Burke v. Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Joseph T. Burke
Defendant: Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. and Jennifer L. Bau, M.D.
Case Number: 4:2022cv00263
Filed: February 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jennifer L. Bau, MD, Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pugh, Robert)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph T. Burke. All Defendants. (Villari, Heidi)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jennifer L. Bau, MD, Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C.. (Pugh, Robert)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Connell Pugh on behalf of Jennifer L. Bau, MD, Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. (Pugh, Robert)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 2/23/2022. (jr)
February 23, 2022 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Merit by Joseph T. Burke Jennifer L. Bau, M.D.. (Villari, Heidi)
February 23, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Merit by Joseph T. Burke Guthrie Medical Group, P.C.. (Villari, Heidi)
February 23, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Merit by Joseph T. Burke Guthrie-Robert Packer Hospital. (Villari, Heidi)
February 22, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
February 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jennifer L. Bau, MD, Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5855820), filed by Joseph T. Burke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph T. Burke
Represented By: Heidi G Villari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie - Robert Packer Hospital
Represented By: Robert Connell Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Medical Group, P.C.
Represented By: Robert Connell Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer L. Bau, M.D.
Represented By: Robert Connell Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?