NICHOLSON v. SHEETZ INC. et al
Plaintiff: ERIK W. NICHOLSON
Defendant: CEO JOSEPH S SHEETZ, SHEETZ INC. and JOSEPH S. SHEETZ
Case Number: 1:2019cv00166
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE and WAIVER, Complaint, Order mailed to all defendants on 7/26/2019 by ERIK W. NICHOLSON (mao)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against JOSEPH S. SHEETZ, SHEETZ INC. filed by ERIK W. NICHOLSON. (mao)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: USM-285 forms, Order for Service, Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Service forms placed in U.S. Marshal's mailbox in Clerk's office. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. It is ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver form and this Order to each Defendant as directed by Plaintiff. Costs shall be borne by the United States. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to F.R.C.P 4(d). Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/25/19. (esa)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff is directed to provide USM-285 forms for each Defendant so that they can be properly served. Forms are due to the Clerk of Court by 08/02/19. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/22/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERIK W. NICHOLSON. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NICHOLSON v. SHEETZ INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEO JOSEPH S SHEETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEETZ INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH S. SHEETZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK W. NICHOLSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?