Ramirez v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Antonio Lopez Ramirez
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf, William P. Barr and Warden Clair Doll
Case Number: 4:2020cv01745
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Ramirez's 28 U.S.C. 2241 petition #1 is DISMISSED as moot; and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/5/2020. (jr)
November 3, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING Case reassigned to Honorable Matthew W. Brann and referred to Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle. (jkc)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS Upon the Record as to Petition due to Removal by William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. 9/25/2020 Administrative Order sent to Antonio Lopez Ramirez at York County Prison. Envelope states "Return to Sender". (nr)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. (Attachment: #1 IFP Form)(lg)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite by Antonio Lopez Ramirez, pro se.(lg)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Antonio Lopez Ramirez, pro se. (Attachments: #1 List of Petitioners)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio Lopez Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?