Federoff et al v. Geisinger Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Federoff, Christine Baron, Melissa Barron, Marsha Bezuhly, Deborah Bonnell, Scott Brown, Kathy Callaghan, Tammy Caswell, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Jeanne Charles, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Stacey Cook, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Crystal Davis, Patricia deManicor, Mandy Dinino, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Brittany Faus, Alexis Fetterman, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Kimberly Frace, Scott Fritz, Julianna Gay, Judy Good, Amy Gordon, Tara Grasley, Bethanie Gresh, Brittney Hannon, James Hannon, Barbie Harbaugh, Juliana Herrera, Archie Holsomback, III, Angela Hummel, Jesseca John, Karen Karchner, Cathy Keeler, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Terri Lockcuff, Gallahad Mallery, Sally Miller, Vanessa Miller, Keri Miller, Jasmine Moroskie, Amanda Mortimer, Melinda Newhart, Garry Oxenrider, Alexandra Portelli, Kristy Rittenhouse, Kristy Robinson, Briana Rolshausen, Christina Romanowski, Kim Schooley, LaRisha A. Scott, Marisa Scott, Jenelle Shellenberger, Kimberly Sipler, Tylinn Smith, Kristy Snavely, Rachel Snukis, Marni Stewart, Marjorie Swartzlander, Lori Taylor, Gabrielle Teter, Jennifer A. Thomas, Alexa Tomassacci, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Tonna Underhill, Sherryl Wagner, Bridgette M. Warford, Amy Weidner, Suzanne Wickham, Jessica Wychock, Heather Yost, Emily Adams, Kathleen Allen, David Bacon, Wanda Beaver, Amanda Bell, Cindy Birth, Kathleen Bixler, Sandra Brent, Catherine Byers, Tracy Carver, Philip Coyle, Jennifer Derr, Kimberly Downs, Dianne Eberle, Melanie Feick, Amy Hasara, Megan Hesketh, Mariel Hopkins, Michele Jarrow, Jessica Kemock, Mary Lichter, Bridgette Moll, Melissa Moyer, Renee Nye, Claire Panaway, James Riva, Tia Robinson, Larry Saltz, Jeana Snyder, Brina Sotelo, Connie Temple, Jenifer Wemple and Heather Yohn
Defendant: Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Lewistown Hospital, Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Geisinger System Services, Geisinger Health System, Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital, Geisinger Community Medical Center, Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center, Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center, Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy, West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc and Geisinger System Financial Edits
Case Number: 4:2021cv01903
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 28 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Health System, Geisinger Lewistown Hospital, Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center, Geisinger System Financial Edits, Geisinger System Services, Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital, Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Community Medical Center, West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Andrisano, Anthony)
December 3, 2021 Filing 27 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Health System, Geisinger Lewistown Hospital, Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center, Geisinger System Financial Edits, Geisinger System Services, Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital, Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Community Medical Center, West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s))(Andrisano, Anthony)
December 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Health System, Geisinger Lewistown Hospital, Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center, Geisinger System Financial Edits, Geisinger System Services, Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital, Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Community Medical Center, West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #2 Proposed Order)(Andrisano, Anthony)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT ISHEREBY ORDERED that: The Plaintiffs' #14 Amended Complaint (Second) for Injunctive Relief is DENIED. In so doing, the Court denies the Plaintiffs' requests for a temporary restraining order, a preliminary injunction, and a permanent injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/23/2021. (jr)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re: #16 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #14 Amended Complaint (Second) for Injunctive Relief. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/23/2021. (jr)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 VERBAL ORDER (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court accepts the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 14) as the operative pleading in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/19/2021. (jr)
