Taber v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jean Taber
Defendant: Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Ideal Motors and State Line Auto Auction
Case Number: 4:2021cv00099
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Petition for Removal Reply to Cross-Claims of Co-Defendant, State Line Auto Auction by Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeMarco, Joseph)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to Petition for Removal with Jury Demand to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against Ideal Motors, State Line Auto Auction, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. by Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeMarco, Joseph)
February 15, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY by Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc.. to Cross-Claim of Defendant, State Line Auto Auction. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DeMarco, Joseph)
February 15, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Ideal Motors, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. on 1/9/2021, 1/21/2021, filed by Jean Taber. (Lavelle, John)
February 10, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney LaVelle is reminded to have Attorney Ciocca register as an e-filer at his earliest opportunity; all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. (lg)
February 9, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. to Defendant State Line Auto Auction Cross-Claim. (Rogers, Emily)
January 29, 2021 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by State Line Auto Auction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(McGrath, John)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Stephen Ciocca. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/27/2021. (lg)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by John E. Lavelle on behalf of Jean Taber Attorney Stephen C. Ciocca is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5449227.. (Lavelle, John)
January 27, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney LaVelle is instructed to have Attorney Ciocca register as an e-filer at his earliest opportunity; all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. (lg)
January 27, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified FL and NY bar record of Attorney Stephen Ciocca. (lg)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Rogers, Emily)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. ANSWER to Complaint by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..(Rogers, Emily)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Joseph DeMarco. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/25/2021. (lg)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kristen E. Lizzano on behalf of Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc. Attorney Joseph DeMarco is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5445906.. (Lizzano, Kristen)
January 25, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified PA bar record of Attorney Joseph DeMarco. (lg)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/22/2021. (jr)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc.. (Lizzano, Kristen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen E. Lizzano on behalf of Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lizzano, Kristen)
January 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Conroy, William)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. from Tioga County Court of Common Pleas, case number 675-2020. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5437287), filed by Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taber v. Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elm Chevrolet Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen E. Lizzano
Represented By: Joseph M. DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Emily J. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Line Auto Auction
Represented By: John T. McGrath, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Taber
Represented By: John E. Lavelle
Represented By: Stephen C. Ciocca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?