Klinger v. Geisinger Medical Center
Plaintiff: Marcy Klinger
Defendant: Geisinger Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2020cv02091
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2611
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Geisinger Medical Center. Geisinger Medical Center waiver sent on 11/18/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Lashay, Jill)
November 16, 2020 SUMMONS Returned Executed dated updated/corrected: Geisinger Medical Center served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (lg)
November 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcy Klinger. Geisinger Medical Center served on 11/12/2020, answer due 12/3/2020. (Dion, Samuel)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/13/2020. (jr)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Geisinger Medical Center and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geisinger Medical Center ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5337935), filed by Marcy Klinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klinger v. Geisinger Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy Klinger
Represented By: Samuel Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?