ZIERKE v. SPALDING et al
Plaintiff: Gary Zierke
Defendant: Waren Spalding and USP Lewisburg
Case Number: 4:2020cv01951
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed.Signed by lp on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP)(mw)
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Packet) (mw)
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-05139 containing electronic documents.
October 22, 2020 DOC. 3 MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/21/2020. 10/21/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/22/2020) (sg, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]
October 21, 2020 COPY OF NOTICE OF PRO SE GUIDELINES #2 MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY MOTION FOR INJUNCTION by GARY ZIERKE. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) Modified on 10/22/2020 (lisad, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 10/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZIERKE v. SPALDING et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Zierke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waren Spalding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Lewisburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?