November 19, 2021 Filing 21 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Colleen Wentz of Argument before Judge Brann on 11/19/2021. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Brann on 11/19/2021. By s/ Colleen Wentz. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (Wentz, Colleen)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/19/2021. (jr)
November 19, 2021 Filing 19 Supplement by Archie Holsomback, III, Mariel Hopkins, Angela Hummel, Michele Jarrow, Jesseca John, Karen Karchner, Cathy Keeler, Jessica Kemock, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Christina Romanowski, Larry Saltz, Kim Schooley, LaRisha A. Scott, Marisa Scott, Jenelle Shellenberger, Kimberly Sipler, Tylinn Smith, Kristy Snavely, Rachel Snukis, Jeana Snyder, Brina Sotelo, Marni Stewart, Marjorie Swartzlander, Lori Taylor, Connie Temple, Gabrielle Teter, Jennifer A. Thomas, Alexa Tomassacci, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Judy Good, Amy Gordon, Tara Grasley, Bethanie Gresh, Brittney Hannon, James Hannon, Barbie Harbaugh, Amy Hasara, Juliana Herrera, Megan Hesketh, Kathleen Bixler, Deborah Bonnell, Sandra Brent, Scott Brown, Catherine Byers, Kathy Callaghan, Tracy Carver, Tammy Caswell, Jeanne Charles, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Mary Lichter, Terri Lockcuff, Gallahad Mallery, Keri Miller, Sally Miller, Vanessa Miller, Bridgette Moll, Jasmine Moroskie, Amanda Mortimer, Melissa Moyer, Melinda Newhart, Renee Nye, Garry Oxenrider, Claire Panaway, Alexandra Portelli, Kristy Rittenhouse, James Riva, Kristy Robinson, Tia Robinson, Briana Rolshausen, Stacey Cook, Philip Coyle, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Crystal Davis, Jennifer Derr, Mandy Dinino, Kimberly Downs, Dianne Eberle, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Brittany Faus, Theodore Federoff, Melanie Feick, Alexis Fetterman, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Kimberly Frace, Scott Fritz, Julianna Gay, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Emily Adams, Kathleen Allen, David Bacon, Christine Baron, Melissa Barron, Wanda Beaver, Amanda Bell, Marsha Bezuhly, Cindy Birth, Tonna Underhill, Sherryl Wagner, Bridgette M. Warford, Amy Weidner, Jenifer Wemple. to #17 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8(b)(2) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed teh 5000 Word Limit Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8(b)(2). (Stapp, Gregory)
November 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Stapp is instructed to file a form order to DOC #17 using the civil event "Other filings / other documents / supplement" and link it to the motion. Do not refile the original motion. (jr)
November 18, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Emergency Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction re #17 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8(b)(2) filed by Brittany Faus, Theodore Federoff, Melanie Feick, Alexis Fetterman, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Kimberly Frace, Scott Fritz, Julianna Gay, Christina Romanowski, Larry Saltz, Kim Schooley, LaRisha A. Scott, Marisa Scott, Jenelle Shellenberger, Kimberly Sipler, Tylinn Smith, Kristy Snavely, Rachel Snukis, Judy Good, Amy Gordon, Tara Grasley, Bethanie Gresh, Brittney Hannon, James Hannon, Barbie Harbaugh, Amy Hasara, Juliana Herrera, Jeana Snyder, Brina Sotelo, Marni Stewart, Marjorie Swartzlander, Lori Taylor, Connie Temple, Gabrielle Teter, Jennifer A. Thomas, Alexa Tomassacci, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Kathleen Bixler, Deborah Bonnell, Sandra Brent, Scott Brown, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Catherine Byers, Kathy Callaghan, Tracy Carver, Tammy Caswell, Jeanne Charles, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Mary Lichter, Terri Lockcuff, Gallahad Mallery, Keri Miller, Sally Miller, Vanessa Miller, Bridgette Moll, Jasmine Moroskie, Amanda Mortimer, Megan Hesketh, Archie Holsomback, III, Mariel Hopkins, Angela Hummel, Michele Jarrow, Jesseca John, Karen Karchner, Cathy Keeler, Jessica Kemock, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Melissa Moyer, Melinda Newhart, Renee Nye, Garry Oxenrider, Claire Panaway, Alexandra Portelli, Kristy Rittenhouse, James Riva, Kristy Robinson, Briana Rolshausen, Patricia deManicor, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Stacey Cook, Philip Coyle, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Crystal Davis, Jennifer Derr, Mandy Dinino, Kimberly Downs, Dianne Eberle, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Emily Adams, Kathleen Allen, David Bacon, Christine Baron, Melissa Barron, Wanda Beaver, Amanda Bell, Marsha Bezuhly, Cindy Birth, Tonna Underhill, Sherryl Wagner, Bridgette M. Warford, Amy Weidner, Jenifer Wemple, Suzanne Wickham, Jessica Wychock, Heather Yohn, Heather Yost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) E, #2 Exhibit(s) F, #3 Exhibit(s) G)(Stapp, Gregory)
