BYRD et al v. AARON'S, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL BYRD and BRIAN BYRD
Defendant: AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S INC., DESIGNERWARE, LLC, AH & H LEASING, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., ARONA CORPORATION doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., CRAM LEASING, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., DIRIGO LEASING, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., DPR COLORADO, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., DW3, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., DWC VENTURES, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., FT GOT THREE, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., HANSON HOLDING COMPANY doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., HOWARD RENTS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., JENFOUR, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., JENKINS RENTAL, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., LTL INVESTMENTS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., NW FREEDOM CORP. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., R & DOUBLE K, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., REX NEAL, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., SEI/AARON'S, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., SHINING STAR doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., TDS FOODS, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., TUR, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC., WGC, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC. and JOHN DOES (1-45) AARON'S FRANCHISEES
Case Number: 1:2011cv00101
Filed: May 3, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2511 Wiretapping
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2020 Opinion or Order FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 05/05/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER granting #625 Stipulation filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 05/05/2020. (esa)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 625 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
April 26, 2020 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER denying as moot #585 Motion for Summary Judgment and #588 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Report by AARON'S, INC. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 03/27/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER granting #615 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 03/27/2020. (esa)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania (WDPA) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found at https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/nextgen-information. Currently, multiple attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WDPA e-filing attorneys once the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to the e-filing account. If you have an upgraded PACER account, no action is required until after the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on May 26, 2020. You have an upgraded PACER account if you (1) e-file in another NextGen court, or (2) created your PACER account after August 10, 2014. If neither of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WDPA CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Further informational notices will be sent later, but if you have questions about upgrading your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER denying #618 Defendant AspenWay's Motion to Compel Production/Release of Settlement Agreement is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/22/19. (esa)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 621 TEXT ORDER. Trial tentatively set for November 4, 2019 is canceled. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/15/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 620 RESPONSE to Motion re #618 MOTION to Compel Production of Release/Settlement Agreement by Plaintiffs and Aaron's, Inc. filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 619 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #618 Motion to Compel: Plaintiffs and Aaron's Inc. are to file a response to AspenWay's motion to compel production of release/settlement agreement by October 4, 2019. Parties should address the arguments made by AspenWay, as well as whether a motion to compel is the appropriate vehicle by which to request the relief it seeks. Response to Motion due by 10/4/2019 Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/24/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 618 MOTION to Compel Production of Release/Settlement Agreement by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 617 RESPONSE to Aspen Way's Opposition to Dismissal of Aaron's to #616 Response in Opposition, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 616 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Aaron's, Inc. to #615 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 615 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Aaron's Inc. by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 614 REPLY BRIEF re #599 Brief in Opposition to Motion, filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 613 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Material Facts to #604 Errata,, filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 612 BRIEF in Opposition to #603 Response in Opposition,, to Plaintiff's Opposition to Aspen Wauy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 611 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 598 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Related to Document #603 (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 610 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 598 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Related to Document #603 (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 609 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 598 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8) (jjg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22, #9 Exhibit 25, #10 Exhibit 26, #11 Exhibit 32) (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 608 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 598 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 607 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 598 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Related to Document #599 (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 606 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 598 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Related to Document #599 (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 605 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 598 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Related to Document #599 (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 604 Errata re #602 Response in Opposition, to Aspen Way Enterprises Inc.'s Statement of Material Facts and Counterstatement of Material Fact by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Reason for Correction: Wrong document attached. (Longer, Frederick)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 603 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Aspen Way Enterprises, Inc.'s to #576 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 filed under seal, #8 Exhibit 6 filed under seal) (Longer, Frederick)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ERROR: WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED; THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM PUBLIC VIEW; RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Aspen Way Enterprises, Inc.'s to #581 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick) Modified text on 7/31/2019. (cel)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 601 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Aaron's to #585 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 tabs 2-9 filed under seal, #6 Exhibit 4 filed under seal, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6 filed under seal, #9 Exhibit 7 filed under seal, #10 Exhibit 8 filed under seal, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19 filed under seal, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21 filed under seal, #24 Exhibit 22 filed under seal, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25 filed under seal, #28 Exhibit 26 filed under seal, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32 filed under seal) (Longer, Frederick)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 600 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Aaron's to #587 Concise Statement of Material Facts,,,,, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 599 BRIEF in Opposition re #588 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Report, #577 Motion to exclude the Report and Opinions of Professor Micah Sherr filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A filed under seal, #2 Exhibit B filed under seal, #3 Exhibit C filed under seal) (Longer, Frederick) Modified text on 8/1/2019. (jjg)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting #596 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/31/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa) Modified text on 7/31/2019. (jjg)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 597 BRIEF in Support of #596 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 596 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting #594 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Defendants to file their respective reply briefs in support of their respective Summary Judgment Motions and Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony shall be extended to and including August 19, 2019. In addition,Defendants shall each be permitted to file reply briefs in support of their Motions for Summary Judgment and Motions to Exclude Expert Testimony of up to fifteen (15) pages in length. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/19/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 593 SEALED DOCUMENT by AARON'S, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #574 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 592 SEALED DOCUMENT by AARON'S, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #574 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 591 SEALED DOCUMENT by AARON'S, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #574 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 590 SEALED DOCUMENT by AARON'S, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to #574 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 589 BRIEF in Support re #588 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Report filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kristine Brown, #2 Exhibit A (Sherr Depo Tr.), #3 Exhibit B (AW Lease Agreement), #4 Exhibit C (Hearing Tr.), #5 Exhibit D (Sherr Report)) (Brown, Kristine) Modified text on 7/1/2019. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 588 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony and Report by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 587 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS by Aaron's, Inc. re #585 Motion for Summary Judgment by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Concise Statement, #2 Affidavit of Kristine Brown, #3 Exhibit A to Brown Decl. (Harvey Tr.), #4 Exhibit B to Brown Decl. (Lampi Tr.), #5 Exhibit C to Brown Decl. (AW Payments), #6 Exhibit D to Brown Decl. (AW FTC Resp.), #7 Exhibit E to Brown Decl. (Kelly Tr.), #8 Exhibit F to Brown Decl. (Hearing Tr.), #9 Exhibit G to Brown Decl. (Welch Tr.), #10 Exhibit H to Brown Decl. (Schabel Tr.), #11 Exhibit I to Brown Decl. (Trainor Tr.), #12 Exhibit J to Brown Decl. (Butler Tr.), #13 Exhibit K to Brown Decl. (Morales Tr.), #14 Exhibit L to Brown Decl. (C. Byrd Agr.), #15 Exhibit M to Brown Decl. (Memo. 339), #16 Exhibit N to Brown Decl. (Am. Compl.), #17 Exhibit O to Brown Decl. (Am. Answer), #18 Exhibit P to Brown Decl. (Sherr Report), #19 Exhibit Q to Brown Decl. (AW FZ Agr. SEALED), #20 Exhibit R to Brown Decl. (Sherr Tr.), #21 Exhibit S to Brown Decl. (ECF 555), #22 Exhibit T to Brown Decl. (ECF 318)) (Brown, Kristine)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 586 BRIEF in Support re #585 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 585 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 584 SEALED DOCUMENT by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to 579 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 583 SEALED DOCUMENT by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. This document Sealed pursuant to 579 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 582 DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL (This document Sealed pursuant to 579 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal), by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (jjg).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 581 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #576 Motion for Summary Judgment by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 580 TEXT ORDER. Defendant Aspen Way is directed to file a Concise Statement of Material Facts in accordance with Local Rule 56(B)(1) in support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/28/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting #575 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred.Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/28/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa) Modified text on 6/28/2019. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 578 BRIEF in Support re #577 Motion to Exclude Reports and Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony) Modified text on 7/1/2019. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION to Exclude Reports and Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony) Modified text on 7/1/2019. (jjg)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 576 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Appendix) (Williott, Anthony)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 575 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting #573 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 06/25/19. (esa) Modified text on 6/26/2019. (jjg)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 572 ORDER granting #571 Motion for depositions: with the consent of all parties and with good cause shown, it is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the depositions of Plaintiffs Crystal and Brian Byrd may be conducted after the May 23, 2019 fact discovery deadline, but no later than June 23, 2019. All other deadlines set forth in this Courts January 23, 2019 Order shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/29/19. (lrw)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 571 Consent MOTION for Leave to Conduct Depositions Outside Discovery Deadline re #565 Telephonic Status Conference,, Set Deadlines, by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 570 AMENDED ANSWER to #296 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses to Corrected Third Amended Complaint by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Amended ANSWER to #134 Amended Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses to Corrected Third Amended Complaint by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. (Williott, Anthony) Modified text on 2/12/2019. (jjg)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 568 STANDING ORDER on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/1/19. (lrw)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER that: 1. Plaintiffs shall serve the report of any testifying expert pursuant to Rule 26 containing all opinions the expert may offer at summary judgment or trial with respect to Plaintiffs individual claims and Defendants defenses thereto no later than February 22, 2019. 2. Plaintiffs shall make their expert available for deposition no later than March 25, 2019.3. Defendants shall serve the reports of any testifying expert(s) pursuant to Rule 26 containing all opinions the expert(s) may offer at summary judgment or trial with respect to Plaintiffs individual claims and Defendants defenses thereto no later than April 23, 2019. 4. Defendants shall make their expert(s) available for deposition no later than May 23, 2019. 5. All expert and fact discovery shall be completed by May 23, 2019, with fact discovery limitedto depositions of the Plaintiffs. 6. Summary judgment motions and Daubert motions shall be filed by June 28, 2019. 7. Responses to summary judgment motions and Daubert motions shall be due July 31, 2019. 8. Replies to responses for summary judgment motions and Daubert motions shall be due August 9, 2019.9. Trial is tentatively scheduled for November 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/29/19. (lrw)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Proposed Order by AARON'S, INC.. (Devlin, Neal)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 565 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/23/2019. All Discovery due by 5/23/2019; fact discovery is limited to depositions of the Byrds. Summary Judgment due by 6/28/2019. Response to Summary Judgment Motion due by 7/31/2019; Reply to Response due by 8/9/2019. Trial is tentatively scheduled for November 4, 2019. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) (lrw)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 564 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to reopen this case. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/23/2019 at 2:00 PM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER OF USCA denying Petition for Leave to Appeal. (jjg)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter for all further proceedings. Susan Paradise Baxter and Judge Cathy Bissoon no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 1:18-mc-50. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/17/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, ) Modified on 9/18/2018. (admin1, ) Modified on 9/18/2018. (admin1, )
