Yackel et al v. Uppal et al
Plaintiff: Brad Yackel, Luke Sansouci, Rebecca Yackel and Shelby Sansouci
Defendant: Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology, Guthrie Clinic, Ltd d/b/a Guthrie Medical Group, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital and Arvinder, MD Uppal
Case Number: 4:2020cv01794
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Rebecca Yackel. All Defendants. (Sonsire, Christina)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rebecca Yackel.(Sonsire, Christina)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Peter Hoffman. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/14/2020. (lg)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Francis Greek. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/14/2020. (lg)
October 14, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Francis Greek and Attorney Peter Hoffman and Associate Counsel Michael J. Obrien; Attorney Michael J. O'Brien is generally admitted to this court and is eligible to be listed as associate counsel. (lg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Peter J. Hoffman on behalf of Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital Attorney Peter J. Hoffman is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5294831.. (Hoffman, Peter)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Francis Greek on behalf of Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital Attorney Francis J. Greek is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5294799.. (Greek, Francis)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/6/2020. (jr)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Christina Sonsire. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/6/2020. (lg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Supplement by Rebecca Yackel. to #3 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice,,, . (Sonsire, Christina)
October 5, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Sonsire is reminded to file a SUPPLEMENT to the petition for special admission, particularly, JUST page 3, listing the name and contact information of associate counsel; please do not refile the petition or another fee will be charged. (lg)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Christina M Sonsire on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Christina Sonsire is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5280577., Petition Special Admission , filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Sonsire, Christina)
October 2, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Sonsire is instructed to file a SUPPLEMENT to the petition for special admission, particularly, JUST page 3, listing the name and contact information of associate counsel; please do not refile the petition or another fee will be charged. (lg)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guthrie Clinic, Ltd, Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology, Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital, Arvinder, MD Uppal ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5278927), filed by Rebecca Yackel, Brad Yackel, Luke Sansouci, Shelby Sansouci. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yackel et al v. Uppal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Sayre Otolaryngology
Represented By: Peter J. Hoffman
Represented By: Francis Greek
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Clinic, Ltd d/b/a Guthrie Medical Group
Represented By: Peter J. Hoffman
Represented By: Francis Greek
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Towanda Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Peter J. Hoffman
Represented By: Francis Greek
Represented By: Michael J. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinder, MD Uppal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Yackel
Represented By: Christina M Sonsire
Represented By: Michael H. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Sansouci
Represented By: Christina M Sonsire
Represented By: Michael H. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Yackel
Represented By: Christina M Sonsire
Represented By: Michael H. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Sansouci
Represented By: Christina M Sonsire
Represented By: Michael H. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?