November 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8(b)(2) by Brittany Faus, Theodore Federoff, Melanie Feick, Alexis Fetterman, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Kimberly Frace, Scott Fritz, Julianna Gay, Christina Romanowski, Larry Saltz, Kim Schooley, LaRisha A. Scott, Marisa Scott, Jenelle Shellenberger, Kimberly Sipler, Tylinn Smith, Kristy Snavely, Rachel Snukis, Judy Good, Amy Gordon, Tara Grasley, Bethanie Gresh, Brittney Hannon, James Hannon, Barbie Harbaugh, Amy Hasara, Juliana Herrera, Jeana Snyder, Brina Sotelo, Marni Stewart, Marjorie Swartzlander, Lori Taylor, Connie Temple, Gabrielle Teter, Jennifer A. Thomas, Alexa Tomassacci, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Kathleen Bixler, Deborah Bonnell, Sandra Brent, Scott Brown, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Catherine Byers, Kathy Callaghan, Tracy Carver, Tammy Caswell, Jeanne Charles, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Mary Lichter, Terri Lockcuff, Gallahad Mallery, Keri Miller, Sally Miller, Vanessa Miller, Bridgette Moll, Jasmine Moroskie, Amanda Mortimer, Megan Hesketh, Archie Holsomback, III, Mariel Hopkins, Angela Hummel, Michele Jarrow, Jesseca John, Karen Karchner, Cathy Keeler, Jessica Kemock, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Melissa Moyer, Melinda Newhart, Renee Nye, Garry Oxenrider, Claire Panaway, Alexandra Portelli, Kristy Rittenhouse, James Riva, Kristy Robinson, Briana Rolshausen, Patricia deManicor, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Stacey Cook, Philip Coyle, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Crystal Davis, Jennifer Derr, Mandy Dinino, Kimberly Downs, Dianne Eberle, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Emily Adams, Kathleen Allen, David Bacon, Christine Baron, Melissa Barron, Wanda Beaver, Amanda Bell, Marsha Bezuhly, Cindy Birth, Tonna Underhill, Sherryl Wagner, Bridgette M. Warford, Amy Weidner, Jenifer Wemple, Suzanne Wickham, Jessica Wychock, Heather Yohn, Heather Yost.(Stapp, Gregory)
November 18, 2021 Filing 16 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Brittany Faus, Theodore Federoff, Melanie Feick, Alexis Fetterman, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Kimberly Frace, Scott Fritz, Julianna Gay, Christina Romanowski, Larry Saltz, Kim Schooley, LaRisha A. Scott, Marisa Scott, Jenelle Shellenberger, Kimberly Sipler, Tylinn Smith, Kristy Snavely, Rachel Snukis, Judy Good, Amy Gordon, Tara Grasley, Bethanie Gresh, Brittney Hannon, James Hannon, Barbie Harbaugh, Amy Hasara, Juliana Herrera, Jeana Snyder, Brina Sotelo, Marni Stewart, Marjorie Swartzlander, Lori Taylor, Connie Temple, Gabrielle Teter, Jennifer A. Thomas, Alexa Tomassacci, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Kathleen Bixler, Deborah Bonnell, Sandra Brent, Scott Brown, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Catherine Byers, Kathy Callaghan, Tracy Carver, Tammy Caswell, Jeanne Charles, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Mary Lichter, Terri Lockcuff, Gallahad Mallery, Keri Miller, Sally Miller, Vanessa Miller, Bridgette Moll, Jasmine Moroskie, Amanda Mortimer, Megan Hesketh, Archie Holsomback, III, Mariel Hopkins, Angela Hummel, Michele Jarrow, Jesseca John, Karen Karchner, Cathy Keeler, Jessica Kemock, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Melissa Moyer, Melinda Newhart, Renee Nye, Garry Oxenrider, Claire Panaway, Alexandra Portelli, Kristy Rittenhouse, James Riva, Kristy Robinson, Briana Rolshausen, Patricia deManicor, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Stacey Cook, Philip Coyle, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Crystal Davis, Jennifer Derr, Mandy Dinino, Kimberly Downs, Dianne Eberle, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Emily Adams, Kathleen Allen, David Bacon, Christine Baron, Melissa Barron, Wanda Beaver, Amanda Bell, Marsha Bezuhly, Cindy Birth, Tonna Underhill, Sherryl Wagner, Bridgette M. Warford, Amy Weidner, Jenifer Wemple, Suzanne Wickham, Jessica Wychock, Heather Yohn, Heather Yost.(Stapp, Gregory)
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 Response in Opposition / ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital, Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Community Medical Center, Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Health System, Geisinger Lewistown Hospital, Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center, Geisinger System Financial Edits, Geisinger System Services, Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Miller Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Martin Affidavit, #3 Affidavit Gryboski Affidavit, #4 Affidavit Wilkerson Affidavit, #5 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Andrisano, Anthony)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Brittany Faus, Melinda Newhart, Archie Holsomback, III, Stacey Cook, Rachel Snukis, Cathy Keeler, Christina Romanowski, Deborah Bonnell, Brittney Hannon, Patricia deManicor, Keri Miller, James Hannon, Juliana Herrera, Marisa Scott, Garry Oxenrider, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Theodore Federoff, Kathy Callaghan, Suzanne Wickham, Terri Lockcuff, LaRisha A. Scott, Mandy Dinino, Angela