THOMPSON v. SLATZER et al
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RAY THOMPSON
Defendant: LISA SLATZER and REX HILDEBRAND
Case Number: 1:2019cv00282
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 2/24/2020; Plaintiff Pretrial Statement due by 3/16/2020; Defendant Pretrial Statement due by 4/6/2020; Summary Judgment due by 4/6/2020; Response to Summary Judgment due by 4/27/2020; Reply brief due by 5/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/25/2019. (dm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by REX HILDEBRAND, LISA SLATZER. (Senich, John)
November 14, 2019 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (jd)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by REX HILDEBRAND, LISA SLATZER. (Senich, John)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/23/2019. (dm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Produce Documents by ANTHONY RAY THOMPSON. (sdp)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ANTHONY RAY THOMPSON. (sdp)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 10/21/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. A copy of the form will also be provided to Plaintiff with this Order. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 10/21/2019; Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 10/7/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Senich, Jr on behalf of REX HILDEBRAND, LISA SLATZER. (Senich, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Forest, case number 104-2019 with jury demand Copies attached: complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-5302617), filed by REX HILDEBRAND, LISA SLATZER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPSON v. SLATZER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SLATZER
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley
Represented By: John P. Senich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REX HILDEBRAND
Represented By: Scott A. Bradley
Represented By: John P. Senich, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY RAY THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?