GREEN v. BURKHART et al
Plaintiff: TYRONE GREEN
Defendant: RAYMOND BURKHART, DANIEL PACK, JOHN HAGERTY and JOHN DILARA
Case Number: 1:2014cv00159
Filed: June 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Forest
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying 239 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/4/2017. (lmt)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM ORDER re: Voir Dire, Final Jury Instructions, and Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/14/2017. (eet)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 212 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/7/2017. (eet)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 189 Motion in Limine. The Parties shall file a revised Joint Exhibit List on ECF in accordance with these rulings, and Defendants shall deliver copies of the exhibits in three (3) binders (one each for the Court, Court Reporter, and the Jury) to Chambers by Wednesday, July 12, 2017 at 12:00 PM (noon). Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/5/2017. (eet)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM ORDER Re: DENYING Defendants' Objections Filed at Doc. Nos. 186 and 194 , and DENYING Plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration Filed at Doc. Nos. 196 and 197 , and DENYING AS MOOT Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time Filed at Doc. No. 195 . Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 6/29/17. (eet)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER adopting 122 Report and Recommendations. Authorized by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 9/26/2016.(sgg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. BURKHART et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYMOND BURKHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL PACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN HAGERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DILARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?