Hummel, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Bridgette M. Warford, Tylinn Smith, Kimberly Frace, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Sally Miller, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Julianna Gay, Jasmine Moroskie, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Jesseca John, Jeanne Charles, Christine Baron, Sherryl Wagner, Amanda Mortimer, Kristy Snavely, Jessica Wychock, Briana Rolshausen, Jenelle Shellenberger, Crystal Davis, Jennifer A. Thomas, Marni Stewart, Tonna Underhill, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Vanessa Miller, Barbie Harbaugh, Karen Karchner, Kimberly Sipler, Amy Gordon, Amy Weidner, Kim Schooley, Lori Taylor, Alexa Tomassacci, Bethanie Gresh, Marjorie Swartzlander, Gallahad Mallery, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Tammy Caswell, Kristy Rittenhouse, Gabrielle Teter, Melissa Barron, Alexandra Portelli, Heather Yost, Tara Grasley, Scott Brown, Judy Good, Kristy Robinson, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Alexis Fetterman, Scott Fritz, Marsha Bezuhly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (QuickView Test), #2 Exhibit(s) A-1 (COVID-19 Test Kit Purchase Agreement), #3 Exhibit(s) B (Puritan Memorandum), #4 Exhibit(s) C (National Cancer Institute-Ethylene Oxide), #5 Exhibit(s) D (Report on Carcinogens-Ethylene Oxide))(Stapp, Gregory)
November 17, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Stapp is directed to refile the Second Amended Complaint properly against ALL DEFENDANTS and please add "Second" amended complaint to the free text block of the entry; thereafter, doc 13 (incorrectly filed as an amended complaint against all plaintiffs) will be deleted. (lg)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Williamsport - Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/15/2021. (jr)
November 14, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Brittany Faus, Melinda Newhart, Archie Holsomback, III, Stacey Cook, Rachel Snukis, Cathy Keeler, Christina Romanowski, Deborah Bonnell, Brittney Hannon, Patricia deManicor, Keri Miller, James Hannon, Juliana Herrera, Marisa Scott, Garry Oxenrider, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Theodore Federoff, Kathy Callaghan, Suzanne Wickham, Terri Lockcuff, LaRisha A. Scott, Mandy Dinino, Angela Hummel, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Bridgette M. Warford, Tylinn Smith, Kimberly Frace, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Sally Miller, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Julianna Gay, Jasmine Moroskie, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Jesseca John, Jeanne Charles, Christine Baron, Sherryl Wagner, Amanda Mortimer, Kristy Snavely, Jessica Wychock, Briana Rolshausen, Jenelle Shellenberger, Crystal Davis, Jennifer A. Thomas, Marni Stewart, Tonna Underhill, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Vanessa Miller, Barbie Harbaugh, Karen Karchner, Kimberly Sipler, Amy Gordon, Amy Weidner, Kim Schooley, Lori Taylor, Alexa Tomassacci, Bethanie Gresh, Marjorie Swartzlander, Gallahad Mallery, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Tammy Caswell, Kristy Rittenhouse, Gabrielle Teter, Melissa Barron, Alexandra Portelli, Heather Yost, Tara Grasley, Scott Brown, Judy Good, Kristy Robinson, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Alexis Fetterman, Scott Fritz, Marsha Bezuhly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Test Kit and Test Information, #2 Exhibit(s) A1- The Cue Health, Inc. Information, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Puritan Information, #4 Exhibit(s) C-Ethylene Oxide, #5 Exhibit(s) D-Report on Carcinogenicty)(Stapp, Gregory)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2021. (jr)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared L Pickell on behalf of All Defendants. (Pickell, Jared)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Geisinger System Financial Edits, Geisinger Lewistown Hospital, Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger System Services, Geisinger Community Medical Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital, Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center, Geisinger Health System, Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy, West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc. All Defendants. (Andrisano, Anthony)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob J. Sulzer on behalf of All Defendants. (Sulzer, Jacob)
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill M. Lashay on behalf of All Defendants. (Lashay, Jill)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano on behalf of All Defendants. (Andrisano, Anthony)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/10/2021. (jr)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Plaintiffs and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (jw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/9/2021: #1 Plaintiff Packet) (ep). Modified on 11/9/2021 (jr).
