BRANDON v. BURKHART et al
Plaintiff: |
CURTIS BRANDON |
Defendant: |
RAYMOND BURKHART and DANIEL PACK |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00177 |
Filed: |
July 12, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Erie Office |
County: |
Forest |
Presiding Judge: |
Susan Paradise Baxter |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 26, 2022 |
Filing
211
MEMORANDUM ORDER; IT IS ORDERED this 26th day of September, 2022, that the Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration, ECF No. 210 , shall be, and hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 09/26/2022. (snc)
|
August 12, 2021 |
Filing
207
MEMORANDUM ORDER: AND NOW, this 12th day August, 2021; IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants' motion for summary judgment, ECF No. 137 , shall be and hereby is, GRANTED. Consistent with the foregoing, JUDGMENT shall be entered by separate order pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, in favor of Defendants Siegel, Burkhart, Blake, Stoddard, Chiles, Schleicher, Price, and Beach and against Plaintiff Curtis Brandon, on all remaining claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that t he Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Lanzillo, issued on November 16, 2020, ECF No. 181 is adopted as the opinion of the Court. As there are no remaining claims or other matters pending before the Court in this case, the Clerk is directed to mark the above-captioned civil action "CLOSED." Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 8/12/2021. (esa)
|
January 7, 2020 |
Filing
119
ORDER re 114 Objections filed by CURTIS BRANDON: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED and the Order 108 entered by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on November 20, 2019 is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 01/07/2020. (esa)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
86
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 77 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; adopting Report and Recommendation 79 . For the reasons set forth in the Repo rt and Recommendation, which is hereby adopted as the final opinion of the Court, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants Wetzel, Overmyer, Blicha, Ennis, Crowther, Oberlander, Wallace-Ireland, Conrad, Dupont, Ellenberger, Reed, Varner, and Horton are dismissed from this action, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/25/18. (jdg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?