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER granting #560 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard A. Lanzillo terminated as counsel for Defendant Aaron's, Inc. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/13/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report of the Parties by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER. In light of the parties' Joint Status Report (Doc. #557 ), the case will remain stayed pending the parties' scheduled mediation on May 2, 2018 before Judge James R. Melinson. Thereafter, any party may move to lift the stay in this matter, as appropriate. Should there be a motion to lift the stay by any party, the Court will entertain a joint motion for an in-person status conference to discuss case management issues. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/26/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 STATUS REPORT Joint status report of the parties by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. (Williott, Anthony) (Main Document #557 replaced on 3/27/2018) (jd)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER. Consistent with the Court's Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration entered today (Doc. #555 ), Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. #526 , #529 ) are DENIED as moot, without prejudice to Defendants refiling their Motions if and when appropriate. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/7/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting #523 Motion for Reconsideration. As Wyoming now recognizes the tort of invasion of privacy, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration #523 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Court's March 31, 2014 Memorandum Order #339 is VACATED to the extent that it dismissed Plaintiffs' invasion of privacy claim under Wyoming law. Plaintiff's invasion of privacy claim is REINSTATED. This matter hereby is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED for a period of thirty (30) days, until April 6, 2018. During this period, the parties and their counsel shall personally meet and confer about the following: (1) what the next steps should be in this already seven-year-old case; (2) the ramifications of todays decision on the issue of class certification; and (3) whether additional mediation efforts would be beneficial in this case. On or before April 6, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating their respective positions on these issues and a proposed schedule for any proposed next steps. It is expected that the parties and their counsel will make every effort to reach consensus on these issues. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/7/18. (rdl) Modified on 3/16/2018. (jd)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 554 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD re #523 Motion for Reconsideration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Longer, Frederick)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER, Upon consideration of Defendants Unopposed Motion for Limited One Week Extension and Extension of Page Limits #551 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This Courts Order of January 24, 2018 #536 , shall be modified as followed: The deadline for Defendants to file their respective reply briefs in support of their respective summary judgment motions shallbe extended to and including March 16, 2018. In addition, Defendants shall each be permitted to file reply briefs in support of their motions for summary judgment of up to fifteen (15) pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/2/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 552 BRIEF in Support re #551 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, filed by AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. (Brown, Kristine)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 550 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Aspen Way Enterprises Inc. to #526 Motion for Summary Judgment, #527 Brief in Support of Motion, #528 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit of Frederick S. Longer, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (Longer, Frederick)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 549 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Aspen Way Enterprises Inc. to #526 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 548 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to #547 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 19, #8 Exhibit 21, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 25, #11 Exhibit 26) (jd)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER granting #542 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Plaintiffs are granted leave: (a) Leave to file information identified in this Motion under seal; (b) Leave to file unredacted copies of their Response in Opposition to Defendant Aarons Motion for Summary Judgment; Plaintiffs Response to Defendant Aarons Inc.s Concise Statement of Material Facts; Declaration of Frederick S. Longer and exhibits thereto; and Tabs 2-9 to the Declaration of Micha Sherr under seal. (c) That Plaintiffs be granted leave to file, on the public docket, a redacted version of its Response in Opposition to Aarons Motion for Summary Judgment and a redacted version of Plaintiffs Response to Aarons Inc.s concise Statement of Material facts and certain exhibits thereto, in which all confidential information is redacted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/21/18. (lrw)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 546 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #529 Motion for Summary Judgment, #530 Brief in Support of Motion, #531 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Affidavit Frederick S. Longer, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 tabs 2-9 filed under seal, #6 Exhibit 4 filed under seal, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6 filed under seal, #9 Exhibit 7 filed under seal, #10 Exhibit 8 filed under seal, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19 filed under seal, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21 filed under seal, #24 Exhibit 22 filed under seal, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25 filed under seal, #28 Exhibit 26 filed under seal, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31) (Longer, Frederick)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 545 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 544 TEXT ORDER granting #540 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #536 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Response due by 2/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/21/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 BRIEF in Support re #542 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 541 BRIEF in Support re #540 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 540 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #536 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 539 REPLY BRIEF re #523 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (jd)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER granting #537 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Reply to #532 . The Clerk of Courts is directed to file Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion #537 as Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in support of their Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/30/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 537 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Invasion of Privacy Claims by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Longer, Frederick)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting #534 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #526 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #529 MOTION for Summary Judgment:This Courts Order of December 5, 2017 #522 , shall be modified as followed: Plaintiffs responses to the defendants motions for summary judgment shall be due Wednesday, February 21, 2018, and Defendants may submit reply briefs no later than Friday, March 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/24/18. (lrw)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 BRIEF in Support re #534 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 534 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #533 Motion for Summary Judgment. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Filed as Exhibit F to Motion for Summary Judgment. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Exhibit F to Aspen Way's Motion for Summary Judgment by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Williott, Anthony) Modified on 1/24/2018, filed incorrectly as a Motion for Summary Judgment. (jd)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 532 BRIEF in Opposition re #523 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 531 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS BY AARON'S, INC. re #529 Motion for Summary Judgment, #530 Brief in Support of Motion by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix to Concise Statement, #2 Affidavit Brown Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. A to Brown Decl. (Harvey Tr.), #4 Exhibit Ex. B to Brown Decl. (Lampi Tr.), #5 Exhibit Ex. C to Brown Decl. (AW Payments), #6 Exhibit Ex. D to Brown Decl. (FTC Resp.), #7 Exhibit Ex. E to Brown Decl. (Kelly Tr.), #8 Exhibit Ex. F to Brown Decl. (Hearing Tr.), #9 Exhibit Ex. G to Brown Decl. (Welch Tr.), #10 Exhibit Ex. H to Brown Decl. (Schabel Tr.), #11 Exhibit Ex. I to Brown Decl. (Trainor Tr.), #12 Exhibit Ex. J to Brown Decl. (Butler Tr.), #13 Exhibit Ex. K to Brown Decl. (Morales Tr.), #14 Exhibit Ex. L to Brown Decl. (C. Byrd Agr.), #15 Exhibit Ex. M to Brown Decl. (Memo Order), #16 Exhibit Ex. N to Brown Decl. (Compl. Excerpts), #17 Exhibit Ex. O to Brown Decl. (AW Answer Excerpts), #18 Exhibit Ex. P to Brown Decl. (Original Sherr Report)) (Brown, Kristine)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 530 BRIEF in Support re #529 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 528 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #526 Motion for Summary Judgment, #527 Brief in Support of Motion by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 527 BRIEF in Support re #526 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 526 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix) (Williott, Anthony)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER. Responses, if any, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration #523 shall be due on or before 1/22/2018. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/10/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #523 Motion for Reconsideration. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in support. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 524 BRIEF in Support re #523 Motion for Reconsideration, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (sdp)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 523 MOTION for Reconsideration re #339 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER, as there has been no stay of these proceedings by either the district judge or the Court of Appeals under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions for summary judgment are due January 16, 2018, oppositions thereto are due February 6, 2018, and reply briefs are due February 13, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/5/17. (lrw)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 521 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Statue Conference held on October 17, 2017 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 10/25/2017. Redaction Request due 11/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2018. (jd) Modified on 4/13/2018. (jd)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 10/17/2017. Parties advised that Plaintiffs are pursuing an appeal to the Third Circuit on the class certification issue. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 519 TEXT ORDER, due to a scheduling conflict, the Status Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 2:00 PM has been RE-SCHEDULED for 10/17/2017 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/28/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 518 TEXT ORDER, Status Conference via telephone set for 10/10/2017 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/27/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 517 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The Renewed Motion to Certify Class #439 is DENIED, and the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Baxter dated August 4, 2017 #507 , as augmented herein, is hereby ADOPTED as the opinion of the District Court. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/26/17. (rdl)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief #513 and Defendant's Response in Opposition #515 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Proposed Reply does not offer new information for the Court's consideration. The arguments presented therein have previously been raised in Plaintiffs' briefs. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/26/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 515 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief to #513 Motion for Leave to File, filed by AARON'S, INC. (Brown, Kristine)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Proposed Order re #513 Motion for Leave to File, Reply Brief in Support of Objection to Report and Recommendation on Renewed Motion to Certify Class by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #513 Motion for Leave to File. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation on Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Certify Class by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Longer, Frederick)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 512 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #508 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 511 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report & Recommendations to #508 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Williott, Anthony)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER upon consideration of the #509 joint motion for satisfaction of sanctions submitted by Plaintiffs and Aspen Way, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that said Motion is GRANTED and the docket shall indicate that any and all monetary sanctions sought by Plaintiffs have been resolved and satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/28/17. (lrw)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Joint MOTION re #419 MOTION for Sanctions filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD Joint Motion for Satisfaction by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 508 OBJECTIONS to #507 Report and Recommendation (On Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Certify Class) filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 507 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD be denied. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 08/04/2017. (kas)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Judge Baxter's Order granting Defendant Aaron's, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report (Doc. #497 ) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/4/17. (jwr)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 RESPONSE to #504 Notice, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 504 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD re #496 Memorandum Opinion & Order (Hirsch, Andrea)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 503 RESPONSE to #500 Objections, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 502 BRIEF in Opposition to #500 Objections, filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 30, 2017 before Judge Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 4/20/2017. Redaction Request due 5/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2017. (jd)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 500 OBJECTIONS to #496 Memorandum Opinion & Order by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 499 NOTICE of Filing by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD re #439 Motion to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpt of Clint Welch) (Hirsch, Andrea)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Motion Hearing held on 3/30/2017 re #439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Oral argument held. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER, for the reasons set forth in the memorandum opinion filed contemporaneously herewith, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report #469 is GRANTED. In accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 72, the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from the date of service to file written objections to this Order. Failure to file timely objections may constitute a waiver of rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/22/17. (lrw)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MEMORANDUM OPINION that #469 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report filed by AARON'S, INC., will be granted. An appropriate Order to follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/22/17. (lrw)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 2/2/2017. Request to have notecards included as an exhibit at the deposition is denied. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 RESPONSE to #492 Notice, filed by AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE of Cross-Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Aspen Way by AARON'S, INC. re #484 Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Brown, Kristine)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 NOTICE of Filing by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD re #439 Motion to Certify Class (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hirsch, Andrea)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 491 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 24, 2017 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 2/2/2017. Redaction Request due 2/16/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2017. (jd)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 490 NOTICE of Filing by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD re #424 Supplement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hirsch, Andrea)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 REPLY to Response to Motion re #469 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Brown, Kristine)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 488 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class: Oral Argument set for 3/30/2017 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom B - Erie before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/24/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 487 TEXT ORDER granting #477 Motion for Oral Argument re #439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class. Oral argument set for March 30, 2017 at 1:00 PM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Courtroom B, Erie, PA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/24/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 1/24/2017. Motion for oral argument granted on the record; text order to follow. Deposition of Clint Welch set for 2/2/2017. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 485 TEXT ORDER, Status Conference via telephone set for 1/24/2017 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/19/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #483 Notice of Change of Address. ERROR: It is the attorney's responsibility to update their address through the CM/ECF system. