Duran-Avelos v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Ramon Duran-Avelos
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf, William P. Barr and Clair Doll
Case Number: 4:2020cv01748
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Jennifer P Wilson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Mail (Doc 6) sent to Ramon Duran-Avelos, marked as 'B&B on 10/05/2020'. No new address on file (mw)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Duran-Aveloss petition for writ of habeas corpus (Doc. 1) and motion to expedite (Doc. 4) are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court isdirected to close this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 10/26/2020. (ve)
October 23, 2020 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING Case reassigned to Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson for all further proceedings. (jkc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUGGESTION OF MOOTNESS Upon the Record as to Petition due to Removal by William P. Barr, Clair Doll, Simona Flores-Lund, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Sanderson, Joanne)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by LP on 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(mw)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED. (mw)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite by Ramon Duran-Avelos.(mw)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Ramon Duran-Avelos.(mw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran-Avelos v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Simona Flores-Lund
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clair Doll
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon Duran-Avelos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?