MCARDLE v. HUFNAGEL et al
Plaintiff: PAUL J. MCARDLE
Defendant: DANIEL F. CUSICK, JOHN DOE, ANNE M. MCARDLE, KELLY FOX, JOSEPH W. HUFNAGEL, THERESA J. HUFNAGEL, J. JEROME MANSMANN, JAMES P. MANSMANN, KEITH J. CHAMPAGNE, PETER L. MANSMANN, ERIN L. MARSH, KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI, COLLEEN CUSICK, THOMAS M. SULLIVAN, MARY P. WELSCH, PATRICK W. MANSMANN, DANIEL L. BIRD, SANDRA L. MANSMANN, WILLIAM P. MORGAN, KRISTINE I. MANSMANN SULLIVAN, KATHLEEN S. MORGAN, DENISE MANSMANN BIRD, ELIZABETH MANSMANN CHAMPAGNE, MARY SHEILA CUSICK, PETER J. MANSMANN, THERESA A. MANSMANN CAMPA, CARRIE FOX, MARGARET M. HUFNAGEL, JANE ROE, RONALD A. WEISENSTEIN, MICHELE M. MANSMANN, SARAH E. MANSMANN, DENNIS J. WELSCH, JOANNE T. MANSMANN, CLAYTON T. CAMPA and GEORGE R. FOX, III
Case Number: 1:2012cv00326
Filed: December 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Gary L Lancaster
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2014 Filing 53 MANDATE of USCA as to #50 Notice of Appeal filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE Affirming judgment/order of the district court. Costs taxed against Appellant and in favor of Appellee Joseph W. Hufnagel in the amount of $58.39. (Attachments: #1 Opinion, #2 Clerk's Letter to District Court) (jk3, ) Modified docket text on 11/18/2014. (tt)
October 16, 2014 Filing 52 JUDGMENT OF USCA as to #50 Notice of Appeal filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE Affirming judgment/order of the district court. Mandate will follow. (jk3, )
March 24, 2013 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #49 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion for Status Conference, by PAUL J. MCARDLE. Filing fee $455, receipt number 0315-2723935. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. Court Reporter(s): N/A. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (McArdle, Paul) Modified on 3/25/2013. (sdp)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #15 Motion to Dismiss, #19 Motion to Dismiss, #21 Motion to Dismiss, #26 Motion to Dismiss, #30 Motion to Dismiss, and #33 Motion to Dismiss; Count I of plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice, and Counts II through IV are dismissed without prejudice to attempt to re-raise them in the courts of Pennsylvania; #42 Report and Recommendation is adopted as the Opinion of the Court; #40 Motion for Sanctions is denied; #44 Motion for a Status Conference, Oral Argument, and Leave to Commence Discovery is denied as moot; Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed; Pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file a notice of appeal as provided by Rule 3 of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster on 3/14/13. (map)
March 13, 2013 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 47 Objections. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Objections to Report and Recommendation. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm)
March 12, 2013 Filing 48 OBJECTIONS to #42 Report and Recommendation filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (dm)
March 7, 2013 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #40 MOTION for Sanctions Disciplinary filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (McArdle, Paul)
March 4, 2013 Chief Judge Gary L. Lancaster presiding. (mjl)
March 4, 2013 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #44 Motion for Discovery. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Reply Brief. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #44 Motion for Discovery. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added for a Status Conference, for Oral argument upon the Defs' Motions to Dismiss. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp2, )
March 1, 2013 Filing 45 REPLY BRIEF re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 Motion to Dismiss, #26 Motion to Dismiss, #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (sdp)
March 1, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Commence Discovery, Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Brief In Response To Motions To Dismiss, #11 Table of Contents to Brief In Response, #12 Proposed Order) (McArdle, Paul). Added MOTION for for a Status Conference before a United States District Court Judge, MOTION for Oral Argument upon the Defendants' Motions to Dismiss on 3/4/2013 (sdp2).