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 484 NOTICE of Deposition (30(b)(6)) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD (Hirsch, Andrea)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrea S. Hirsch (Hirsch, Andrea)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 482 TEXT ORDER granting #479 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Aaron's Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/17/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 RESPONSE to Motion re #475 MOTION to Strike #469 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 480 BRIEF in Support re #479 Motion for Leave to File, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Brown, Kristine)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Aaron's Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 JOINDER of ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. to #469 Motion to Strike. (jd)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #475 Motion to Strike. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as JOINDER IN MOTION TO STRIKE. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #477 MOTION Oral Argument re #439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 MOTION Oral Argument re #439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Longer, Frederick)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 BRIEF in Support re #469 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 MOTION to Strike #469 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Williott, Anthony)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 474 RESPONSE to Motion re #469 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Longer, Frederick)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 Errata re #472 Notice, by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Reason for Correction: Attorney Signature. (Konieczny, Edward)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #472 Notice. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. Additionally, it is the Attorneys responsibility to keep their contact information updated by going into "Maintain My Account" in the Utilities on CM/ECF (jd)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel and Change of Address by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD (Hirsch, Andrea)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #469 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's New Expert Report: Response to Motion due by 1/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/19/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 470 BRIEF in Support re #469 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (Brown, Kristine)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' New Expert Report by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 468 REPLY BRIEF re #419 Motion for Sanctions, (Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Sanctions) filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Hirsch, Andrea)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 5, 2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 12/13/2016. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (jd)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 12/5/2016. Aspen Way questions and objections to questions are due December 16, 2016. December 23, 2016 and January 3, 2017 deadlines are cancelled. Deposition of Clint Welch will be in person in Atlanta by February 7, 2017 and is limited to one day (of 7 hours). Plaintiffs may file a Reply in support of the Motion for Sanctions within 10 days. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 12/02/16 462 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Exhibit 2 and Exhibit 4) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4) (jd)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 BRIEF in Opposition re #419 Motion for Sanctions, (Supplemental) filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 463 REPLY BRIEF re #439 Motion to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9) (Longer, Frederick)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 462 TEXT ORDER granting #461 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/2/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 461 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Hirsch, Andrea)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 18, 2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 11/28/2016. Redaction Request due 12/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/21/2017. (jd)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 11/18/2016. Aspen Way may file response to Plaintiffs' supplement #458 by December 2, 2016. Plaintiffs' reply brief to Motion to Certify is due December 2, 2016. Plaintiffs' and Aaron's Inc. to file deposition questions by December 2, 2016. Status Conference set for December 5, 2016 at 11:00 AM. Plaintiffs are to initial the telephone call. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/5/2016 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. (lrw)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 SUPPLEMENT by CRYSTAL BYRD to #419 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Hirsch, Andrea)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 SEALED DOCUMENT BRIEF IN OPPOSITION by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to 449 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jd)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 SEALED DOCUMENT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by AARON'S, INC.. This document Sealed pursuant to 447 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal, 447 filed 11/3/16 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aviel Rubin, part one, #2 Declaration of Aviel Rubin, part two) (jd) Modified on 11/8/2016. (jd)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions held on November 3, 2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 11/14/2016. Redaction Request due 11/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2017. (jd)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER that the motion for sanctions #419 is dismissed without prejudice in part and taken under advisement in part. The portion of Plaintiffs motion requesting an adverse inference is dismissed without prejudice. At the hearing, the Court directed that the parties are to conduct the deposition of Aspen Ways Rule 30(b)(6) designee Clint Welch by written questions, proceeding under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 31. The portion of Plaintiffs motion requesting monetary relief has been taken under advisement and Plaintiffs have been directed to supplement the record in this regard. Such supplementation should be filed before November 15, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/7/16. (lrw)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 SUPPLEMENT by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD to #419 Motion for Sanctions. (lrw) (Main Document #453 replaced on 11/7/2016) (lrw) Modified on 11/7/2016. (lrw)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 REDACTION BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Williott, Anthony)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 451 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #439 Motion to Certify Class, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kristine M. Brown, #2 Exhibit A - Kelly Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Aviel Rubin, #4 Exhibit C - Casper Police Department Report, #5 Exhibit D - Kinion Complaint, #6 Exhibit E - Howard Complaint, #7 Exhibit F - Winn Complaint, #8 Exhibit G - Price Complaint, #9 Exhibit H - Aaron's FTC Consent Decree, #10 Exhibit I - California Consent Decree, #11 Exhibit J - Designerware FTC Consent Decree, #12 Exhibit K - AW FTC Consent Decree, #13 Exhibit L - Peterson Complaint, #14 Exhibit M - Sneed Complaint, #15 Exhibit N - Crystal Byrd Deposition Transcript, #16 Exhibit O - Price Affidavit) (Brown, Kristine)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Motion Hearing held on 11/3/2016 re #419 MOTION for Sanctions filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. The Court set the following deadlines: Deposition by written questions: Plaintiff is given 100 questions, including sub-parts, to be served by 12/2/16. Defendant Aarons 100 questions to be served by 12/2/16. Aspen Way 50 cross questions to be served by 12/16/16. Plaintiffs allowed 50 re-direct questions by 12/23/16. Aarons 25 redirect questions by 12/23/16. Aspen Way - 25 re-cross questions by 1/3/17. Mr. Welch is to go before a court reporter at Aspen Ways expense. All questions to be answered by 2/7/17. Transcript to be sent to the parties within 20 days at Aspen Ways expense. Status Conference via telephone set for 11/18/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs are to initiate the call. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 TEXT ORDER granting #448 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/3/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 TEXT ORDER granting #446 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/3/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 TEXT ORDER denying #444 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/25/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 444 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #439 Motion to Certify Class: Brief in Opposition due by 11/4/2016. Replies due by 11/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/18/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 SEALED DOCUMENT (EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF #441 MEMORANDUM OF LAW) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 10-14-16 438 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (jd)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 SEALED DOCUMENT (MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORTOF THEIR RENEWED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 10/14/16 438 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (jd)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 440 BRIEF in Support re #439 Motion to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 part 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit B) (Longer, Frederick)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. Responses due by 10/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 TEXT ORDER granting #437 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/14/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hirsch, Andrea)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 7, 2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 10/18/2016. Redaction Request due 11/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2017. (jd)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 10/7/2016. Motion for class certification due by 10/14/2016. Argument on motion for sanctions set for 11/3/2016 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 SEALED DOCUMENT by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC, Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions. This document Sealed pursuant to 433 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (jd) (Main Document #434 replaced on 10/6/2016) (jd)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 433 TEXT ORDER granting #429 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/5/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 SEALED DOCUMENT (DEFENDANT AARON'S, INC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS). This document Sealed pursuant to 426 Text Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (jd)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 REDACTED RESPONSE to #419 MOTION for Sanctions Aaron's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Brown, Kristine) Modified on 10/4/2016. (dm)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 REDACTED BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to #419 MOTION for Sanctions Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Sanctions by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony) Modified on 10/4/2016. (dm)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 TEXT ORDER, Status Conference via telephone set for 10/7/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/28/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #419 Motion for Sanctions: Response to Motion due by 10/3/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/27/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 TEXT ORDER granting #425 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/27/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brown, Kristine)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 SUPPLEMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD to #419 Motion for Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Proposed Order re #419 Motion for Sanctions, by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Notice) (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 TEXT ORDER. In accordance with the Local Rules of this Court, all motions are to be accompanied by a proposed order. Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions does not comply with Local Rule 7. Plaintiffs must file the proposed order before September 23, 2016. The proposed order must detail the relief that Plaintiffs seek in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/19/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SEALED DOCUMENT (Brief in Support) This document Sealed pursuant to 420 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit E) (dm)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting #418 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/16/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MOTION for Sanctions by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #418 Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Hirsch, Andrea)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 9, 2016 before Judge SUSAN PARADISE BAXTER. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 8/17/2016. Redaction Request due 8/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2016. (jd)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 8/9/2016. Conference held to discuss the upcoming deposition of John Pollack. Although Pollack was previously deposed, his deposition ended abruptly and prematurely. This Court suggests that the continuation of Pollack's deposition can be completed in one day. If problems arise, parties may file written motion. Pollack deposition shall not extend into a second day unless agreed to by all parties including deponent. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 TEXT ORDER, Status Conference via telephone set for 8/9/2016 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/4/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER STAYING CASE, ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. This case hereby is STAYED pending the completion of the deposition of John Pollock, Aspen Ways Rule 30(b)(6) designee. For the duration of the stay, this case is and shall remain ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Administrative closings comprise a familiar way in which courts remove cases from their active files without final adjudication. Administrative closure is a docket control device used by the Court for statistical purposes, and it does not prejudice the rights of the parties in any manner. As and when appropriate, any party may restore this action to the Courts active calendar upon application or by motion Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/7/2016. (dm)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 413 STATUS REPORT June 2016 Status Report by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on June 6, 2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 6/13/2016. Redaction Request due 6/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/6/2016. (jd)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 6/6/2016. Deposition of John Pollock must be completed by August 31, 2016. Attorney Williot must provide other parties with dates of availability by June 15, 2016. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 410 TEXT ORDER, Status Conference via telephone set for 6/6/2016 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/1/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 409 STATUS REPORT by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 STATUS REPORT by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 4/6/2016. Motion for Class Certification is due October 14, 2016. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 4/6/2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 4/13/2016. Redaction Request due 4/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2016. (dm)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 STATUS REPORT to Judge Susan Baxter by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 TEXT ORDER, Status Conference via telephone set for 4/6/2016 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/24/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 NOTICE of Confirmation of Witness Designation in Response to Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition, by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. (Williott, Anthony)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER granting #399 Motion to Extend Time. Aspen Way shall notify the Court of its intention to maintain its designation of John Pollock as a 30(b)(6) designee, or seek to designate substitute 30(b)(6) designees no later than March 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/8/16. (lrw)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 RESPONSE to Motion re #399 MOTION to Extend Time to complete deposition filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 TEXT ORDER. Parties may filed a response to Aspen Way's motion to extend time (ECF No. #399 ) before March 10, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 3/7/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 MOTION to Extend Time to complete deposition by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 2/26/2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 3/8/2016. Redaction Request due 3/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2016. (dm)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 2/26/2016. Aspen Way was unsuccessful in attempts to contact John Pollock. Aspen Way to notify the Court by 3/4/16. Counsel for other parties to respond by 3/11/16. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 TEXT ORDER granting #395 Motion for Donald M. Houser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/26/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION for attorney Donald M. Houser to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-3875443) by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Houser, Donald)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 2/24/2016 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 3/3/2016. Redaction Request due 3/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2016. (dm)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 2/24/2016. Status Conference via telephone set for 2/26/2016 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Plaintiffs are to initiate the telephone conference. Attorney Williot is to report on the availability of 30(b)(6) witness. