February 28, 2012 |
Filing
97
ORDER denying 95 Motion to Allow Defendant to Re-Enter and Occupy Property of Residence. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 2/28/12. (kas)
|
February 9, 2012 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM ORDER finding pursuant to Rule 62.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that Defendant Beemans renewed motion under Rule 60(b) raises a substantial issue as to his entitlement to relief. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 2/9/2012. (kas)
|
October 14, 2011 |
Filing
56
ORDER: AND NOW, this 14th day of October, 2011, upon consideration of the Government's Application for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Held in Criminal Contempt, IT IS ORDERED that said Application is GRANTED, and that a hearing shall be held on November 4, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom C, at which time Ebert Beeman shall be directed to show cause why he should not be held in contempt of this Court's July 22, 2011 Order of Sale. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 10/14/2011. (kas)
|
July 22, 2011 |
Filing
49
ORDER OF SALE Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 07/22/2011. (kas)
|
July 6, 2011 |
Filing
43
ORDER: AND NOW, to wit, this 6th Day of July, 2011, this Court having previously entered on June 30, 2011 an Order of Judgment relative to Count I of the Complaint in favor of the United States and against Ebert G. Beeman 40 , and the United States having filed a Motion for Entry of Final Judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) 41 , and the Court, upon consideration of said motion, finding that there is no just reason for delay and that entry of a final judgment as to Count I of the complaint is warranted, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the United States' Motion for Entry of Final Judgment 41 shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED and the Order of Judgment entered on June 30, 2011 40 is hereby certified as a final and appealable judgment in accordance with Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 07/06/2011. (kas)
|
June 30, 2011 |
Filing
39
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: AND NOW, to wit, this 30th day of June, 2011, for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, IT IS ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss the complaint filed by Defendant Ebert G. Beeman on the basis of l ack of subject matter jurisdiction 8 , improper venue 9 , and failure to state a legitimate claim 10 shall be, and hereby are, DENIED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Beeman's Motion to Dismiss the United States' Mo tion for Partial Summary Judgment 32 shall be, and hereby is, DENIED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count I of the complaint 12 filed on behalf of the United States shall be, and hereby i s, GRANTED and a separate order of judgment shall be entered forthwith relative to that count. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States' Motion to Dismiss Ebert Beeman's Counterclaims 26 shall be, and hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that the Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default 27 filed by Defendant Ebert G. Beeman shall be, and hereby is, DENIED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will DEFER ruling on the United States' Second Mo tion for Summary Judgment 29 for a period of twenty (20) days, or until July 20, 2011, during which time Defendants Fifth Third Financial, LLC and Autumn Frost, LLC shall secure legal counsel if it be their intention to defend this litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Fifth Third Financial, LLC, Autumn Frost, LLC and Howard Beeman show cause, on or before July 20, 2011, why the government's request for judgment relative to Counts II and III should not be granted. Failure to show cause as directed herein will be construed by this Court as an indication that said Defendant has no interest in defending this litigation. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 06/30/2011. (kas)
|