BOND v. MCKEAN COUNTY
Plaintiff: PAMELA BOND
Defendant: MCKEAN COUNTY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00269
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Erie Office
Presiding Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 Remark: COURTS COPY OF LETTER TO JUDGE LUTHER (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 US Marshal's Return as to SERVICE COPIES MAILED executed on 10/29/19. (jd)
October 18, 2019 Service copy placed in US Marshal box. (dm)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/18/2019. (dm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBITS in Support of #1 Complaint by PAMELA BOND. (dm)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Service by U.S. Marshal. By separate order, the Court will provide service copies to the United States Marshal Service and direct that service of the Plaintiff's Complaint be effectuated. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on October 16, 2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jbh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal re #1 Complaint by PAMELA BOND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Envelope) (jd)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 4:19-cv-01535. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Bond.(ep)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT: This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/17/2019. (Williamson, Christine)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORM to be attached to Summons and Complaint when served by USM (ep)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM & ORDER it is hereby ORDERED that: This case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). An appropriate Order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/17/2019. (Williamson, Christine)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 2) is GRANTED. The Complaint is DEEMED filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 9/17/2019. (Williamson, Christine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(nr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED (nr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/ Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Bond. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKean County lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Pamela Bond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s))(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOND v. MCKEAN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA BOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKEAN COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?