EWING v. ERIE INSURANCE GROUP

Plaintiff: JACQUELYN F. EWING
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE GROUP
Case Number: 1:2018cv00386
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie R. Schumacher on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE GROUP. (Schumacher, Jamie)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JACQUELYN F. EWING. ERIE INSURANCE GROUP waiver sent on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Narahari, Prabhu)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ERIE INSURANCE GROUP. (Presta, Lisa)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Smith Presta on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE GROUP. (Presta, Lisa)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/10/19. (lrw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIE INSURANCE GROUP (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4965503), filed by JACQUELYN F. EWING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EWING v. ERIE INSURANCE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: Jamie R. Schumacher
Represented By: Lisa Smith Presta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELYN F. EWING
Represented By: Prabhu Narahari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?