Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC v. Ulster Dairy, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC
Defendant: Ulster Dairy, LLC, Cashell's Cattle Company, Ben Cashell and Elizabeth Cashell
Case Number: 4:2023cv01942
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2024 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ben Cashell, Elizabeth Cashell, Cashell's Cattle Company, Ulster Dairy, LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/12/2024. (ea)
January 12, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants Ulster Dairy, LLC (Ulster), Cashells Cattle Care (Cashell), Ben Cashell, and Elizabeth Cashell (collectively, Defendants) by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blumenthal, Amy) Modified on 1/12/2024 (ea).
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Ben Cashell, Cashell Cattle Care, Elizabeth Cashell, Ulster Dairy LLC on 12/07/2023, filed by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. (McDonnell, Michael)
November 24, 2023 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 11/24/2023. (jr)
November 24, 2023 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney McDonnell is directed to have Attorney Blumenthal file for special admission (or make arrangements to be generally admitted) and to request e-filing privileges through Pacer.uscourts.gov (all participating attorneys are required to be e-filers unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption). (ea)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ben Cashell, Elizabeth Cashell, Cashell's Cattle Company, Ulster Dairy, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s) in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ea)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ben Cashell, Elizabeth Cashell, Cashell's Cattle Company, Ulster Dairy, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 6470597), filed by Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Ulster Invoice, #3 Exhibit B - First Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit C - Second Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit D - Cashell Invoice, #6 Exhibit E - Cashell Demand Letter) (ea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC v. Ulster Dairy, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gold Star Feed and Grain, LLC
Represented By: Amy Blumenthal
Represented By: Michael T. McDonnell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ulster Dairy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cashell's Cattle Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Cashell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Cashell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?