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 392 SEALED Transcript of Status Conference held 1/28/2016 before the Honorable Susan Paradise Baxter. (dm)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Telephone Conference held on 1/28/2016. Status Conference set for 2/24/2016 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Plaintiffs are to initiate the telephonic conference. No status report is due tomorrow. Discovery deadline of 2/20/2016 is canceled. Motion for class certification deadline of 2/26/2016 is canceled. Transcript is to be filed under seal. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 STATUS REPORT to Judge Baxter by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 389 STATUS REPORT Monthly Report to Judge Baxter by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 388 STATUS REPORT to Judge by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/15/2015 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 10/23/2015. Redaction Request due 11/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2016. (dm)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 10/15/2015. Motion for Class Certification due by 2/26/2016. Counsel will notify Court at the end of every month in the interim. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 385 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 9/22/2015 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ron Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 9/30/2015. Redaction Request due 10/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2015. (dm)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 9/22/2015. Status Conference via telephone set for 10/15/2015 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE to Counsel re Sealed Documents - In accordance with this Courts ECF Policies and Procedures, and the appeal time having expired, all sealed documents filed in the above referenced case that were not designated as being permanently sealed or the court having provided a specific date for unsealing, will be unsealed and made publicly available through the ECF system. If the documents should remain sealed, you must file a motion and order (Using the Motion to Continue Seal event) at (Misc. No. 13-69 (2:13-mc-69)) that states with specificity the reason(s) why the seal must continue, and a proposed date by which counsel suggests the seal should be lifted. A copy of this notice (NEF) must be attached to the motion. Service of the motion will not be made on opposing counsel through the ECF system. It is the filer's responsibility to make service of the motion on counsel of record. Said motion must be filed within 14 days of the entry of this notice. The sealed documents are: #307 Sealed Document, #221 Sealed Document, 290 Sealed Document, #308 Sealed Document, #306 Sealed Document filed by Frederick Longer, Esq. and Richard Lanzillo, Esq.. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. Motion to Continue Seal due by 9/25/2015. (dm)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 8/25/2015 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ron Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 9/2/2015. Redaction Request due 9/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2015. (dm)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 7/28/2015 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janis Ferguson, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 9/1/2015. Redaction Request due 9/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015. (dm)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 8/25/2015. All items are to be produced to Plaintiffs by 9/18/2015. Status Conference via telephone set for 9/22/2015 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is to initiate the conference call. Parties are to cooperate in discovery. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2015: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Exhibits A-D) (lrw).
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER, after the court reporting firm of Ferguson and Holdnack provided transcription services for the status conference held July 27, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED that a transcript of the proceedings be produced and filed with the Clerk of Court. All costs to be borne by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/25/15. (lrw)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #378 Motion for Discovery. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 379 BRIEF in Support of August 25 Discovery Conference filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. (dm)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 MOTION for Discovery Memorandum for August 25 Discovery Conference by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Williott, Anthony) Modified on 8/27/2015 removed from public view; refiled at #379 (dm)
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 377 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 7/29/2015. Aspen Way is to produce all electronic data related to customers on the Master List (167 customers) by August 21, 2015. Status Conference via telephone set for 8/25/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is to initiate the conference call. (Court Reporter: Sondra Black) (lrw)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 376 TEXT ORDER. At the request of the parties, the status conference set for July 27, 2015, has been rescheduled to 8:30 am on July 29, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/27/2015. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/24/2015 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 7/2/2015. Redaction Request due 7/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2015. (dm)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 TEXT ORDER directing that Defendant Aspen Way produce the 167 customer files (including lease agreements and police reports that activated Detective Mode) by July 24, 2015. Conference call will be held on July 27, 2015 at 10:00 am. Counsel for Plaintiffs is to arrange telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/24/2015. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Discovery Hearing held on 6/24/2015. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css) (dm)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 372 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 5/26/2015 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 6/5/2015. Redaction Request due 6/19/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/29/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2015. (dm)
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 5/26/2015. Motion to Certify Class due by 7/10/2015. Response to Motion due by 8/10/2015. Reply to Response due by 8/21/2015. Discovery is not stayed. Aspen Way must respond to previous discovery requests within 30 days. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 370 TEXT ORDER, Status Conference via telephone set for 5/26/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Counsel for Plaintiffs is directed to make arrangements for all parties to participate by conference call on the above date and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/12/15. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 369 TEXT ORDER. Counsel are hereby reminded of their obligation under Local Rule 7 to provide a proposed order of court attached to every motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/8/2015. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 368 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #367 Motion to Reopen Case; granting #367 Motion for Status Conference. Status conference will be scheduled by separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/8/2015. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Joint MOTION to Reopen Case, Joint MOTION for Hearing re #361 Order Staying Case, Statistical Case Closing, Request for Scheduling Conference by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MANDATE of USCA as to #358 Notice of Appeal, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD Reversing and Remanding judgment/order of the district court. Costs taxed in favor of Appellants in the amount of $1511.33. (Attachments: #1 USCA Opinion, #2 USCA Order Amending Opinion) (cjg3 )
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 JUDGMENT OF USCA as to #358 Notice of Appeal, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD Reversing and Remanding judgment/order of the district court. Mandate will follow. (cjg3)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Landon Y. Jones by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC (Jones, Landon)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER of USCA as to #358 Notice of Appeal, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD The foregoing Motion by Appellee Aarons Inc. to Continue Impoundment of Previously Sealed Documents is GRANTED. Docket Nos. #221 , 290 , #306 , #307 and #308 shall remain under seal until five years after the conclusion of this case. (dm)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER STAYING CASE, ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. The case hereby is STAYED pending resolution of the appeal. (See Doc. #360 ). For the duration of the stay, this case is and shall remain ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/20/2014. (sje)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Appeal Filing fee: $505, receipt number 14668001968 (dm)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTIFICATION TO THIRD CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #359 Appeal Filing Fee Received (dm)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER OF USCA granting Petition for Leave to Appeal (cjg3)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 358 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #340 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion to Certify Class by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Filing fee $505, Receipt # 14668001968. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): Ron Bench, Janis Ferguson, Sondra Black. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (dm)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER denying #350 Motion for Certification of Orders for Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/12/2014. (sje)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 356 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/29/2014 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janis L. Ferguson, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/8/2014. Redaction Request due 5/22/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2014. (dm)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 355 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Requests for Production and Interrogatories) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ANSWER to #296 Amended Complaint by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 353 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Aspen Way's #350 motion for Certification of Interloctory Appeal, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Case Management Conference held on 4/29/2014. Settlement discussions held off the record. Plaintiff's have filed a Request for Permission to Appeal under Rule 23(f) with the Third Circuit at 14-8037. Request filed 4/14/2014 and Oppositions to Request filed 4/28/2014. Discovery due by 7/31/2014. Status Conference via telephone set for 8/1/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) (lrw)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER re #350 Motion for Certification of Orders for Interlocutory Appeal filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., Set Response: Response to Motion due by 5/2/2014. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/28/14. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 351 BRIEF in Support re #350 Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 350 MOTION for Certification of Orders for Interlocutory Appeal by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 349 STIPULATION re #343 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint re #134 Amended Complaint, by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. (Williott, Anthony)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER denying as moot #343 Motion to Dismiss, in light of the Stipulation filed at Doc. #349 . Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/22/2014. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sje)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER denying #341 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 4/17/2014. (sje)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RESPONSE to Motion re #341 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 346 RESPONSE to Motion re #341 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by AH & H LEASING, LLC, AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY, J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ANSWER to #296 Amended Complaint by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 344 BRIEF in Support re #343 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint re #296 Third Amended Complaint by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Williott, Anthony) Modified on 4/15/2014 to properly link motion to amended complaint (dm)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #341 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Brief in Opposition due by 4/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/10/2014. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 342 BRIEF in Support re #341 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER, Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2014 at 2:00 PM has been RE-SCHEDULED for 4/29/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Room A280, Erie, PA. All counsel is to appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/4/14. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER, Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Room A280, Erie, PA. All counsel is to appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/2/14. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER adopting #319 Report and Recommendation; denying #174 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/31/2014. (sje)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER adopting in part Report and Recommendations re #318 Report and Recommendations; granting #192 Motion to Dismiss; granting #194 Motion to Dismiss; granting #298 Motion for Joinder; granting #299 Motion for Joinder; granting #300 Motion for Joinder; denying #161 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. As more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/31/2014. (sje)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER VACATING the March 20, 2012 Order (Doc. #95 ), as to the issue of personal jurisdiction over Defendant Aspen Way. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/26/2014. (sje)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 337 BRIEF in Support of Notice, filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order NOTICE of the Court's intent to vacate the March 20, 2012 Order (Doc. #95 ) as to the issue of personal jurisdiction over Defendant Aspen Way. Any motions and/or briefing in opposition shall be filed by the close of business on Tuesday, 3/25/2014. Such briefs shall be limited to ten pages in length. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. (sje)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #336 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/19/2014. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sje)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Mancos, Brian)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Plaintiff's REPLY to #328 Response in Opposition, #330 Response, #329 Response, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (dm)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #333 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The Clerk's Office is kindly directed to file Exhibit A at Doc. #333 as Plaintiffs' Reply to Docs. #328 , #329 , and #330 . Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/10/2014. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sje)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation on Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Longer, Frederick)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Defendant Aaron's REPLY to #324 Response in Opposition. (dm)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #331 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The Clerk's Office is kindly directed to file Exhibit A at Doc. #331 as Defendant Aaron's Inc.'s Reply to Doc. #324 . Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/5/2014. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sje)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' JOINT OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AARON'S, INC.'S AND ASPEN WAY'S OBJECTIONS TO THE JANUARY 27, 2014 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lanzillo, Richard)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 330 RESPONSE to #323 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 329 RESPONSE to #323 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiffs' Objections to U.S. Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter's Report and Recommendation on Class Certification to #323 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 327 RESPONSE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT & RECOMMENDATION ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CORRECTED THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (NOTE: INCORRECTLY DESIGNATED BY PLAINTIFFS AS RECOMMENDATION & REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER) to #321 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by AARON'S, INC. (Lanzillo, Richard) Modified on 2/25/2014. (dm)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 326 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #321 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by ARONA CORPORATION. (Strother, Todd) Modified on 2/25/2014. (dm)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #321 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by AH & H LEASING, LLC, AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY, J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN) (Bizar, Steven) Modified on 2/25/2014. (dm)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 324 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Defendant Aaron's, Inc.'s and Aspen Way's Objections to #318 Report and Recommendation, #322 Objections to Report and Recommendation, #320 Objections, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #321 Objections to Special Master's Report and Recommendation. ERROR: Judge Baxter is not a Special Master. CORRECTION: Clerk corrected docket entry. