MARINKOVIC v. BATTAGLIA et al
Plaintiff: M. MARINKOVIC
Defendant: DAVID K. BATTAGLIA, ROBERT T. BOWER, RICHARD L. FINK and ARMSTRONG COUNTY, PA
Case Number: 1:2014cv00049
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Erie
Presiding Judge: J. Frederick Motz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 171 Response in Opposition filed by MEL MARINKOVIC is hereby DENIED; 165 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ROBERT T. BOWER, DAVID K. BATTAGLIA, RICHARD L. FINK is hereby GRANTED; 172 First MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal and Rule 56(f) Motion to Reopen Discovery filed by MEL MARINKOVIC is hereby DENIED; and 157 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Effectuate Service and MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ROBERT T. BOWER, DAVID K. BATTAGLIA, RICHARD L. FINK is hereby DENIED as moot. See Opinion & Order for further details. The Clerk is directed to mark this case closed. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 09/23/19. (esa)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission on behalf of themselves only on or before April 12, 2018, in a manner otherwise consistent with the instructions set forth in the October 20, 2017 Order. P laintiff shall produce all documents responsive to Defendants' Rule 34 Requests for Production, including the audio recordings referenced in the October 20, 2017 Order, on or before April 12, 2018, in a manner otherwise consistent with the instructions set forth in the October 20, 2017 Order. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/26/18. (bdb)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/25/17. (bdb)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/8/16. (bdb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARINKOVIC v. BATTAGLIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. MARINKOVIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID K. BATTAGLIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT T. BOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD L. FINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG COUNTY, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?