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #36 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #37 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #38 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #40 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #41 Exhibit ECF 7002 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE re Dr. J. Blaivas, #42 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support MTE Blaivas, #43 Exhibit ECF 7042 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Daubert Response re Blaivas, #44 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas, #45 Exhibit ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas, #46 Exhibit ECF 7018 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Pence, #47 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #48 Exhibit ECF 7047 - Pltfs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #49 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #50 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #51 Exhibit ECF 7005 - BSC's Notice of Adoption of Prior MTE Trepeta, #52 Exhibit ECF 4811 - BSC_s MTE Trepeta and Memo in Support, #53 Exhibit ECF 7049 - Plaintiffs' Notice of Adoption of Prior Response re Trepeta, #54 Exhibit ECF 4963 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Trepeta, #55 Exhibit ECF 6050 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Trepeta, #56 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #57 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #58 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #59 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #60 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Anielak, Eric) (Modified on 8/18/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/19/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/18/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #44 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech for Remand from Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/5/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 50 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech and Boston Scientific Corporation (Rieders, Clifford) (Modified on 2/14/2020 to add party filer) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James Stephen Bennett on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bennett, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER The #47 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech Hold Confererence as First Case, or to Reschedule to Another Date is GRANTED to the extent plaintiffs request that the status conference be rescheduled to another date and otherwise, is DENIED; the settlement conference on 01/31/2020 is continued as to this case only in light of counsel's request; the court further ORDERS that counsel for plaintiffs and defendants jointly file a status of case report on or before 02/15/2020, and generally describe any progress with settlementnegotiations; the court will then consider whether and when a new settlement conference should be scheduled. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech Hold Confererence as First Case, or to Reschedule to Another Date (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing that counsel for plaintiffs and defendants on Exhibit A attend a status conference before the court on 1/31/2020, at 9:00 a.m. in Charleston at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, Room 6600. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/9/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 45 BRIEF by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech in support of #44 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to Remand From Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech for Remand from Multidistrict Litigation to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 43 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech of Glenn Bloiso on August 14, 2019 at 1:00 pm (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 42 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech of Glenn Bloiso, MD on June 28, 2019 at 3:00 pm (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 41 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech of Frank Yartz, MD on June 28, 2019 at 1:00 pm (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech of Glenn Bloiso, MD on June 28, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech of Frank Yartz, MD on June 28, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech of Natasha Alligood-Percoco (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech of Glenn Bloiso, M.D. on January 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 36 OPPOSITION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to #35 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Leave to File a Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maislos, M.D. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Leave to File a Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Steven Maislos, M.D. with proposed document attached (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying #32 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/8/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE by Boston Scientific Corporation in opposition to #32 EMERGENCY MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 32 EMERGENCY MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Good Faith, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to #30 Response In Opposition,. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Boston Scientific Corporation in opposition to #29 DAUBERT MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to Limit the Opinion of Dr. Steven Maislos, M.D. Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 as Speculative, Conclusory and Not Based on any Reliable Methodology. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 29 DAUBERT MOTION by Thomas Sobiech and Tina Sobiech to Limit the Opinion of Dr. Steven Maislos, M.D. Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 as Speculative, Conclusory and Not Based on Any Reliable Methodology. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Rieders, Clifford) (Modified text on 10/22/2018) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 8, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Vincent Lucente on November 9, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF FRIENDS AND FAMILY by Boston Scientific Corporation of all friends and family members identified in the Plaintiff Fact Sheet, including section VI. Fact Witnesses, and/or identified during the Plaintiff's deposition on dates and at times to be determined. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Vincent Lucente on October 4, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Natasha Alligood-Percoco on October 4, 2018 at 12:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Frank Yartz on October 4, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Rule 26 Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Anielak, Eric) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Thomas Sobiech on August 9, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Tina Sobiech on August 9, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Thomas Sobiech on June 20, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Tina Sobiech on June 20, 2018 at 11:00 a.m (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #12 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to Remand Case to United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/16/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Clifford Alan Rieders on behalf of Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 13 BRIEF by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech in support of #12 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to Remand Case to United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to Remand Case to Circuit Court. ERROR: Brief in Support filed as attachment to the motion. CORRECTION: Image removed and filed at entry #13. (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech to Remand Case to United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Rieders, Clifford) (Modified on 5/1/2018 to remove brief in support (attachment #2) and file at entry #13) (kp). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Thomas Sobiech, Tina Sobiech. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 18, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Storngman on 12/5/2014. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 12/4/2014, answer due 2/2/2015. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 9, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 4, 2014 Filing 4 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 117 (Order Scheduling Status Conference in All MDLs on January 29, 2015) entered on 12/02/2014 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Clifford Alan Rieders on behalf of Tina Sobiech. (Rieders, Clifford) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3556546. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sobiech et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Jon A Strongman
Represented By: Michael A Tanenbaum
Represented By: Eric M Anielak
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: James Stephen Bennett
Represented By: David F. Abernethy
Represented By: Anthony W. Finnell, Jr
Represented By: Daniel J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Sobiech
Represented By: Clifford Alan Rieders
Represented By: Clifford A. Rieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sobiech
Represented By: Clifford Alan Rieders
Represented By: Clifford A. Rieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?