PRZICINA et al v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN PRZICINA and JEFFREY PRZICINA
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00266
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER re Motion to Extend Time to Complete ADR filed by JEFFREY PRZICINA, KATHLEEN PRZICINA, NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the deadline for completion of ADR in this action is extended to February 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/13/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/26/2019; ADR to be completed by 2/10/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/12/2019; Joinder of Parties due by 12/12/2019; Discovery due by 4/10/2020; Mid-Discovery Telephone Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/13/2019. (dm)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Joint Oral Motion to Extend Time for Completion of ADR. During the initial case management conference on November 12, 2019, the parties identified certain discovery the completion of which they believe is necessary to encourage a productive mediation and jointly moved to extend the deadline for the completion of mandatory ADR in this case. Good cause having been shown for the extension, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the deadline for completion of ADR in this action is extended to January 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/12/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
November 12, 2019 Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Completion of ADR by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP., JEFFREY PRZICINA, KATHLEEN PRZICINA. (dm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/12/2019. Initial case management conference conducted; discovery deadlines discussed; ADR stipulation to be filed; Oral Motion to Extend the Deadline for Completion of ADR was GRANTED. Case management order to follow. (Court Reporter: Janis Ferguson) (dm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clements, Scott)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 11/4/2019; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2019; Case Management Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/18/2019. (dm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Zidian, Chloe)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER approving joint stipulation dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiffs' allegations of reckless conduct and claims for punitive damages (ECF No. #9 ). Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on October 10, 2019. (jbh)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION Dismissing Plaintiffs' Allegation of Reckless Conduct and Claims for Punitive Damages by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Clements, Scott)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JEFFREY PRZICINA, KATHLEEN PRZICINA. (Godinich, Daniel)
September 24, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option at #7 . This message is for informational purposes only. (cjo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. (cjo)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Consent to Proceed before US Mag. Judge by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Zidian, Chloe) Modified on 9/24/2019 removed from public view and redocketed at #7 . (cjo)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Johnston, J.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Clements, Scott)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 9/27/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 9/27/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 9/17/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.. (Zidian, Chloe)
September 16, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/23/2019. (ma)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Erie County, case number 12375-19 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5284465), filed by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRZICINA et al v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN PRZICINA
Represented By: Daniel T. Godinich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY PRZICINA
Represented By: Daniel T. Godinich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORP.
Represented By: Chloe C. Zidian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?