BRUNDAGE et al v. SNYDER OF BERLIN et al
Plaintiff: BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS and STEVEN BRUNDAGE
Defendant: AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC and SNYDER OF BERLIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00141
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying Kennedy Endeavors, Inc.; Conagra Brands, Inc.; Birds Eye Foods, LLC; Peak Finance Holdings, LLC; the Vanguard Group, Inc.; T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bohme, Ingrid)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Affirmative Defenses by AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bohme, Ingrid)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie A. Mueller on behalf of AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.). (Mueller, Julie)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, AGRILINK FOODS, INC. Answer due on 7/8/19. (Bohme, Ingrid) Modified text on 6/10/2019. (jjg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Lacey on behalf of AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.). (Lacey, Alex)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ingrid A. Bohme on behalf of AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.). (Bohme, Ingrid)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS, STEVEN BRUNDAGE. SNYDER OF BERLIN, a Division of Birds Eye Foods LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a Division of Agrlink Foods Inc, BIRDS EYE FOODS, a New Jersey Limited Liability Company, AGRILINK FOODS INC, a New York Corporation served on 5/20/19, answer due 6/10/19. (Baumann, Bryan) Modified text on 5/30/2019. (jjg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS, STEVEN BRUNDAGE. AGRILINK FOODS, INC. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Baumann, Bryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS, STEVEN BRUNDAGE. BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Baumann, Bryan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS, STEVEN BRUNDAGE. SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.) served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (Baumann, Bryan)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER on Civil Motion Practice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/15/19. (lrw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STEVEN BRUNDAGE, BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS. (jjg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.) (jjg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AGRILINK FOODS, INC., BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.), SNYDER OF BERLIN(a division of BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC, individually and as successor-in-interest to, SNYDER OF BERLIN, a division of AGRILINK FOODS, INC.) (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5133257), filed by BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS, STEVEN BRUNDAGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRUNDAGE et al v. SNYDER OF BERLIN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGRILINK FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Ingrid A. Bohme
Represented By: Julie A. Mueller
Represented By: Alex M. Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIRDS EYE FOODS, LLC
Represented By: Ingrid A. Bohme
Represented By: Julie A. Mueller
Represented By: Alex M. Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNYDER OF BERLIN
Represented By: Ingrid A. Bohme
Represented By: Julie A. Mueller
Represented By: Alex M. Lacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUNDAGE SNACK FOODS
Represented By: Alexander K. Cox
Represented By: Bryan G Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BRUNDAGE
Represented By: Alexander K. Cox
Represented By: Bryan G Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?