TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. v. TRI-STATE PAIN INSTITUTE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC.
Defendant: GREATER ERIE SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRI-STATE PAIN INSTITUTE, LLC and M.D. JOSEPH M. THOMAS
Case Number: 1:2019cv00335
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Susan Paradise Baxter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #4 Motion for Return of Property, Motion for TRO. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (mao)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GREATER ERIE SURGERY CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH M. THOMAS, TRI-STATE PAIN INSTITUTE, LLC (Eiben, Gary)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Hearing on #4 Motion for Seizure of Property Pursuant to Rule 1353: Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A - Erie before Judge Susan Paradise Baxter. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 12/18/19. (esa)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion for Return of Property, Motion for TRO. filed by TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (mao)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Return of Property , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #3 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit B to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit C to Affidavit, #6 Exhibit D to Affidavit, #7 Exhibit E to Affidavit, #8 Exhibit F to Affidavit, #9 Exhibit G to Affidavit, #10 Exhibit H to Affidavit, #11 Exhibit I to Affidavit, #12 Exhibit J to Affidavit, #13 Exhibit K to Affidavit, #14 Exhibit L to Affidavit, #15 Exhibit M to Affidavit, #16 Exhibit N to Affidavit, #17 Exhibit O to Affidavit, #18 Exhibit P to Affidavit, #19 Proposed Order for Hearing on Seizure of Property, #20 Brief in Support of Motion, #21 Proposed Order for Issuance of Writ of Seizure, #22 Correspondence to Judge) (Romano, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Romano, Michael) Modified text on 11/18/2019. (jm)
November 14, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/21/2019. (jm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to GREATER ERIE SURGERY CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH M. THOMAS, TRI-STATE PAIN INSTITUTE, LLC (jm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GREATER ERIE SURGERY CENTER, LLC, JOSEPH M. THOMAS, TRI-STATE PAIN INSTITUTE, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5358240), filed by TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC. v. TRI-STATE PAIN INSTITUTE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREATER ERIE SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRI-STATE PAIN INSTITUTE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. JOSEPH M. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIAA COMMERCIAL FINANCE, INC.
Represented By: Michael FJ Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?