MOKNACH et al v. ELDORADO RESORTS, INC. et al

Plaintiff: KEN MOKNACH and PATRICIA MOKNACH
Defendant: ELDORADO RESORTS, INC., ELDORADO RESORTS, LLC and PRESQUE ISLE DOWNS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00261
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Philip B. Friedman, Esq. is appointed as an early neutral evaluator. Party PHILIP B. FRIEDMAN added. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/1/18. (lrw)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/5/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 11/5/2018; Joinder of Parties due by 11/5/2018; Discovery due by 2/22/2019; Status Conference via telephone set for 2/26/2019 11:00 AM before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/1/18. (lrw)
November 1, 2018 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Case Management Conference held on 11/1/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (lrw)
October 25, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by PATRICIA MOKNACH. (Milsop, Mark)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/22/18. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Article) (lrw)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER due to a scheduling conflict, the Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 11:00 AM has been RE-SCHEDULED for 11/1/2018 at 11:30 AM in Room A-280 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/22/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lrw)
October 17, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Milsop, Mark)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by PATRICIA MOKNACH. (Milsop, Mark)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying Eldorado Resorts, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PRESQUE ISLE DOWNS, INC.. (Musone, Michael)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PRESQUE ISLE DOWNS, INC.. (Musone, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/26/18. (lrw)
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PRESQUE ISLE DOWNS, INC., filed by PATRICIA MOKNACH. (Milsop, Mark) Modified on 10/2/2018. (jjg)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION Substituting Defendant by Consent by PATRICIA MOKNACH. (Milsop, Mark)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 10/23/2018 at 11:00 AM in Room A-280, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Erie, PA before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 10/9/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/18/2018. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/25/2018. (lrw)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter for all further proceedings. Judge Arthur J. Schwab no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 1:18-mc-50. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 9/17/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (admin1, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by ELDORADO RESORTS, INC., ELDORADO RESORTS, LLC. (Musone, Michael)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lck)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ELDORADO RESORTS, INC., ELDORADO RESORTS, LLC. (dm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Erie County Court of Common Pleas, case number 13490-17 with Plaintiff Copies attached: Common Pleas Complaint, Pleadings and Docket Sheet (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 13490-2017), filed by ELDORADO RESORTS, LLC, ELDORADO RESORTS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Pleadings) (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOKNACH et al v. ELDORADO RESORTS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELDORADO RESORTS, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Musone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELDORADO RESORTS, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Musone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESQUE ISLE DOWNS, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Musone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEN MOKNACH
Represented By: Mark E. Milsop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA MOKNACH
Represented By: Mark E. Milsop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?