NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SHELDON
Plaintiff: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MARK SHELDON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00212
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/4/19. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, setting Case Management Conference in Suite 3250 via telephone before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/4/19. (jhi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by MARK SHELDON. (Koehler, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MARK SHELDON on 9/24/2019 (sdp)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. MARK SHELDON waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Twilla, Daniel) Modified text on 8/19/2019. (sdp)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 7/29/19. (jhi)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MARK SHELDON (sdp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK SHELDON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5223597), filed by NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. SHELDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK SHELDON
Represented By: Michael J. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?