MALDONADO v. WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Petitioner: RICHARD MALDONADO
Respondent: WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Case Number: 1:2019cv00328
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Referring Judge: Richard A Lanzillo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from WARDEN FCI MCKEAN on 2/10/2020 (dm)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Returned Executed by RICHARD MALDONADO. WARDEN FCI MCKEAN served on 12/12/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (ma) Modified text on 1/6/2020 to correct date served and answer deadline. (dm)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by RICHARD MALDONADO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ma)
December 30, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Susan Paradise Baxter, presiding, and Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo, referral. (jd)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 12/27/2019, the PETITIONER shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form will be provided to PETITIONER with this Order. Consent to Jurisdiction by Mag. Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/13/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WARDEN FCI MCKEAN. (Taylor, Kezia)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kezia Taylor on behalf of WARDEN FCI MCKEAN. (Taylor, Kezia)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the petition, upon the respondents by certified mail, costs to be advanced by the United States. Within 60 days of service of this order, respondent shall respond to the allegations of the petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/26/2019. (dm)
November 26, 2019 Service copies placed in US Marshal box. (dm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 14668004381), filed by RICHARD MALDONADO. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALDONADO v. WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN FCI MCKEAN
Represented By: Kezia Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RICHARD MALDONADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?