MURPHY v. BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.
Plaintiff: ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY
Defendant: BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00239
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER dismissing #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/3/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, this 3rd day of October, 2019, that #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC. is DISMISSED, without prejudice, inasmuch as the Motion lacks the required Certificate of Conferral, as set forth in Paragraph 5(A) of the Court's Standing Order on Civil Motion Practice #18 , and this Court's Practices and Procedures, which are available through the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Defendant may refile the Motion, with the required certificates, on or before 10/23/19. In the event the Motion is re-filed, the Court will abide by the briefing deadlines set forth in its Standing Order, and no additional briefing orders will issue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall disregard the Order for Response issued by Magistrate Judge Lanzillo on 10/3/19. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/03/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (esa)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/03/19. (esa)
October 3, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding, and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (dm)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to Motion due by 10/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/3/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hadrick, Rachel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying Cochran Motors, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.. (jd)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Thomas Scott Markey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for attorney Thomas S. Markey to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5287298) by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Markey, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Devin John Chwastyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 9/27/19, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 9/27/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Devin J. Chwastyk to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5286806) by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chwastyk, Devin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC. Answer due from BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC. on 9/30/19. (Hadrick, Rachel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel R. Hadrick on behalf of BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.. (Hadrick, Rachel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Fisher, Lawrence)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC. (jd)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Fisher, Lawrence)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5254654), filed by ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURPHY v. BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOB COCHRAN MOTORS, INC.
Represented By: Rachel R. Hadrick
Represented By: Thomas S. Markey
Represented By: Devin J. Chwastyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY HAMMOND MURPHY
Represented By: Lawrence H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?