FELLOWS v. GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC.

Plaintiff: ANN FELLOWS
Defendant: GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00314
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/7/2018. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (fcf)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by ANN FELLOWS. (Conway, Ronald)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC. Answer due from GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC. on 11/14/2018. (Devlin, Neal)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal R. Devlin on behalf of GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC. (Devlin, Neal)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC. (sdp)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ANN FELLOWS (Conway, Ronald)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/16/2018. (fcf)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4892858), filed by ANN FELLOWS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FELLOWS v. GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND CANYON EDUCATION, INC.
Represented By: Neal R. Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANN FELLOWS
Represented By: Ronald T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?