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Terrence F. McVerry recused. Signed by Judge Terrence F. McVerry on 3/1/2013. (kly) Modified on 3/6/2013. (sdp)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER re #40 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff's Response to the Motion due by 3/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/28/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jlh )
February 28, 2013 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy no longer presider in case. (gmp)
February 28, 2013 Judge Terrence F. McVerry is presider and Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy is referred. (gmp)
February 27, 2013 Filing 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT: #30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF JURISDICTION filed by MARY P. WELSCH, DENNIS J. WELSCH; #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DANIEL F. CUSICK, MARY SHEILA CUSICK, COLLEEN CUSICK; #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by J. JEROME MANSMANN, KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI, PATRICK W. MANSMANN; #15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6)filed by KELLY FOX, CARRIE FOX, GEORGE R. FOX, III, ANNE M. MCARDLE; #26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) re #1 Complaint filed by PETER L. MANSMANN; #29 MOTION for Joinder as to #20 Brief in Support of Motion, #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #27 Brief in Support of Motion, #16 Brief in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Ci filed by JOSEPH W. HUFNAGEL; #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DANIEL L. BIRD, DENISE MANSMANN BIRD. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/27/13. (mjl)
February 27, 2013 Filing 41 BRIEF in Support re #40 Motion for Sanctions Disciplinary filed by CARRIE FOX, GEORGE R. FOX, III, KELLY FOX, ANNE M. MCARDLE, MARGARET HUFNAGEL, JOSEPH HUFNAGEL, THERESA HUFNAGEL, J. JEROME MANSMANN, PATRICK W. MANSMANN, KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI, JAMES P. MANSMANN, JOANNE MANSMANN, PETER MANSMANN, SANDRA MANSMANN, KRISTINE MANSMANN SULLIVAN, THOMAS SULLIVAN, MICHELE M. MANSMANN, RONALD A. WEISENSTEIN, THERESA MANSMANN CAMPA, CLAYTON CAMPA, ELIZABETH MANSMANN CHAMPAGNE, KEITH CHAMPAGNE, DENISE MANSMANN BIRD, DANIEL BIRD, DANIEL CUSICK, MARY SHEILA CUSICK, COLLEEN CUSICK, ERIN L. MARSH, DENNIS J. WELSCH, MARY P. WELSCH, WILLIAM P. MORGAN, KATHLEEN S. MORGAN . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25) (Rende, Bruce) Modified on 2/28/2013. (sdp2)
February 27, 2013 Filing 40 MOTION for Sanctions Disciplinary by CARRIE FOX, GEORGE R. FOX, III, KELLY FOX, ANNE M. MCARDLE, JOSEPH HUFNAGEL, MARGARET HUFNAGEL, THERESA HUFNAGEL, J. JEROME MANSMANN, PATRICK W. MANSMANN, KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI, JAMES P. MANSMANN, JOANNE T. MANSMANN, PETER J. MANSMANN, SANDRA L. MANSMANN, KRISTINE MANSMANN SULLIVAN, THOMAS SULLIVAN, RONALD WEISENSTEIN, MICHELE M. MANSMANN, THERESA A. MANSMANN CAMPA, CLAYTON T. CAMPA, ELIZABETH MANSMAN CHAMPAGNE, KEITH J. CHAMPAGNE, DENISE MANSMANN BIRD, DANIEL BIRD, DANIEL F. CUSICK, MARY SHEILA CUSICK, COLLEN CUSICK, ERIN L. MARSH, DENNIS J. WELSCH, MARY P. WELSCH, WILLIAM P. MORGAN, KATHLEEN S. MORGAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce) Modified on 2/28/2013. (sdp2)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER Granting #39 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by Ryan James and Tony Thompson on behalf of Michele Mansmann. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/27/2013. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jlh ) Modified on 3/1/2013. (tt)
February 27, 2013 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #39 Notice. ERROR: SHOULD BE FILED AS A MOTION. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
February 26, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by MICHELE M. MANSMANN (Thompson, Tony)
February 19, 2013 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 Motion to Dismiss, #26 Motion to Dismiss, #29 Motion for Joinder, #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Body of Brief filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (McArdle, Paul)
February 19, 2013 Filing 37 TABLE OF CONTENTS TO BRIEF in Opposition re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 Motion to Dismiss, #26 Motion to Dismiss, #29 Motion for Joinder, #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (McArdle, Paul) Modified on 2/20/2013. (sdp2)