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 323 OBJECTIONS to #319 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge to Deny Class Certification by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 OBJECTIONS to #318 Report and Recommendation by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 321 OBJECTIONS to #318 Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Corrected Third Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 part 3) (Longer, Frederick) Modified on 2/18/2014. (dm)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 320 OBJECTIONS to #318 January 27, 2014 Report and Recommendations by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Williott, Anthony)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #174 MOTION to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/31/14. (lrw)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that: The motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Aspen Way Enterprises #161 should be DENIED; The motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Aarons, Inc. #163 should be GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.It is further recommended that the following motions be granted due to lack of subject matter jurisdiction based on Plaintiffs lack of standing: The motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Arona Corporation #192 be GRANTED ; The motion to dismiss filed by Defendants AH&H Leasing, LLC, Bear Rental Purchase, Ltd., Boxer Enterprise, Inc., Circle City Rentals, CMH Leasing Partners, LLC, CRAM Leasing, Inc., DC Sales & Lease, Inc., Dirigo Leasing, Inc., DPR Alaska, LLC, DPR Colorado, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC Ventures, LLC, Fairway Leasing, LLC, Five Star Financials, LLC, FT Got Three, LLC, GNS & Associates, Inc., Green Fiver Corporation, Hanson Holding Company, Honey Harbor Investments, LLC, Howard Rents, LLC, HPH Investments, LLC, J&L Beach Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Rents, Inc., Jenfour, LLC, Jenkins Rental, LLC, KFJ Enterprises, LLC, Lifestyle Furniture Leasing, Madison Capital Investments, Inc., MKW Investments, Inc., No Three Putts Enterprises, LLC, NW Freedom Corporation, Pomona Lane Partners, LLC, R & Double K, LLC, Rebco Investments, LLC, Rex Neal, Inc., Royal Rents, Inc., Royal Rocket Retail, LLC, SEI/Aarons, Inc., Shining Star, ShowcaseHome Furnishings, Inc., Sultan Financial Corporation, Tanglewood Management, LLC, TDS Foods, Inc., Tur, Inc., Watershed Development Corporation, and WGC, LLC #194 be GRANTED. The motions for joinder filed by Defendants Great American Rent-to-Own, AMG Enterprises Group, and J.M. Darden and Company (ECF Nos. #298 , #299 , and #300 ) be GRANTED. The Clerk of Courts should be directed to terminate the following as parties to this action:AH&H Leasing, LLC, AMG Enterprises Group, LLC, Arona Corporation, Bear Rental Purchase, Ltd., Boxer Enterprise, Inc., Circle City Rentals, CMH Leasing Partners, LLC, CRAM Leasing, Inc., DC Sales & Lease, Inc., Dirigo Leasing, Inc., DPR Alaska, LLC, DPR Colorado, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC Ventures, LLC, Fairway Leasing, LLC, Five Star Financials, LLC, FT Got Three, LLC, GNS & Associates, Inc., Great American Rent-to-Own, Inc., Green Fiver Corporation, Hanson Holding Company, Honey Harbor Investments, LLC, Howard Rents, LLC, HPH Investments, LLC, J&L Beach Enterprises, Inc., J.R. Rents, Inc., J.M. Darden & Company, Jenfour, LLC, Jenkins Rental, LLC, KFJ Enterprises, LLC, Lifestyle Furniture Leasing, Madison Capital Investments, Inc., MKW Investments, Inc., No Three Putts Enterprises, LLC, NW Freedom Corporation, Pomona Lane Partners, LLC, R & Double K, LLC, Rebco Investments, LLC, Rex Neal, Inc., Royal Rents, Inc., Royal Rocket Retail, LLC, SEI/Aarons, Inc., Shining Star, Showcase Home Furnishings, Inc., Sultan Financial Corporation, Tanglewood Management, LLC, TDS Foods, Inc., Tur, Inc., Watershed Development Corporation, and WGC, LLC. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72, the parties must seek review by the district court by filing Objections to the Report and Recommendation within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this Report and Recommendation, or by February 10, 2014. Any party opposing the Objections shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of service of the Objections to respond thereto, or by February 24, 2014. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(b)(2). Extensions of time will not be granted in either regard. Failure to file timely objections may constitute a waiver of appellate rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/27/14. (lrw)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 317 RESPONSE to #314 Notice, filed by AARON'S, INC. (Lanzillo, Richard)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Sur-Reply Brief in opposition to re #174 Motion to Certify Class, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Devlin, Neal)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Joint Reply re #174 Motion to Certify Class, filed by BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E") (Longer, Frederick)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #313 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/31/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #313 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (Longer, Frederick)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER upon consideration of Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Have the Aaron's Defendants Preserve and Impound Documents #309 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Aaron's defendants shall not destroy documents relevant to this litigation that may be subject to the Federal Trade Commissions' Agreement Containing Consent Order, In re Aaron's Inc., File No. J 223264, Agreement Containing Consent Order (Fed. Trade Comm'n. October 22,2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/25/13. (lrw)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Proposed Order re #309 Motion to preserve and impound documents by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 BRIEF in Support re #309 Motion to preserve and impound documents filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Emergency MOTION to Preserve and Impound Documents by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Longer, Frederick)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 10/21/13 Text Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (dm) Modified on 10/24/2014 external hard drive stored in Clerks Office (dm)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 10/21/2013 Text Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (dm)
October 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 SEALED DOCUMENT by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. This document Sealed pursuant to 10/21/2013 Text Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8) (dm)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #289 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/21/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 21, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #294 Motion for Leave to File Surreply Briefs in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification. Surreplies due by 10/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/21/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 305 REPLY in Support re #192 Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint filed by ARONA CORPORATION. (Strother, Todd) Modified on 10/21/2013. (dm)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 REPLY in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by AH & H LEASING, LLC, AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY, J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Bizar, Steven)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY. (Bizar, Steven)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MOTION for Joinder as to #196 Brief in Support of Motion, #194 MOTION to Dismiss by J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of JM Darden) (Bizar, Steven)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION for Joinder as to #196 Brief in Support of Motion, #194 MOTION to Dismiss by AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Alexy Gashkevich) (Bizar, Steven)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION for Joinder as to #196 Brief in Support of Motion, #194 MOTION to Dismiss by GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jack Powell) (Bizar, Steven)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 297 REPLY BRIEF re #294 Motion for Leave to File, filed by AARON'S, INC., BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 296 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD. (dm)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #286 Motion to File Corrected Third Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Courts is directed to file the Corrected Third Amended Complaint. As this new complaint is only a correction and not an amendment, Defendants' motions to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/02/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 RESPONSE to Motion re #294 Joint MOTION for Leave to File SURREPLY BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Joint MOTION for Leave to File SURREPLY BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by AARON'S, INC., BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 REPLY BRIEF re #175 Brief in Support of Motion, #174 Motion to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Longer Dec, #2 Exhibit 1 pt 1, #3 Exhibit 1 pt 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Supplement Hirsch Dec.) (Longer, Frederick)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 RESPONSE to Motion re #291 Emergency MOTION to Seal Document WRONGFULLY FILED IN THE PUBLIC RECORD filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Emergency MOTION to Seal Document WRONGFULLY FILED IN THE PUBLIC RECORD by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #291 Emergency Motion to Seal Document filed by Aaron's Inc. The Clerk of Courts is directed to remove ECF No. 290 from the docket due to an erroneous filing. Plaintiffs must refile the redacted version of that document before the end of business today. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/23/2013. (css)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 RESPONSE to Motion re #192 MOTION to Dismiss, #194 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF #219 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by AARON'S, INC. (Lanzillo, Richard) Modified on 9/16/2013. (dm)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION to Amend/Correct #134 Amended Complaint, (Motion for Leave...) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Third Amended Complaint) (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 9/4/2013 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 9/18/2013. Redaction Request due 10/2/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2013. (dm)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 Summons Issued as to *AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC, DIRIGO LEASING, INC., GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC., J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY, LTL INVESTMENTS, LLC* (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (jd)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Errata re #282 Consent to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Reason for Correction: Attachment. (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD (Attachments: #1 Summons JM Darden & Co, #2 Summons AMG Ent., #3 Summons Dirigo Leasing, #4 Summons Great American RTO, #5 Summons LTL Investments) (Hirsch, Andrea)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #280 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Aaron's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Due on or before 9/13/2013. Plaintiffs' Reply Brief remains due 9/20/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/9/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION for Leave to File NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF AARON'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER, Willingness to Proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 9/20/2013. In light of Judge Sean McLaughlin's resignation, the parties are provided an opportunity to consent to the jurisdiction of Judge Susan Paradise Baxter in this case. Should the parties consent to the jurisdiction of Judge Baxter, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before September 20, 2013. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/6/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jhi)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER that the hearing on the motion for class certification set for September 24, 2013, is CANCELED. Plaintiffs Reply briefs to the oppositions to the motion for class certification are due September 20, 2013, and may be filed as one brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Quash Subpoenas/Motion for Protective Order filed by Defendant Aspen Way #176 is DENIED. Discovery as to Aspen Way is STAYED until the resolution of the pending motion to dismiss based on lack of personal jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to file opposition to the motion for class certification filed by Aspen Way #180 is DISMISSED AS MOOT in light of the filing of the opposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiffs (at a later time) filed by Aspen Way #182 is GRANTED in light of the stay of discovery as to Aspen Way. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Emergency Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Plaintiffs #209 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Robert Bernstein #267 , without objection, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Opposition briefs to the motions to dismiss filed by the new Defendants are due by September 27, 2013. Reply briefs to any pending motion to dismiss are due October 18, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/4/13. (lrw)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 9/4/2013. Plaintiff still attempting to serve the 5 unserved defendants. Several motions decided on the record; Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (lrw)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 277 NOTICE of Substitution of Appearance by BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, FT GOT THREE, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, ROYAL RENTS, INC. (Zumpella, Gina) Modified on 9/4/2013 removed from public view; attorneys to update contact information through maintain account. (dm)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 NOTICE of Substitution of Appearance by BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, FT GOT THREE, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, ROYAL RENTS, INC. (Kostkas, Susan) Modified on 9/4/2013 removed from public view; attorneys to update contact information through maintain account. (dm)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE of Substitution of Appearance by BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, FT GOT THREE, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, ROYAL RENTS, INC. (Walsh, Paul) Modified on 9/4/2013 removed from public view; attorneys to update contact information through maintain account. (dm)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 AMENDED ORDER re #273 Order denying #169 Objections filed by AARON'S, INC. This Amended Order corrects a typographical error in #273 . Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/28/2013. (dad)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER OVERRULING and DISMISSING #169 Objections filed by AARON'S, INC. As more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/28/2013. (dad)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Bissoon for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/27/2013. (dm)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DPR ALASKA, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DPR COLORADO, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER. In light of the re-assignment of this case, a telephonic status conference will be held on September 4, 2013 at 10:00 am before the undersigned. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the conference call.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/27/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARONA CORPORATION. (Strother, Todd)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DESIGNERWARE, LLC re #267 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (Bernstein, Robert)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert S. Bernstein by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bernstein, Robert)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WGC, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TUR, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TDS FOODS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SHINING STAR. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ROYAL RENTS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by REX NEAL, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by R & DOUBLE K, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NW FREEDOM CORP.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MKW INVESTMENTS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JENKINS RENTAL, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JENFOUR, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by J.R. RENTS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HOWARD RENTS, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HANSON HOLDING COMPANY. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GREEN RIVER CORPORATION. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FT GOT THREE, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DW3, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DWC VENTURES, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DC SALES AND LEASE, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CRAM LEASING, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CIRCLE CITY RENTALS. