Rodriguez v. Warden of FCI-Allenwood (Medium)
Petitioner: Carlos Rodriguez
Respondent: Warden of FCI-Allenwood (Medium)
Case Number: 4:2022cv00687
Filed: May 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MP
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE ORDER Served on U.S. Attorneys Office. (gs)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Clerk is directed to serve petition, attachments and Order on Respondent and the United States Attorney; Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 6/28/2022. (lg)
June 22, 2022 Receipt of payment from CARLOS RODRIGUEZ in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 6/21/2022. Receipt number 333081606 processed by aoswald. (jjs)
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 333081606. Petition is now deemed FILED. (sm)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 05/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
May 10, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
May 10, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Carlos Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A-Inmate Appeal of Decision by DHO and Regional Office, #2 Attachment B-Incident No. 3545380 dated 09/09/2021, #3 Attachment C-Discipline Hearing Officer Report dated 09/30/2021, #4 Attachment D-Petitioner's Dept. of Justice/FBOP Re: Incident No. 3545380 and response thereto)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Warden of FCI-Allenwood (Medium)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carlos Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of FCI-Allenwood (Medium)
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?