February 15, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Magulick on behalf of MICHELE M. MANSMANN. (Magulick, Michael)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #34 Brief in Support of Motion. Brief in Opposition due by 2/20/2013 ; Response to Motion due by 2/20/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/6/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mjl)
February 5, 2013 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from CLAYTON T. CAMPA on 3/5/2013; MICHELE M. MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; THERESA A. MANSMANN CAMPA on 3/5/2013; KRISTINE I. MANSMANN SULLIVAN on 3/5/2013; THOMAS M. SULLIVAN on 3/5/2013; RONALD A. WEISENSTEIN on 3/5/2013; DENNIS J. WELSCH on 3/5/2013; MARY P. WELSCH on 3/5/2013 (sdp)
February 5, 2013 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (Attachments: #1 Waiver, #2 Waiver, #3 Waiver, #4 Waiver, #5 Waiver, #6 Waiver, #7 Waiver, #8 Waiver, #9 Waiver, #10 Waiver, #11 Waiver, #12 Waiver) (McArdle, Paul) Modified on 2/6/2013. (sdp)
February 5, 2013 Filing 34 BRIEF in Support re #33 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by J. JEROME MANSMANN, PATRICK W. MANSMANN, KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI. (Pieseski, Kristin)
February 5, 2013 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by J. JEROME MANSMANN, PATRICK W. MANSMANN, KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Pieseski, Kristin)
February 5, 2013 Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused.
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #32 Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss. Responses to Motions to Dismiss now due by 2/20/2013. The Motion for Consideration of Recusal is GRANTED pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 455(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this civil action. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 02/05/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
February 5, 2013 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy presiding. (gv)
February 1, 2013 Filing 32 MOTION to Extend Time to February 20, 2013 by PAUL J. MCARDLE and for CONSIDERATION OF RECUSAL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McArdle, Paul). Added MOTION on 2/5/2013 (sdp).
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER GRANTING #29 Motion for Joinder. Defendants Joseph W. Hufnagel, Margaret M. Hufnagel, Theresa J. Hufnagel, James P. Mansmann, Joanne T. Mansmann, Peter J. Mansmann, Sandra L. Mansmann, Kristine I. Sullivan, Thomas M. Sullivan, Michele M. Weisenstein, Ronald A. Weisenstein, Theresa A. Campa, Clayton T. Campa, Elizabeth Champagne, Keith J. Champagne and Erin L. Marsh are joined to the pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 01/31/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE to #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2013. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 01/31/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
January 30, 2013 Filing 31 BRIEF in Support re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DENNIS J. WELSCH, MARY P. WELSCH. (Simon, Phillip)
January 30, 2013 Filing 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF JURISDICTION by DENNIS J. WELSCH, MARY P. WELSCH. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Simon, Phillip)
January 30, 2013 Filing 29 MOTION for Joinder as to #20 Brief in Support of Motion, #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #27 Brief in Support of Motion, #16 Brief in Support of Motion, #15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6), #26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) re #1 Complaint, #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #22 Brief in Support of Motion by JOSEPH W. HUFNAGEL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (James, Ryan)
January 29, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J. McArdle (McArdle, Paul)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE to #26 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2013. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 01/29/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
January 28, 2013 Filing 27 BRIEF in Support re #26 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Rule of Civ. Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by PETER L. MANSMANN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (O'Connell, R.)
January 28, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. Rules of Civ. Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) re #1 Complaint by PETER L. MANSMANN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (O'Connell, R.)
