TULLIO EMANUELE v. MEDICOR ASSOCIATES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and TULLIO EMANUELE, M.D.
Defendant: MEDICOR ASSOCIATES, INC., FLAGSHIP CARDIAC, VASCULAR AND THORACIC SURGERY OF ERIE, P.C., THE HAMOT MEDICAL CENTER OF THE CITY OF ERIE PENNSYLVANIA, RICHARD W. PETRELLA, M.D., ROBERT J. FERRARO, M.D., CHARLES M. FURR, M.D., TIMOTHY C. TRAGESER, M.D. and DONALD ZONE, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2010cv00245
Filed: October 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Sean J. McLaughlin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 461 For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, Defendants Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence or Bifurcate Trial (ECF No. 377) is DENIED; Relators Motion in Limine to Preclude Reference to Any Burden of Proof Other than a Prepond erance of the Evidence (ECF No. 398) is GRANTED; Relators Motion in Limine Regarding the Measure of Damages under the False Claims Act (ECF No. 408) is GRANTED; and Relators Motion to Strike (ECF No. 449) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/26/17. (jdg)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 357 Motion for Reconsideration filed by defendants The Hamot Medical Center of the City of Erie and Medicor Associates, Inc. As set forth in the accompanying memorandum opinion, defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied. An appropriate order follows. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/25/17. (jdg)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 298 Second MOTION To Exclude The Report and Testimony of Kathy McNamara filed by THE HAMOT MEDICAL CENTER OF THE CITY OF ERIE PENNSYLVANIA. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/21/2017. (smc)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 131 MOTION to Compel Answers to Interrogatories and Production of Documents filed by TULLIO EMANUELE, M.D., 144 SPECIAL MASTER REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by DAVID G. OBERDICK. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/29/2014. (blr)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 67 Defendant Flagship's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 69 Defendants Ferraro, Furr, Petrella, Trageser and Medicor's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 71 Defendant Hamot's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 73 Defendant Zone's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. AND NOW, this 26th day of July, 2013, and for the reasons set forth in the accompanying Me morandum Opinion, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Flagship [Dkt 67] and Zone [Dkt. 73] are GRANTED with prejudice. Defendants Flagship and Zone are dismissed from this action.The Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants Ferraro, Furr, Petrella, Trageser, Medicor, and Hamot [Dkts. 69 and 71] are each denied.Signed by Chief Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 7/26/2013. (jdg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TULLIO EMANUELE v. MEDICOR ASSOCIATES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: David Lew
Represented By: Gregory M. Simpson
Represented By: Andrew M. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TULLIO EMANUELE, M.D.
Represented By: Jamie M. Bennett
Represented By: Gregory M. Simpson
Represented By: Andrew M. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICOR ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Neal R. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLAGSHIP CARDIAC, VASCULAR AND THORACIC SURGERY OF ERIE, P.C.
Represented By: Gary D. Bax
Represented By: James D. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HAMOT MEDICAL CENTER OF THE CITY OF ERIE PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Laura E. Caravello
Represented By: Brian M. Mancos
Represented By: Stephen S. Stallings
Represented By: David B. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD W. PETRELLA, M.D.
Represented By: Neal R. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. FERRARO, M.D.
Represented By: Neal R. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES M. FURR, M.D.
Represented By: Neal R. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY C. TRAGESER, M.D.
Represented By: Neal R. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD ZONE, M.D.
Represented By: Roger H. Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?