SNAIR et al v. SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE

Plaintiff: JAMIE L. SNAIR and MONTY ALLEN SNAIR
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE
3Rd Party Defendant: SAUER SNOWPLOWING & LAWN CARE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00376
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against SAUER SNOWPLOWING & LAWN CARE, LLC, filed by SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Plonski, Stephen) Modified text on 1/29/2019. (ept)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Rule 502(d). Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/15/19. (lrw)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: Mediation Article. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Article) (lrw)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management set for 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Room A-280, U.S. District Court, 17 South Park Row, Erie, PA before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 1/31/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/4/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/15/19. (lrw)
January 15, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Local Rule 7.1 Certificate. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Document removed from public view and refiled at #8 . This message is for informational purposes only. (ept)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE. (ept)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Plonski, Stephen)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE . (Plonski, Stephen) Wrong event selected. Document removed from public view and refiled at #8 . Modified text on 1/15/2019. (ept)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Plonski on behalf of SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE. (Plonski, Stephen)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/10/19. (lrw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MONTY ALLEN SNAIR. SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Talarico, Richard)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE. (ept)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4955560), filed by MONTY ALLEN SNAIR, JAMIE L. SNAIR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNAIR et al v. SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE L. SNAIR
Represented By: Richard G. Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTY ALLEN SNAIR
Represented By: Richard G. Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SHIELDS FACILITIES MAINTENANCE
Represented By: Stephen P. Plonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SAUER SNOWPLOWING & LAWN CARE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?