Gantz v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rodger Gantz
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2021cv01110
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to All Parties YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/17/2021. (caw)
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Craig Black on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Black, Bryan)
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (nr)
July 19, 2021 Receipt of payment from RODGER GANTZ in the amount of $402.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE- NON-PRISONER. Transaction posted on 7/16/2021. Receipt number 333077231 processed by epetrosk. (jjs)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 333077231. Complaint is now deemed FILED. (ao)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - is ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's Motion requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is DENIED without prejudice. (2) On or before 8/9/2021, Plaintiff is required to either: a. File a revised Motion to proceed in forma pauperis; or b. Pay the civil filing fee of $402.00. (3) Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 7/9/2021. (caw)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals. (lg)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rodger Gantz.(lg)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Rodger Gantz. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gantz v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodger Gantz
Represented By: Christopher J. Marzzacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Bryan Craig Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?