Guyer v. Milton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Kenetha Guyer
Defendant: MAPA Management Company, LLC, MIMA Healthcare, LLC, Milton Operating, LLC d/b/a Milton Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, MAPA Operating, LLC, Milton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, L.P., Bedrock Care, LLC and Milton Operating, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02381
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY BRIEF re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Kenetha Guyer.(Pokiniewski, Stephen)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by MAPA Management Company, LLC, MAPA Operating, LLC, MIMA Healthcare, LLC, Milton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Statement of Interest)(Leo, John)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION to Remand filed by Kenetha Guyer.(Pokiniewski, Stephen)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Remand by Kenetha Guyer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pokiniewski, Stephen)
January 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Pokiniewski is instructed to file the Brief in Support of Motion to Remand as a separate document using the civil event Motions and Related Filings > Responses and Replies(Briefs) > Brief in Support; please do not refile the Motion. (lg)
January 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Ronca on behalf of Kenetha Guyer. (Ronca, James)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/8/2021. (jr)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MAPA Management Company, LLC, Milton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, L.P., Milton Operating, LLC, MAPA Operating, LLC, Bedrock Care, LLC, MIMA Healthcare, LLC, Milton Operating, LLC(d/b/a Milton Rehabilitation and Nursing Center) from Northumberland County Court of Common Pleas, case number 20-1851. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5393766), filed by MAPA Management Company, LLC, Milton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, L.P., Milton Operating, LLC, MAPA Operating, LLC, Bedrock Care, LLC, MIMA Healthcare, LLC, Milton Operating, LLC(d/b/a Milton Rehabilitation and Nursing Center). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guyer v. Milton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPA Management Company, LLC
Represented By: John J. Leo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIMA Healthcare, LLC
Represented By: John J. Leo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Operating, LLC d/b/a Milton Rehabilitation and Nursing Center
Represented By: John J. Leo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPA Operating, LLC
Represented By: John J. Leo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center, L.P.
Represented By: John J. Leo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedrock Care, LLC
Represented By: John J. Leo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Operating, LLC
Represented By: John J. Leo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenetha Guyer
Represented By: Stephen J. Pokiniewski, Jr.
Represented By: James R. Ronca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?