STRAWBRIDGE v. VENANGO COUNTY et al
Plaintiff: FRANCES STRAWBRIDGE
Defendant: VENANGO COUNTY and PHILLIP J. DAVIS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00272
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Mizner, John)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 11/18/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/1/2019. (dm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by PHILLIP J. DAVIS, VENANGO COUNTY. (Wymard, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by PHILLIP J. DAVIS, VENANGO COUNTY. (Wymard, Francis)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by FRANCES STRAWBRIDGE. (Mizner, John)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 10/15/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 10/15/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/7/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis D. Wymard on behalf of PHILLIP J. DAVIS, VENANGO COUNTY. (Wymard, Francis)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons served on Venango County on 9/25/2019, filed by FRANCES STRAWBRIDGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Mizner, John)
September 24, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo. Judge Susan Paradise Baxter no longer assigned to the case. (sdp)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PHILLIP J. DAVIS, VENANGO COUNTY (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sdp) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/23/2019) (sdp) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/23/2019) (sdp)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILLIP J. DAVIS, VENANGO COUNTY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5290584), filed by FRANCES STRAWBRIDGE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRAWBRIDGE v. VENANGO COUNTY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VENANGO COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP J. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES STRAWBRIDGE
Represented By: John F. Mizner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?