Brewer v. Lycoming Valley Railroad et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Brewer
Defendant: Lycoming Valley Railroad and North Shore Railroad & Affiliates
Case Number: 4:2021cv00399
Filed: March 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK: Following an Initial Case Management conference, the following dates apply to this case: Discovery due by 12/15/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 12/23/2021. Defendant Expert Report is due by 1/24/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2022. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 5/2/2022. Pretrial Memos due by 5/16/2022. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 5/23/2022 in Chambers before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on July 2022 trial term. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/28/2021. (jr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wayne Brewer. (Stern, Andrew J.)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 4/23/2021 at 2:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/25/2021. (jr)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Lycoming Valley Railroad, North Shore Railroad & Affiliates.(Staudenmaier, Craig)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Wayne Brewer. All Defendants. (Stern, Andrew J.)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by North Shore Railroad & Affiliates identifying Corporate Parent Susquehanna Union Railroad Company for North Shore Railroad & Affiliates. (Staudenmaier, Craig)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lycoming Valley Railroad identifying Corporate Parent Susquehanna Union Railroad Company for Lycoming Valley Railroad. (Staudenmaier, Craig)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig J. Staudenmaier on behalf of Lycoming Valley Railroad, North Shore Railroad & Affiliates (Staudenmaier, Craig)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/8/2021. (jr)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lycoming Valley Railroad, North Shore Railroad & Affiliates and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
March 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lycoming Valley Railroad, North Shore Railroad & Affiliates ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5499965), filed by Wayne Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Lycoming Valley Railroad et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming Valley Railroad
Represented By: Craig J. Staudenmaier
Represented By: Jennifer L. Bruce
Represented By: Joshua D. Bonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Shore Railroad & Affiliates
Represented By: Craig J. Staudenmaier
Represented By: Jennifer L. Bruce
Represented By: Joshua D. Bonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Brewer
Represented By: Andrew J. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?