January 25, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony J. Thompson on behalf of JOSEPH W. HUFNAGEL, MARGARET HUFNAGEL, THERESA HUFNAGEL, JAMES MANSMANN, JOANNE MANSMANN, PETER MANSMANN, SANDRA MANSMANN, KRISTINE SULLIVAN, THOMAS SULLIVAN, MICHELE WEISENSTEIN, RONALD WEISENSTEIN, THERESA CAMPA, CLAYTON CAMPA, ELIZABETH CHAMPAGNE, KEITH CHAMPAGNE AND ERIN MARSH. (Thompson, Tony) Modified on 1/28/2013. (sdp, )
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSES to #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses to these Motions due by 2/7/2013. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 01/24/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
January 24, 2013 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #23 Notice of Appearance, #24 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Incorrect filers selected. CORRECTION: Correct filers properly linked and attorneys added. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
January 23, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip S. Simon on behalf of DENNIS J. WELSCH, MARY P. WELSCH, KATHLEEN S. MORGAN, WILLIAM P. MORGAN. (Simon, Phillip) Modified on 1/24/2013. (sdp)
January 23, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Sean O'Connell on behalf of PETER L. MANSMANN and SARAH MANSMANN. (O'Connell, R.) Modified on 1/24/2013. (sdp)
January 23, 2013 Filing 22 BRIEF in Support re #21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DANIEL F. CUSICK, MARY SHEILA CUSICK AND COLLEEN CUSICK. (Skeel, Peter) Modified on 1/24/2013. (sdp)
January 23, 2013 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DANIEL F. CUSICK, MARY SHEILA CUSICK AND COLLEEN CUSICK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Skeel, Peter) Modified on 1/24/2013. (sdp)
January 23, 2013 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DANIEL L. BIRD, DENISE MANSMANN BIRD. (Lowery, Katherine)
January 23, 2013 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by DANIEL L. BIRD, DENISE MANSMANN BIRD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lowery, Katherine)
January 23, 2013 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from J. JEROME MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; PATRICK W. MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI on 3/5/2013 (sdp2)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss. Response to Motion due by 2/7/2013. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 01/23/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
January 22, 2013 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PATRICK W. MANSMANN. PATRICK W. MANSMANN waiver sent on 1/4/2013, answer due 3/5/2013. (Pieseski, Kristin) Modified on 1/23/2013. (sdp2)
January 22, 2013 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J. JEROME MANSMANN. J. JEROME MANSMANN waiver sent on 1/4/2013, answer due 3/5/2013. (Pieseski, Kristin) Modified on 1/23/2013. (sdp2, )
January 22, 2013 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by CARRIE FOX, GEORGE R. FOX, III, KELLY FOX, ANNE M. MCARDLE. (Rende, Bruce)
January 22, 2013 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by CARRIE FOX, GEORGE R. FOX, III, KELLY FOX, ANNE M. MCARDLE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
January 22, 2013 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from DANIEL L. BIRD on 3/5/2013; DENISE MANSMANN BIRD on 3/5/2013; ELIZABETH MANSMANN CHAMPAGNE on 3/5/2013; KEITH J. CHAMPAGNE on 3/5/2013; COLLEEN CUSICK on 3/5/2013; DANIEL F. CUSICK on 3/5/2013; MARY SHEILA CUSICK on 3/5/2013; CARRIE FOX on 3/5/2013; GEORGE R. FOX, III on 3/5/2013; KELLY FOX on 3/5/2013; MARGARET M. HUFNAGEL on 3/5/2013; THERESA J. HUFNAGEL on 3/5/2013; JAMES P. MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; JOANNE T. MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; PETER L. MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; SANDRA L. MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; SARAH E. MANSMANN on 3/5/2013; ERIN L. MARSH on 3/5/2013; ANNE M. MCARDLE on 3/5/2013; KATHLEEN S. MORGAN on 3/5/2013; WILLIAM P. MORGAN on 3/5/2013 (dm)
January 21, 2013 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI. KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI waiver sent on 1/4/2013, answer due 3/5/2013. (Pieseski, Kristin) Modified on 1/23/2013. (sdp2)
January 18, 2013 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. JOSEPH W. HUFNAGEL waiver sent on 1/4/2013, answer due 3/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Waiver, #2 Waiver, #3 Waiver, #4 Waiver, #5 Waiver, #6 Waiver, #7 Waiver, #8 Waiver, #9 Waiver, #10 Waiver, #11 Waiver, #12 Waiver, #13 Waiver, #14 Waiver, #15 Waiver, #16 Waiver, #17 Waiver, #18 Waiver, #19 Waiver, #20 Waiver, #21 Waiver, #22 Waiver) (McArdle, Paul)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER DENYING AS PREMATURE #11 Motion for Discovery. This motion is premature as all parties have yet to be served and to be represented by counsel. This matter may be readdressed at the Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 01/18/13. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
January 17, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan James on behalf of CLAYTON T. CAMPA, ELIZABETH MANSMANN CHAMPAGNE, KEITH J. CHAMPAGNE, JOSEPH W. HUFNAGEL, MARGARET M. HUFNAGEL, THERESA J. HUFNAGEL, JAMES P. MANSMANN, JOANNE T. MANSMANN, MICHELE M. MANSMANN, PETER J. MANSMANN, SANDRA L. MANSMANN, THERESA A. MANSMANN CAMPA, KRISTINE I. MANSMANN SULLIVAN, ERIN L. MARSH, THOMAS M. SULLIVAN, RONALD A. WEISENSTEIN. (James, Ryan)