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD. (Bizar, Steven)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AH & H LEASING, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #199 Motion for Timothy N. Lillwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/22/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #198 Motion for Todd A. Strother to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/22/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #194 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hirsch, Andrea)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Errata re #199 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ARONA CORPORATION. Reason for Correction: Incorrect filer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Lillwitz, Timothy)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Errata re #198 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ARONA CORPORATION. Reason for Correction: Incorrect filer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Strother, Todd)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 SEALED DOCUMENT (Brief in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification) by AARON'S, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to the 8/19/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit D - Part 2) (dm) Modified on 10/24/2014 disk stored in Clerks Office (dm)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #217 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #224 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 9/5/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/20/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 220 DECLARATION re #219 Brief in Opposition to Motion by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W) (Lanzillo, Richard)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 BRIEF in Opposition re #174 Motion to Certify Class REDACTED - FILED UNDER SEAL filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 BRIEF in Opposition re #174 Motion to Certify Class filed by BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Bizar, Steven)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Consent MOTION to Extend Time, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #194 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hirsch, Andrea)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 JOINDER of ARONA CORPORATION to #215 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (McCormick, Donald)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #214 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lyle D. Washowich terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/19/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #201 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/19/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #213 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David B. White terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/19/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 BRIEF in Opposition re #209 Motion for Discovery filed by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Washowich, Lyle)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, David)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPLY BRIEF re #163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Devlin, Neal)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Proposed Order re #209 Motion for Discovery of Franchisee Defendants by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 BRIEF in Support re #209 Motion for Discovery of Franchisee Defendants filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Longer, Frederick)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Emergency MOTION for Discovery re Jurisdictional of the Franchisee Defendants by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Longer, Frederick)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #209 Motion for Discovery filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #210 Brief in Support of Motion filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Defendants may file an opposition by August 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/7/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Zumpella on behalf of LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, ROYAL RENTS, INC.. (Zumpella, Gina)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Kostkas on behalf of LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, ROYAL RENTS, INC.. (Kostkas, Susan)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Walsh, III on behalf of LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, ROYAL RENTS, INC.. (Walsh, Paul)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 BRIEF in Opposition re #174 Motion to Certify Class filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #174 MOTION to Certify Class by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #204 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 8/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/2/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Errata re #199 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ARONA CORPORATION. Reason for Correction: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Lillwitz, Timothy)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Errata re #198 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ARONA CORPORATION. Reason for Correction: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Strother, Todd)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Certificate of Good Standing of Landon Y. Jones by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC (Jones, Landon)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION for attorney Timothy N. Lillwitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2873636) by ARONA CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (McCormick, Donald)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, of Attorney Todd A. Strother (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2873613) by ARONA CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (McCormick, Donald)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF THAT IS NO LONGER THAN FORTY-FIVE (45) PAGES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #192 Motion to Dismiss, #194 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 8/20/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/30/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #197 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/30/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 BRIEF in Support re #194 Motion to Dismiss, filed by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK) (Bizar, Steven)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Proposed Order re #192 Motion to Dismiss by ARONA CORPORATION. (McCormick, Donald) Modified on 7/30/2013. (dm)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION to Dismiss by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bizar, Steven)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 BRIEF in Support re #192 Motion to Dismiss filed by ARONA CORPORATION. (McCormick, Donald)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 MOTION to Dismiss by ARONA CORPORATION. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (McCormick, Donald)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #190 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, TUR, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, JENFOUR, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, WGC, LLC, DPR ALASKA, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., DWC VENTURES, LLC, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., FT GOT THREE, LLC, DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, SHINING STAR, ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, REX NEAL, INC., AH & H LEASING, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, DW3, LLC, J.R. RENTS, INC., NW FREEDOM CORP. Landon Y. Jones must file a Certificate of Good Standing in support of his motion to appear pro hac vice. Certificate must be filed before August 2, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/29/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Addendum by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. in Support of #182 Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiffs. (Williott, Anthony) Modified docket text on 7/30/2013. (tt)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #190 Motion for Landon Y. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/26/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for attorney Landon Y. Jones to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2866697) by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Jones, Landon)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald J. McCormick on behalf of ARONA CORPORATION. (McCormick, Donald)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Lane on behalf of ARONA CORPORATION. (Lane, Mark)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re #176 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas /Motion for Protective Order MOTION for Protective Order filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Robinson, John)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Zumpella on behalf of FT GOT THREE, LLC. (Zumpella, Gina)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Kostkas on behalf of FT GOT THREE, LLC. (Kostkas, Susan)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Walsh, III on behalf of FT GOT THREE, LLC. (Walsh, Paul)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #176 Motion to Quash, Motion for Protective Order. Response briefs due by 8/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/18/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 BRIEF in Support re #182 Motion for Leave to Depose Plaintiffs filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. (Williott, Anthony)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MOTION for Leave to Depose Plaintiffs by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 BRIEF in Support re #180 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #174 MOTION to Certify Class by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 REPLY BRIEF re #169 Objections to Protective Order filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REPLY BRIEF re #171 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Opposition to Aspen Way's Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #176 Motion to Quash, ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion for Protective Order. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 BRIEF in Support of #176 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas /Motion for Protective Order filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas /Motion for Protective Order by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony) Added MOTION for Protective Order on 7/5/2013 (dm)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 BRIEF in Support re #174 Motion to Certify Class filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (Longer, Frederick)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION to Certify Class by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #164 Brief in Support of Motion, #163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Longer, Frederick)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #169 Objections, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Longer, Frederick)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #162 Brief in Support of Motion, #161 Motion to Dismiss, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Longer, Frederick)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of SEI/Aaron's, Inc. only, by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD (Longer, Frederick)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER Response to #169 Objections; Response due by 7/1/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 6/24/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nk)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 OBJECTIONS to #166 Protective Order by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lanzillo, Richard)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Elizabeth S. Klaproth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/19/13. (lrw)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Errata re #158 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Elizabeth S. Klaproth by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., ROYAL RENTS, INC., SEI/AARON'S, INC., SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. Reason for Correction: Filing under Correct ECF Filer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Elizabeth S. Klaproth, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Elizabeth S. Klaproth) (Klaproth, Elizabeth)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/17/13. (lrw)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER that Defendant Aarons Inc.s motion for protective order #138 is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for protective order #140 is granted in part and denied in part.The Protective Order is entered separately. In accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 72, the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from the date of service to file written objections to this Order. Failure to file timely objections may constitute a waiver of rights. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/17/13. (lrw)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER dismissing as moot #156 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; dismissing without prejudice as improperly filed #158 Motion for Elizabeth S. Klaproth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/17/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 BRIEF in Support re #163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 BRIEF in Support re #161 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint re #134 Amended Complaint, by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #163 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #161 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motions due by 7/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/11/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Meade on behalf of REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, ROYAL RENTS, INC.. (Meade, Matthew)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Edward Bizar on behalf of REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, ROYAL RENTS, INC.. (Bizar, Steven)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for attorney Elizabeth S. Klaproth to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2814211) by AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, INC., SEI/AARON'S, INC., SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Elizabeth Klaproth, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Bizar, Steven)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 REPLY BRIEF re #138 Motion for Protective Order filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Rosenberg, Jason)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Longer, Frederick)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for attorney Aaron Z. Ahlquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2812181) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney Aaron Z. Ahlquist and Certification of ECF Compliance, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Ahlquist, Aaron)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Good Standing by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD re #149 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Konieczny, Edward)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #149 Motion for Edward Konieczny to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/6/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #155 Motion for Aaron Ahlquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/6/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 REPLY BRIEF re #140 Motion for Protective Order filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Press Release) (Longer, Frederick)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #149 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Counsel must file with the Court a Certificate of Good Standing from the bar or the court in which the affiant primarily practices per Local Rule 83.2. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE to Motion re #140 Cross MOTION for Protective Order filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #138 Motion for Protective Order, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrea S. Hirsch) (Longer, Frederick)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for attorney Edward C. Konieczny to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2809818) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Konieczny, Edward)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Zumpella on behalf of BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD. (Zumpella, Gina)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan A. Kostkas on behalf of BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD. (Kostkas, Susan)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Walsh, III on behalf of BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD. (Walsh, Paul)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/3/13. (lrw)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION to Change Name of Defendant Rex Neal to Rex Neal, Inc. by REX NEAL. (Bizar, Steven)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Meade on behalf of AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REX NEAL, SEI/AARON'S, INC., SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. (Meade, Matthew)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Edward Bizar on behalf of AH & H LEASING, LLC, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REX NEAL, SEI/AARON'S, INC., SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC. (Bizar, Steven)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 BRIEF in Support of #140 Cross MOTION for Protective Order filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Longer, Frederick)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Cross MOTION for Protective Order by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order) (Longer, Frederick)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 BRIEF in Support re #138 Motion for Protective Order EXPEDITED filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for Protective Order EXPEDITED by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #137 Motion for Thomas C.S. Pryor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/31/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for attorney Thomas C.S. Pryor to Appear Pro Hac Vice, on behalf of Aaron's, Inc. (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2804759) by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Pryor, Thomas )
