LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA v. MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Plaintiff: LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA
Defendant: MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00215
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal. Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 09/11/19. (esa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. (Stember, John)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court finds that the Plaintiff has failed to meet its burden of showing that the arbitral process would be rendered "meaningless" in the absence of an injunction. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 08/09/19. (esa)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC. waiver sent on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Stember, John)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on August 5, 2019 before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janis Ferguson, Telephone number 8144649613. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. For redaction purposes, or otherwise, during this 90 day period a copy of the transcript may be purchased from the court reporter/transcriber or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and Redaction Request must be separately mailed to the court reporter of said proceedings. Notice of Intent for Redaction of Personal Data Identifiers due by 8/15/2019. Redaction Request due 8/29/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2019. (jlf)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Frank W. Buck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 08/05/19. (esa)
August 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2019 at 1:30 p.m. re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. Court will make determination and issue a separate order by Friday, 08/09/19. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying Morgan Advanced Materials plc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Murphy, Terrence)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment including Responsive Concise Statement and Memorandum in Opposition due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 08/01/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 CONCISE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #10 Motion for Summary Judgment by MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Murphy, Terrence)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 Appendix to #10 Motion for Summary Judgment by MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Murphy, Terrence)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Opposition to filed by MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Murphy, Terrence)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Terrence)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Frank W. Buck to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5227990) by MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Frank Buck Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Buck, Frank)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent J. Mersich on behalf of LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. (Mersich, Vincent)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Motion Hearing re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. Scheduled for 8/5/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A - Erie before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Defendant's Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/29/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence H. Murphy on behalf of MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Murphy, Terrence)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION OF RICHARD E. ZIMMERMAN re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA (mao) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (mao)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. (mao)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. (mao)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC. (mao)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5225890), filed by LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons) (mao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA v. MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOCAL 88502 OF THE INTERNATIONAL UNION OF ELECTRONIC, ELECTRICAL, SALARIED, MACHINE AND FURNITURE WORKER AFL-CIO-CWA
Represented By: John Stember
Represented By: Vincent J. Mersich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN ADVANCED MATERIALS AND TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: Terrence H. Murphy
Represented By: Frank W. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?