January 17, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McArdle, Paul)
January 15, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin L. Pieseski on behalf of J. JEROME MANSMANN, PATRICK W. MANSMANN, KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI. (Pieseski, Kristin)
January 11, 2013 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Of Complaint by PAUL J. MCARDLE (McArdle, Paul)
January 11, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce E. Rende on behalf of CARRIE FOX, GEORGE R. FOX, III, KELLY FOX, ANNE M. MCARDLE. (Rende, Bruce)
January 11, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter B. Skeel on behalf of COLLEEN CUSICK, DANIEL F. CUSICK AND MARY SHEILA CUSICK. (Skeel, Peter) Modified on 1/14/2013. (sdp)
January 10, 2013 Judge Arthur J. Schwab presiding. (mjl)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly recused. The Clerk of Court is to reassign the case to another judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 1/9/2013. (dgg)
January 8, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Haushalter on behalf of DANIEL L. BIRD, DENISE MANSMANN BIRD. (Haushalter, William)
January 4, 2013 Case REASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. (sdp)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER indicating that in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 455, it is hereby ordered that the undersigned recuses herself from the above captioned case. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this matter to another member of this Court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/3/13. (jg) Modified on 1/4/2013. (sdp)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Reassign Case to Pittsburgh Docket. Signed by Judge Sean J. McLaughlin on 1/3/13. (nk)
January 3, 2013 Filing 2 MOTION to Reassign Case by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McArdle, Paul)
January 3, 2013 Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. (gmp)
January 3, 2013 Judge Sean J. McLaughlin no longer assigned to case. (gmp)
December 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $350, receipt number 315-2621918), filed by PAUL J. MCARDLE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/3/2013) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCARDLE v. HUFNAGEL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL F. CUSICK
Represented By: Peter B. Skeel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNE M. MCARDLE
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY FOX
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH W. HUFNAGEL
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA J. HUFNAGEL
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. JEROME MANSMANN
Represented By: Kristin L. Pieseski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES P. MANSMANN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEITH J. CHAMPAGNE
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER L. MANSMANN
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN L. MARSH
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN MANSMANN RYGALSKI
Represented By: Kristin L. Pieseski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLLEEN CUSICK
Represented By: Peter B. Skeel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS M. SULLIVAN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY P. WELSCH
Represented By: Phillip S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK W. MANSMANN
Represented By: Kristin L. Pieseski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL L. BIRD
Represented By: William R. Haushalter
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANDRA L. MANSMANN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P. MORGAN
Represented By: Phillip S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTINE I. MANSMANN SULLIVAN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN S. MORGAN
Represented By: Phillip S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENISE MANSMANN BIRD
Represented By: William R. Haushalter
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH MANSMANN CHAMPAGNE
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY SHEILA CUSICK
Represented By: Peter B. Skeel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER J. MANSMANN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA A. MANSMANN CAMPA
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIE FOX
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET M. HUFNAGEL
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD A. WEISENSTEIN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE M. MANSMANN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Michael L. Magulick
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARAH E. MANSMANN
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS J. WELSCH
Represented By: Phillip S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOANNE T. MANSMANN
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON T. CAMPA
Represented By: Ryan James
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE R. FOX, III
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL J. MCARDLE
Represented By: Paul J. McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?