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD. AH & H LEASING, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC. waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; CIRCLE CITY RENTALS waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; DW3, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; FT GOT THREE, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; GREEN RIVER CORPORATION waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; HOWARD RENTS, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC. waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; JENFOUR, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; JENKINS RENTAL, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC. waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; NW FREEDOM CORP. waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; REX NEAL waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; SHINING STAR waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP. waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; TDS FOODS, INC. waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; TUR, INC. waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013; WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION waiver sent on 5/29/2013, answer due 7/29/2013. (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/22/2013 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janis Ferguson, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/31/2013. Redaction Request due 6/14/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2013. (dm)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., DESIGNERWARE, LLC, JOHN DOES (1-45) AARON'S FRANCHISEES, AH & H LEASING, LLC, AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC, ARONA CORPORATION, BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD, BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC., CIRCLE CITY RENTALS, CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC, CRAM LEASING, INC., DC SALES AND LEASE, INC., DIRIGO LEASING, INC., DPR ALASKA, LLC, DPR COLORADO, LLC, DW3, LLC, DWC VENTURES, LLC, FAIRWAY LEASING, LLC, FIVE STAR FINANCIALS, LLC, FT GOT THREE, LLC, GNS & ASSOCIATES, INC., GREAT AMERICAN RENT-TO-OWN, INC., GREEN RIVER CORPORATION, HANSON HOLDING COMPANY, HONEY HARBOR INVESTMENTS, LLC, HOWARD RENTS, LLC, HPH INVESTMENTS, LLC, J&L BEACH ENTERPRISES, INC., J.R. RENTS, INC., J.M. DARDEN AND COMPANY, JENFOUR, LLC, JENKINS RENTAL, LLC, KFJ ENTERPRISES, LLC, LIFESTYLE FURNITURE LEASING, LTL INVESTMENTS, LLC, MADISON CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, INC., MKW INVESTMENTS, INC., NO THREE PUTTS ENTERPRISES, LLC, NW FREEDOM CORP., POMONA LANE PARTNERS, LLC, R & DOUBLE K, LLC, REBCO INVESTMENTS, LLC, REX NEAL, ROYAL RENTS, INC., ROYAL ROCKET RETAIL, LLC, SEI/AARON'S, INC., SHINING STAR, SHOWCASE HOME FURNISHINGS, INC., SULTAN FINANCIAL CORP., TANGLEWOOD MANAGEMENT, LLC, TDS FOODS, INC., TUR, INC., WATERSHED DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, WGC, LLC, filed by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD. (dm)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER dismissing as moot #109 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing as moot #111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #117 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint; denying #119 Motion for Relief from Confidentiality Agreement; withdrawing #120 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/22/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2013 re #119 MOTION for Relief from Confidentiality Agreement filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #120 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #109 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint re #103 Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., #117 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AARON'S, INC.. Text order to follow on above motions. Answers to Amended Complaint or renewed motions to dismiss are due June 11, 2013. Class certification motions are due July 1, 2013. Opposition to said motions are due August 2, 2013. Reply due September 5, 2013. Hearing on Class Certification will be September 24, 2013 at 9:30 am. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) (lrw) Modified on 6/3/2013. (lrw)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 RESPONSE to Notice of Supplemental Authority to #128 Notice, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Longer, Frederick)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #131 Motion for Hearing re #119 MOTION for Relief from Confidentiality Agreement filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #120 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #109 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint re #103 Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., #117 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AARON'S, INC. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom B - Erie before Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. All counsel is to appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/29/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Hearing re #119 MOTION for Relief from Confidentiality Agreement filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #118 Brief in Support of Motion filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #109 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint re #103 Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., #117 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, #111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AARON'S, INC. by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Jason D. Rosenberg, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 4/25/13. (lrw)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Errata re #127 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by AARON'S, INC.. Reason for Correction: Failure to submit certificate of good standing. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rosenberg Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing (GA), #2 Proposed Order) (Rosenberg, Jason)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #127 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Attorney must comply with Local Rule 83.2 for pro hac vice to be ruled upon. Attorney to use the ERRATA event when refiling proper documentation and link it to the incorrect entry. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by AARON'S, INC. re #122 Brief in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Lanzillo, Richard)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MOTION for attorney JASON D. ROSENBERG to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-2746707) by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion re #120 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal consenting to relief requested therein filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE to Motion re #119 MOTION for Relief from Confidentiality Agreement filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Affidavit of Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown) (Lanzillo, Richard)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 REPLY to Response to Motion re #121 Brief in Opposition - Other, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re #122 Brief in Opposition to Motion for leave to file third amended complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 BRIEF in Opposition re #117 Motion for Leave to File THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Lanzillo, Richard)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 BRIEF in Opposition to #118 Brief in Support of Motion, #117 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony) Modified on 3/18/2013. (tt, )
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Longer, Frederick)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION for Relief from Confidentiality Agreement by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Longer, Frederick)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #117 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint: Defendants' Response to Motion due by 3/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/28/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 BRIEF in Support re #117 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Longer, Frederick)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
November 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 REPLY BRIEF re #114 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 REPLY BRIEF re #113 Response in Opposition to Defendant Aspen Way's Motion to Dismiss filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to #111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Longer, Frederick) Modified on 11/8/2012. (dm)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Defendant Aspen Way's to #109 Motion to Dismiss, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Longer, Frederick)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to Motion due by 11/7/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/16/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 BRIEF in Support re #111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
October 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #109 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 10/31/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/10/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 BRIEF in Support re #109 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Rohnn Lampi, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of John Pollock, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Chrstin Pfau) (Williott, Anthony)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint re #103 Amended Complaint by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Proposed Order re #107 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Williott, Anthony)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #107 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #103 Amended Complaint. ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. answer due 10/5/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/1/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #105 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #103 Amended Complaint AARON'S, INC. answer due 10/15/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/26/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Proposed Order re #105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #103 Amended Complaint filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Lanzillo, Richard)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Bernstein on behalf of DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Bernstein, Robert)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants, filed by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER that the joint motion for extension of time filed by Plaintiffs and Aarons Inc. #100 is DENIED. The Second Amended Complaint against Aarons, Inc. and Aspen Way remains due on September 14, 2012, as directed by Judge McLaughlins order of July 12, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/12/12. (lrw)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by AARON'S, INC., BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Devlin, Neal)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #99 Motion to Join Suit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/6/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION to Join Suit by GLEN A. WITHAM. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (dm)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 7/12/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nk)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Devlin, Neal)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #97 Motion for Extension of Time to conduct discovery and for the filing of the amended complaint by 7/16/12. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 5/2/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nk)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #66 Amended Complaint by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Longer, Frederick)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/20/2012 before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/1/2012. Redaction Request due 5/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2012. (dm)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 20, 2012 before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald J. Bench, Telephone number 814-464-9613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 3/28/2012. Redaction Request due 4/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2012. (dm)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER the Court having been advised that the defendant, DesignerWare, LLC., has filed for bankruptcy in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania, (Case No. 12-10397), and that no further action can be taken against him at this time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no action will be taken against defendant, DesignerWare, LLC., and that this case be administratively closed as to this defendant. Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter. Should further proceedings against defendant DesignerWare, LLC., become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it in the same manner as if this order had not been entered. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 3/20/12. (nk)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin: Oral Argument held on 3/20/2012. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge #84 is rejected for the reasons set forth on the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Aspen Way is dismissed without prejudice. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge #85 is adopted in part and rejected in part for the reasons set forth on the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff has sixty (60) days to Amend their complaint as to defendant's Aspen Way and Aaron's Inc., relative to count I only. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts order or notice on the matter. (Court Reporter: Ron Bench) (nk)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY as to DesignerWare, LLC by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (Mancos, Brian)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE to #87 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Defendant Aspen Way's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. #84 ) to #86 Objections, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION Designeware's to #88 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Oral Argument on Objections re #84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., Objections re #85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC, #74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by AARON: Oral Argument set for 3/20/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nk )
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 BRIEF in Support of #88 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (White, David)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 OBJECTIONS to #85 Report and Recommendation filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, David)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OBJECTIONS to #85 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiffs filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Longer, Frederick)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 OBJECTIONS to Report and Recommendatin of US Magistrate Judge by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the motion to dismiss filed by Defendant DesignerWare, LLC #69 be granted in part and denied in part. More specifically, the motion to dismiss should be: 1) denied as to Count I; 2) granted as to Count II; and 3) granted as to Count III. It is further recommended that the motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Aarons, Inc. #74 be granted. Defendant Aarons, Inc. should be dismissed as a party to this action. Objections to R&R due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/17/12. (lrw)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #76 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 2/17/12. (lrw)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY BRIEF by AARON'S, INC. re #64 Motion to Dismiss filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY BRIEF by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. Reply Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
September 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF by DESIGNERWARE, LLC re #69 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, David)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #76 Motion to Dismiss, filed by BRIAN BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 BRIEF in Opposition re #69 Motion to Dismiss by defendant Designerware's filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Longer, Frederick)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 BRIEF in Support re #76 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Williott, Anthony)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 9/15/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/18/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #76 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 9/15/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/18/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 BRIEF in Support re #74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying #71 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/15/11. (lrw)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 BRIEF in Support re #71 Motion for Reconsideration filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williott, Anthony)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 BRIEF in Support of #69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (White, David)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, David)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #69 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 9/6/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/9/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #67 Response to Motion. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed REPLY BRIEF. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp) Modified on 7/28/2011. (sdp)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY BRIEF by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD re #62 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (sdp)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Levin, Daniel)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD. (Levin, Daniel)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #49 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #62 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #62 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot #64 Motion to Dismiss. These pending dispositive motions are dismissed as moot in light of the filing of the First Amended Complaint. In response to the First Amended Complaint, Defendants are directed to file an Answer or dispositive motion before August 18, 2011.Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/27/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #64 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 8/2/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/19/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 BRIEF in Support re #64 Motion to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint, by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #62 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added Motiom for Summary Judgment. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 BRIEF in Support re #62 Motion to Dismiss, Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56 filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (White, David)
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(1) and F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56 by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (White, David). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 7/14/2011 (dm).