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital, Geisinger Clinic, Geisinger Community Medical Center, Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Health System, Geisinger Lewistown Hospital, Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center, Geisinger System Financial Edits, Geisinger System Services, Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center, West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5751708), filed by Brittany Faus, Melinda Newhart, Archie Holsomback, III, Stacey Cook, Rachel Snukis, Cathy Keeler, Christina Romanowski, Deborah Bonnell, Brittney Hannon, Patricia deManicor, Keri Miller, James Hannon, Juliana Herrera, Marisa Scott, Garry Oxenrider, Rachel Englehart-Noss, Theodore Federoff, Kathy Callaghan, Suzanne Wickham, Terri Lockcuff, LaRisha A. Scott, Mandy Dinino, Angela Hummel, Christine Lynn Finkbeiner, Bridgette M. Warford, Tylinn Smith, Kimberly Frace, Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles, Sally Miller, Bethany Kline-Leadbeter, Julianna Gay, Jasmine Moroskie, Theresa Ann Chipolet, Jesseca John, Jeanne Charles, Christine Baron, Sherryl Wagner, Amanda Mortimer, Kristy Snavely, Jessica Wychock, Briana Rolshausen, Jenelle Shellenberger, Crystal Davis, Jennifer A. Thomas, Marni Stewart, Tonna Underhill, Lynn Kuzmitsky, Vanessa Miller, Barbie Harbaugh, Karen Karchner, Kimberly Sipler, Amy Gordon, Amy Weidner, Kim Schooley, Lori Taylor, Alexa Tomassacci, Bethanie Gresh, Marjorie Swartzlander, Gallahad Mallery, Melody Danko-Holsomback, Tammy Caswell, Kristy Rittenhouse, Gabrielle Teter, Melissa Barron, Alexandra Portelli, Heather Yost, Tara Grasley, Scott Brown, Judy Good, Kristy Robinson, Jeffrey Tomassacci, Alexis Fetterman, Scott Fritz, Marsha Bezuhly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - At home Covid Test, #2 Exhibit B - Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C - Ethylene Oxide, #4 Exhibit D - Ethylene Oxide, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federoff et al v. Geisinger Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Federoff
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Baron
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Barron
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Bezuhly
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bonnell
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Brown
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Callaghan
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Caswell
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M. (Eisenhauer) Buckles
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Charles
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Ann Chipolet
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Cook
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Danko-Holsomback
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Davis
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia deManicor
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Dinino
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Englehart-Noss
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Faus
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Fetterman
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Lynn Finkbeiner
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Frace
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Fritz
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianna Gay
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Good
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Gordon
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Grasley
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethanie Gresh
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Hannon
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hannon
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbie Harbaugh
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliana Herrera
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Holsomback, III
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Hummel
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesseca John
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Karchner
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Keeler
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Kline-Leadbeter
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Kuzmitsky
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lockcuff
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gallahad Mallery
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Miller
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Miller
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Miller
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Moroskie
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Mortimer
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Newhart
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Oxenrider
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Portelli
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Rittenhouse
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Robinson
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briana Rolshausen
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Romanowski
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Schooley
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaRisha A. Scott
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Scott
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenelle Shellenberger
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sipler
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylinn Smith
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Snavely
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Snukis
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marni Stewart
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Swartzlander
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Taylor
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Teter
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer A. Thomas
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Tomassacci
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Tomassacci
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonna Underhill
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherryl Wagner
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette M. Warford
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Weidner
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Wickham
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Wychock
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Yost
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Adams
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Allen
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bacon
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Beaver
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bell
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Birth
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Bixler
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Brent
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Byers
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Carver
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Coyle
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Derr
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Downs
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Eberle
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Feick
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hasara
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Hesketh
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariel Hopkins
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Jarrow
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Kemock
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lichter
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Moll
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Moyer
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Nye
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claire Panaway
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Riva
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia Robinson
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Saltz
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeana Snyder
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brina Sotelo
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Temple
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenifer Wemple
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Yohn
Represented By: Gregory A. Stapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Clinic
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Medical Center
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Health Plan
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Lewistown Hospital
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Wyoming Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger System Services
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Health System
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Bloomsburg Hospital
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Community Medical Center
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Pottsville Cancer Center
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Hazelton Cancer Center
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Mail Order Pharmacy
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Shore Advanced Life Support Services, Inc
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger System Financial Edits
Represented By: Anthony (T.J.) Andrisano
Represented By: Jacob J. Sulzer
Represented By: Jared L Pickell
Represented By: Jill M. Lashay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?