NICHOLS v. SMOCK et al

Plaintiff: LORENZO NICHOLS
Defendant: PA STROUP, JERI SMOCK and DR. LETIZIO
Case Number: 1:2019cv00164
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by LORENZO NICHOLS. (av)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against LETIZIO, JERI SMOCK, STROUP, filed by LORENZO NICHOLS. (av)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with Monthly Account Statement by LORENZO NICHOLS. (Attachments: #1 Monthly Account Statement, #2 Envelope) (jv)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case administratively closed, without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 6/12/2019. (dm)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 06/11/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
June 10, 2019 Remark: USM 285 FORMS RECEIVED FOR ALL DEFENDANTS (jd)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LORENZO NICHOLS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint Pending IFP, #2 Envelope) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NICHOLS v. SMOCK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA STROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERI SMOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. LETIZIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORENZO NICHOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?