July 13, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #62 Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 7/27/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/13/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Errata re #59 Brief in Support of Motion Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. Reason for Correction: Filed on behalf of wrong defendant. (Williott, Anthony)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Errata re #58 Notice of Appearance by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. Reason for Correction: Filed on behalf of wrong defendant. (Williott, Anthony)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 BRIEF in Support re #49 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Aspen Way Enterprises, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Williott on behalf of AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Williott, Anthony)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #9 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED; adopting #54 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 7/8/2011. (rlh)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Errata re #55 Response in Opposition to Defendant Aspen Way's Motion to Dismiss by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Reason for Correction: signature verification. (Longer, Frederick)
June 29, 2011 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #55 Response in Opposition. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #49 Motion to Dismiss, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Hirsch, Andrea)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Motion for Issuance of an Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Imposition of Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65, MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/16/11. (lrw)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #51 Motion for Ross W. McLinden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/7/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #52 Motion for Michael E. Begley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/7/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #53 Motion for Michele L. Braukmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/7/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #49 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 7/1/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/7/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for attorney Michele L. Braukmann to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1987937) by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Hardy, W.)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for attorney Michael E. Begley to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1987933) by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Hardy, W.)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for attorney Ross W. McLinden to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1987926) by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Hardy, W.)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 BRIEF in Support re #49 Motion to Dismiss filed by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit) (Hardy, W.)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint, by ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hardy, W.)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, that Defendant Aaron's Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD, is due on or before July 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/6/11. (lrw)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from AARON'S, INC. on 7/18/2011. (lrw)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD, AARON'S, INC. Answer due from AARON'S, INC. on 7/18/2011. (Lanzillo, Richard)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/2/11. (lrw)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and Order by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Robinson, John)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 25, 2011 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sondra Black, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 6/7/2011. Redaction Request due 6/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2011. (dm)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 24, 2011 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sondra A. Black, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 6/7/2011. Redaction Request due 6/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2011. (dm)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/31/11. (lrw)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Testimony of Timothy Kelly held on May 24, 2011 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sondra A. Black, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 6/2/2011. Redaction Request due 6/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2011. (dm)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS 1-21 in Support of #38 Motion Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21) (dm)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 DESIGNERWARE, LLC. EXHIBITS A-F in Support of #38 Motion Hearing, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhbit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F) (dm)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2011 re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Hearing concluded this date. Court will issue a written order on the motion. (Court Reporter: Sondra Black) (lrw)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER by AARON'S, INC., BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2011 re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. Hearing continued until 5/25/2011 at 9:00 AM. (Court Reporter: Sondra Black) (lrw, )
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY BRIEF by CRYSTAL BYRD re #34 Brief in Opposition to Motion, filed by CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FTC v. CyberSpy) (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for attorney WILLIAM H. JORDAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1973844) by AARON'S, INC.. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion for TRO, Motion for Permanent Injunction, to Plaintiffs' Motion for Issuance of an Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Imposition of Permanent Injunction filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, David)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for William H. Jordan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/23/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 19, 2011 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sondra A. Black, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/27/2011. Redaction Request due 6/10/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2011. (dm)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Status Conference held on 5/19/2011. (Court Reporter: Sondra Black) (lrw)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #30 Motion to Continue Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/18/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/13/2011 before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janis Ferguson, Telephone number 814-452-4556. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 5/24/2011. Redaction Request due 6/7/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2011. (dm)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Susan Paradise Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Mancos, Brian)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' STATUS REPORT AND REQUEST FOR HEARING ON THEIR MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND FOR A PERMANENT INJUNCTION filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (White, David)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER setting Telephonic Status Conference for May 19, 2011 at 1:30pm. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call with all counsel on the line and call Judge Baxter's chambers at 814/464-9630. Local counsel shall participate in person. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/17/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B - Erie before Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/17/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER RESCHEDULING Hearing on Motion #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 5/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B - Erie before Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/17/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STATUS REPORT and MOTION for Hearing by CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea) Modified on 5/17/2011. (dm)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by CRYSTAL BYRD. (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DISTRICT JUDGE OPTION by AARON'S, INC. to have this case randomly assigned to a U.S. District Judge. (Devlin, Neal)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (White, David)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Daniel C. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Plaintiffs (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1965924) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Longer, Frederick)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Daniel C. Levin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/16/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Sean J. McLaughlin, presiding and Susan Paradise Baxter, referral. (dm)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sean J. McLaughlin: Status Conference held on 5/13/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Courts order or notice on the matter (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) (nk)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Richard Hill in lieu of Declaration of Richard Hill by CRYSTAL BYRD re #9 Motion for TRO, Motion for Permanent Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard Hill) (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Brief in Support of Motion, #9 Motion for TRO, Motion for Permanent Injunction, #21 Brief in Opposition to Motion, filed by CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report, #2 Exhibit Robbins v. Lower Merion Stipulated Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion for TRO, Motion for Permanent Injunction, filed by AARON'S, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TABLE OF CONTENTS, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for attorney KRISTINE MCALISTER BROWN to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1962333) by AARON'S, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal R. Devlin on behalf of AARON'S, INC.. (Devlin, Neal)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Lanzillo on behalf of AARON'S, INC.. (Lanzillo, Richard)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER, in light of new counsel entering an appearance on this case, said counsel is to file its Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge by 5/16/2011. See Document #17 , dated 5/11/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/12/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/13/2011 at 2:00 PM before the Honorable Sean J. McLaughlin. Attorney Hirsch shall initiate the call with all counsel on the line and call the conference line at 814-464-9615. Local counsel shall participate in person. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order or notice on the matter (nk)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Kristine McAlister Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/12/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER, all parties' Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 5/16/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/11/11. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (lrw)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Summons Reissued as to *AARON'S, INC., BRIAN BYRD, DESIGNERWARE, LLC* (dm)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for John H. Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/11/11. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of an Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Imposition of Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 filed by DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (White, David)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD (Hirsch, Andrea)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Mancos on behalf of DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Mancos, Brian)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lyle D. Washowich on behalf of DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (Washowich, Lyle)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David B. White on behalf of DESIGNERWARE, LLC. (White, David)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for attorney John H. Robinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1959904) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of John H. Robinson, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion for TRO. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added Motion for Permanent Injunction. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion for TRO. ERROR: Brief in Support should have been filed as separate document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion for TRO, Motion for Permanent Injunction, filed by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (dm)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion for Issuance of an Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Imposition of Permanent Injunction Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65 by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10) (Longer, Frederick). Added MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 5/10/2011 (dm)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Michael W. Heaviside to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/6/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for James F. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/6/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leonard A. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/6/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Maury A. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/6/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Christopher V. Tisi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/6/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Andrea S. Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/6/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Michelle Parfitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/6/2011. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (css)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Christopher V. Tisi to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1953908) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Christopher V. Tisi, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Michelle Parfitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1953892) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration Michelle Parfitt, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Andrea S. Hirsch to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1953882) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Andrea Hirsch, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Maury A. Herman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1953869) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Maury Herman, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Michael W. Heaviside to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1953856) by BRIAN BYRD, CRYSTAL BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Michael W. Heaviside, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for attorney James F. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1953850) by CRYSTAL BYRD and BRIAN BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration James F. Green, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick) Modified on 5/5/2011. (dm)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for attorney Leonard A. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1953844) by CRYSTAL BYRD amd BRIAN BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaraton of Leonard Davis, #2 Proposed Order) (Longer, Frederick) Modified on 5/5/2011. (dm)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AARON'S, INC., ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC., DESIGNERWARE, LLC, JOHN DOES (1-100) AARON'S FRANCHISEES (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0315-1952139), filed by CRYSTAL BYRD, BRIAN BYRD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) SUMMONS ISSUED (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BYRD et al v. AARON'S, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL BYRD
Represented By: Christopher V. Tisi
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: Edward C. Konieczny
Represented By: Frederick S. Longer
Represented By: James F. Green
Represented By: Michael W. Heaviside
Represented By: Michelle A. Parfitt
Represented By: Aaron Z. Ahlquist
Represented By: Andrea S. Hirsch
Represented By: John H. Robinson
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis
Represented By: Maury A. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN BYRD
Represented By: Andrea S. Hirsch
Represented By: Christopher V. Tisi
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: Edward C. Konieczny
Represented By: Frederick S. Longer
Represented By: John H. Robinson
Represented By: Leonard A. Davis
Represented By: Maury A. Herman
Represented By: Aaron Z. Ahlquist
Represented By: James F. Green
Represented By: Michael W. Heaviside
Represented By: Michelle A. Parfitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Richard A. Lanzillo
Represented By: Neal R. Devlin
Represented By: Jason D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Thomas C S Pryor
Represented By: William H. Jordan
Represented By: Donald M. Houser
Represented By: Kristine McAlister Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPEN WAY ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S INC.
Represented By: Christopher D Hansen
Represented By: Michele L. Braukmann
Represented By: James A. McGovern
Represented By: Michael E. Begley
Represented By: Ross W. McLinden
Represented By: Theodore J. Kobus, III
Represented By: W. Scott Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DESIGNERWARE, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Mancos
Represented By: David B. White
Represented By: Lyle D. Washowich
Represented By: Robert S. Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AH & H LEASING, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Klaproth
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMG ENTERPRISES GROUP, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARONA CORPORATION doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Timothy N. Lillwitz
Represented By: Donald J. McCormick
Represented By: Mark R. Lane
Represented By: Todd A. Strother
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAR RENTAL PURCHASE, LTD doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Gina Zumpella
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Represented By: Paul J. Walsh, III
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Represented By: Susan A. Kostkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOXER ENTERPRISE, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Represented By: Elizabeth Klaproth
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCLE CITY RENTALS doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Elizabeth Klaproth
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH LEASING PARTNERS, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Represented By: Elizabeth Klaproth
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRAM LEASING, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Elizabeth Klaproth
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DC SALES AND LEASE, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth Klaproth
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRIGO LEASING, INC. doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPR ALASKA, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPR COLORADO, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DW3, LLC doing business as AARON'S SALES AND LEASING, A FRANCHISEE OF AARON'S, INC.
Represented By: Steven Edward Bizar
Represented By: Landon Y. Jones
Represented By: Elizabeth Klaproth
Represented By: Matthew H. Meade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets |