Huffman v. Granite Services International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Huffman
Defendant: Granite Services International, Inc. and Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv01184
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED #26 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time is granted; Reply Brief due 9/9/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 9/2/2021 (lg)
August 30, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to To File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Michael Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Josephson, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 25 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Zheyao Li, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Shoemaker)(Levy, Andrew)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #21 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Remand is granted; Response due by 8/26/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/20/2021 (lg)
August 19, 2021 Filing 23 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Zheyao Li. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/19/2021. (lg)
August 18, 2021 Filing 22 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Zheyao Li on behalf of Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc. Attorney Zheyao Li is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5671544., filed by on behalf of Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) List of Court Admissions)(Li, Zheyao)
August 17, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levy, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Filing 20 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Lennon B. Haas. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/11/2021. (lg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 19 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Kevin M. Young. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/11/2021. (lg)
August 11, 2021 Filing 18 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Brett C. Bartlett. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/11/2021. (lg)
August 10, 2021 Filing 17 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Lennon Haas on behalf of Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc. Attorney Lennon B. Haas is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5664089.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - List of Court Admissions)(Haas, Lennon)
August 10, 2021 Filing 16 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kevin Michael Young on behalf of Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc. Attorney Kevin M. Young is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5664068.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) - List of Court Admissions)(Young, Kevin)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Brett Christopher Bartlett on behalf of Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc. Attorney Brett C. Bartlett is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5664047.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List of Court Admissions)(Bartlett, Brett)
August 5, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - return of service, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Lawrence removal)(Dunlap, Andrew)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Michael Huffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - return of service, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - Lawrence removal, #3 Proposed Order proposed order)(Dunlap, Andrew)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the initial case management conference call scheduled for 8/5/2021 at 3:00 p.m., is CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 8/4/2021. (jr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit JDCMP and Conference by Michael Huffman.(Josephson, Michael)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/5/2021 at 3:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/20/2021. (jr)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc..(Levy, Andrew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of Michael Huffman Attorney Michael Josephson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number BPAMDC-5631285.. (Josephson, Michael)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/9/2021. (lg)
July 9, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Josephson is reminded to file a Petition for Special Admission. (lg)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Supplement by Michael Huffman. to #5 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice . (Dunlap, Andrew)
July 8, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Dunlap is instructed to file page 3 of the Petition for Special Admission indicating associate counsel who is generally admitted to Middle District of PA using the civil event Other Filings > Other Documents > SUPPLEMENT. (The Court has no attorney record for Attorney Joshua Geist.) (lg)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of Michael Huffman Attorney Andrew Dunlap is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5628358.. (Dunlap, Andrew)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Granite Services International, Inc.. (Levy, Andrew)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Electric CO, Corporate Parent FIELDCORE SERVICE INC. for Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC. (Levy, Andrew)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/7/2021. (jr)
July 7, 2021 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM SENT to Attorney Dunlap and Attorney Josephson. (lg)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc. from Potter County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-77. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5626506), filed by Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC, Granite Services International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Unpublished Opinion, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffman v. Granite Services International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Huffman
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Clifford A. Rieders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Services International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Levy
Represented By: Zheyao Li
Represented By: Brett Christopher Bartlett
Represented By: Kevin Michael Young
Represented By: Lennon Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldcore Service Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Andrew L. Levy
Represented By: Zheyao Li
Represented By: Brett Christopher Bartlett
Represented By: Kevin Michael Young
Represented By: Lennon Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?