REAM v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER
Plaintiff: REAM and SHANNON REAM
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER
Case Number: 1:2016cv00173
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
County: Venango
Presiding Judge: Barbara Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MANDATE of USCA issued. ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the judgment of the District court entered on November 22, 2017, be and the same is hereby affirmed. Costs to be taxed against the Appellant.(Attachments: #1 mandate lette, #2 opinion)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT OF USCA as to #48 Notice of Appeal,, filed by SHANNON REAM Affirming judgment/order of the district court. Costs to be taxed against the Appellant. Mandate will follow. (pdb3)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #47 Order, #46 Memorandum Opinion & Order by SHANNON REAM. Filing fee $505, receipt number 0315-4552377. Motion for IFP N/A. Certificate of Appealability N/A. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Sanders, Neal)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED in favor of Defendant Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Department of Human Services/Polk Center and against the Plaintiff Shannon Ream. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 11/21/2017. (nk)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER the Court hereby GRANTS Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #37 . This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 11/21/2017. (nk)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to #43 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Barchiesi, J.)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Appendix to #40 Response to Motion by SHANNON REAM. (Attachments: #1 Exh. 1 Shannon Ream Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exh. 2 John Biondo Deposition Excerpts, #3 Exh. 3 Erin Darby Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exh. 4 Shirley Pickens Deposition Excerpts, #5 Exh. 5 Kathy Garin Deposition Excerpts, #6 Exh. 6 Susan Quimby Deposition Excerpts) (Sanders, Neal)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS - ADDITIONAL - PURSUANT To LR 56.1C1(c) re #42 Response by SHANNON REAM. (Sanders, Neal)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE to #38 Concise Statement of Material Facts, filed by SHANNON REAM. (Sanders, Neal)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 BRIEF in Opposition re #37 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by SHANNON REAM. (Sanders, Neal)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Brief attached pursuant to Court's Standing Order - OPPOSITION filed by SHANNON REAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Neal)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Appendix to #37 Motion for Summary Judgment by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Barchiesi, J.)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #37 Motion for Summary Judgment by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Barchiesi, J.)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Brief attached pursuant to Court's Standing Order by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barchiesi, J.)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Barchiesi, J.)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER: Summary Judgment Motions are due June 7, 2017. Responses are due June 28, 2017. Replies are due July 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 5/12/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 5/12/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jds)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nora Barry Fischer: Settlement Conference held on 5/12/2017 (details of proceeding more fully stated in memo) (Court Reporter: None) (sks)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER indicating that a Settlement Conference is set for 5/12/17 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 5B before Judge Nora Barry Fischer; that parties' confidential letters and joint proposed settlement agreement and release are due by 5/9/17 at 4:00 PM (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/27/17. (jg)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nora Barry Fischer: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/27/17 (details of proceeding more fully stated in memo); An appropriate Order follows. (Court Reporter: None) (jg)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER: All outstanding deadlines are hereby stayed pending the outcome of the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 4/27/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jds)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge Nora Barry Fischer for settlement purposes only. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 4/26/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nk)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER indicating that a Telephonic Status/Scheduling Conference is set for 4/27/17 at 10:30 AM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/26/17. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: The following schedule has been agreed upon by the parties and is adopted by the Court:Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before May 31, 2017. Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before June 30, 2017. Replies shall be filed on or before July 14, 2017. Twenty-one (21) days after the resolution of dispositive motions or the date for filing such motions has passed, the parties shall submit a joint status report that includes: a. proposed Pretrial Conference dates; b. proposed Trial dates, including the likely length of trial (noting that the court's presumptive limit is five days), and whether it should be bifurcated; and c. whether the trial will be to a jury or the court. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 4/10/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jds)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STATUS REPORT Filed Jointly By The Parties by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Barchiesi, J.)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Fact Discovery to be completed by March 20, 2017. All other deadlines set forth in Minute Order dated January 23, 2017 shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 2/27/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jds)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery - Fact by SHANNON REAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Neal)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #21 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff seeks to add a claim under the Pennsylvania Human Relations Act ("PHRA"). However, "[A] plaintiff may never pursue a PHRA claim against Pennsylvania or its agencies in federal court." 108 F. Supp. 2d 460, 465 (E.D.Pa. 2000). Accordingly, amendment is barred as futile. