Vanbuskirk et al v. Conagra Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Vanbuskirk and Jessicia Fickert
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc. and Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv01856
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2023 Filing 34 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Andrew J. Weissler. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/28/2023. (ea)
December 28, 2023 Filing 33 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Josef S. Glynias. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/28/2023. (ea)
December 27, 2023 Filing 32 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by A.J. Weissler on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Andrew Weissler is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6499995.. (Weissler, A.J.)
December 27, 2023 Filing 31 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Josef Glynias on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Glynias is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6499939.. (Glynias, Josef)
December 27, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is reminded that when filing a motion, proposed orders and exhibits must be separated and added as an attachment to the main document. (ea)
December 26, 2023 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC. (Patitsas, Magda)
December 26, 2023 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conagra Brands, Inc.. (Patitsas, Magda)
December 26, 2023 Filing 28 Defendants' Partial ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC.(Patitsas, Magda)
December 26, 2023 Filing 27 NOTICE by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Partial MOTION to Dismiss of filing of Proposed Order (Patitsas, Magda)
December 26, 2023 Filing 26 DECLARATION by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Partial MOTION to Dismiss . (Patitsas, Magda)
December 26, 2023 Filing 25 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Partial MOTION to Dismiss filed by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s) Unpublished Cited Cases)(Patitsas, Magda)
December 26, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the Alternative, Partial, MOTION to Dismiss by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC.(Patitsas, Magda)
December 13, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
December 12, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #19 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants Conagra Brands, Inc. and Conagra Foods Packaged Foods, LLC shall have an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, through and including 12/25/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/5/2023. (ea)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Magda Patitsas, Josef S. Glynias, and Andrew J. Weissler, can enter their appearance in the above-captioned matter for the limited purpose of addressing the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on behalf of Defendants Conagra Brands, Inc. and Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 12/5/2023. (ea)
November 30, 2023 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patitsas, Magda)
November 30, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Magda Patitsas on behalf of Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patitsas, Magda)
November 30, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Magda Patitsas on behalf of Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC. (Patitsas, Magda)
November 29, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
November 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Forms)(Nilges, Hans)
November 28, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Vanbuskirk, Jessicia Fickert. Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC served on 11/20/2023, answer due 12/11/2023. (DeRose, Robert)
November 27, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Forms)(Nilges, Hans)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Form Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Form)(Nilges, Hans)
November 17, 2023 Filing 9 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/17/2023. (jr)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Vanbuskirk, Jessicia Fickert. Conagra Brands, Inc. served on 11/14/2023, answer due 12/5/2023. (DeRose, Robert)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Forms)(Nilges, Hans)
November 14, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk of Filing Consent to Join Forms Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent Forms)(Nilges, Hans)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jessicia Fickert, Michael Vanbuskirk Notice of Filing Consent to Join Yvette Wooten (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Notice of Consent_Wooten)(DeRose, Robert)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Hans A. Nilges. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/9/2023. (ea)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Hans Nilges on behalf of Michael Vanbuskirk, Jessicia Fickert Attorney Hans Nilges is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6457333., filed by on behalf of Michael Vanbuskirk, Jessicia Fickert.(Nilges, Hans)
November 9, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Nilges is instructed to file for special admission or make arrangements to be generally admitted. (ea)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ea)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Conagra Brands, Inc., Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 6455999), filed by Michael Vanbuskirk, Jessicia Fickert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Vanbuskirk NOC, #3 Exhibit B - Fickert NOC) (ea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanbuskirk et al v. Conagra Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vanbuskirk
Represented By: Hans Nilges
Represented By: Robert E. DeRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessicia Fickert
Represented By: Hans Nilges
Represented By: Robert E. DeRose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Represented By: A.J. Weissler
Represented By: Josef Glynias
Represented By: Magda Patitsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Foods Packaged Foods Company, LLC
Represented By: A.J. Weissler
Represented By: Josef Glynias
Represented By: Magda Patitsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?