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 2/2/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jds)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER setting initial case schedule. The following schedule has been agreed upon by the parties and is adopted by the Court: (1) Fact discovery shall be completed by February 28, 2017; (2) Plaintiff's expert report is due by February 28, 2017; (3) Deposition of Plaintiffs expert witness shall be completed by March 30, 2017; (4) Defendants expert report is due April 14, 2017; (5) Deposition of Defendants expert shall be completed by May 5, 2017. Additionally, in lieu of a post-discovery status conference, the parties shall meet and confer upon completion of discovery, and provide the Court with a Joint Status Report due two weeks after the completion of discovery. In this Joint Status Report, the parties shall provide a proposed briefing schedule for summary judgment motions, motions in limine and Daubert motions, and propose other pretrial dates. In setting these dates, the Court refers the parties to the Court's Standing Order for guidance. In the joint status report, the parties shall also update the Court as to the possibility of settlement. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 1/23/2017. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jds)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #21 Motion for Leave to File, filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Barchiesi, J.)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by SHANNON REAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 First Amended Complaint, #3 Exh. 1 - Letter Offering Position with Dept. of Corrections, #4 Exh. 2 - Letter Rescinding Position with Dept. of Corrections, #5 Exh. 3 - EEOC Letter Dtd. April 6, 2016, #6 Exh. 4 - EEOC Letter Dtd. May 12, 2016, #7 Exh. 5 - Settlement Agreement, #8 Exh. 6 Dual File Form - Cmm. of PA Dept. Human Services, #9 Exh. 7 - Dual File Form - Polk Center, #10 Exh. 8 - New Charge-Affidavit Letter-Fax to PHRC, #11 Affidavit) (Sanders, Neal) (sdp). Modified on 11/28/2016. (sdp)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Neal A. Sanders (Sanders, Neal)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; GRANTING #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 11/18/2016. (jds)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sanders, Neal)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPORT of Early Neutral Evaluation Case has not resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. (May, Thomas)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Early Neutral Evaluation by THOMAS H. MAY. Early Neutral Evaluation Date 10/19/2016 9:00 a.m. (May, Thomas)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation Thomas H. May is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. Party THOMAS H. MAY added. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/6/2016. (nk)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by SHANNON REAM. (Sanders, Neal)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #10 Stipulation Selecting ADR process for failure to specify a date filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. Parties are to re-file Stipulation with a specific date of the session on or before Tuesday, October 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/5/16. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nk)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by SHANNON REAM. (Sanders, Neal)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Supporting Brief attached pursuant to Court's Standing Order MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Supporting Brief attached pursuant to Court's Standing Order filed by SHANNON REAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanders, Neal)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Barchiesi, J.)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Supporting Brief attached pursuant to Court's Standing Order, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction with Supporting Brief attached pursuant to Court's Standing Order by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Barchiesi, J.)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF COURT - ADR STIPULATION. ADR Stipulation due by 9/20/216. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/24/2016. (nk) (Main Document #8 replaced on 8/25/2016) (nk)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer to discuss case management issues in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). As described in Section 4 of the Standing Order, Parties must file a Rule 26(f) Meet and Confer Report. The Rule 26(f) report is due by October 24, 2016. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 8/24/2016. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nk)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER of procedures that are to be followed in civil cases assigned to this Court. These practice standards supplement the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. In the event there is an inconsistency between the Local Rules and these practice standards, the terms of this Order control. The terms of this Order shall apply to all pleadings and hearings pertaining to cases assigned to Judge Rothstein and shall have the force and effect of orders of the Court from this date forward. If the case was previously assigned to a different District Judge, these practice standards replace those that previously controlled, but only as to pleadings and hearings from this date forward. Signed by Judge Barbara Rothstein on 8/24/2016. (nk) (Main Document #6 replaced on 8/24/2016) (nk) (Main Document #6 replaced on 8/25/2016) (nk)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANNON REAM. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER waiver sent on 7/7/2016, answer due 9/6/2016. (Sanders, Neal)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Eric Barchiesi on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER. (Barchiesi, J.)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 The instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania's Alternative Dispute Resolution (ADR) program. For further information, parties should refer to Local Rule 16.2 and the Courts ADR Policies and Procedures, which can be accessed at the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of this notice on all parties. The attorneys of record and all unrepresented parties that appear in this case are reminded that they are jointly responsible for submitting to the Court a stipulation of selecting an ADR process (pursuant to Revised Local Rule 16.2) as directed by the Court. (nk)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to *COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER* (jd)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4012882), filed by SHANNON REAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Offering Position with Dept. of Corrections, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter Rescinding Position Offer, #3 Exhibit 3 - EEOC Letter Dated April 6, 2016, #4 Exhibit 4 - EEOC Letter Dated May 12, 2016, #5 Exhibit 5 - Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Claim Letter Dated June 9, 2015, #7 Affidavit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REAM v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNON REAM
Represented By: Neal A. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, POLK CENTER
Represented By: J. Eric Barchiesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?